Snohomish County v. Purdue Pharma LP et al
Consolidated
Lead case: 1:17-md-02804
Lead case: 1:17-md-02804
Ohio Northern District Court | |
Judge: | Dan Aaron Polster |
Case #: | 1:19-op-45370 |
Nature of Suit | 367 Torts - Personal Injury - Health Care/Pharmaceutical Personal Injury/Product Liability |
Cause | 28:1332nr |
Case Filed: | Jun 07, 2019 |
Case in other court: | Washington Western, 2:19-cv-00368 |
Last checked: Friday Nov 08, 2019 7:42 PM EST |
Defendant
David A. Sackler
|
|
Defendant
JANSSEN PHARMACEUTICALS, INC. F/K/A ORTHO-MCNEIL-JANSSEN PHARMACEUTICALS, INC. F/K/A/ JANSSEN PHARMACEUTICA, INC.
|
|
Defendant
Johnson & Johnson
|
|
Defendant
KVK-Tech, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
MALLINCKRODT PLC,
|
|
Defendant
Mallinckrodt LLC
|
|
Defendant
NORAMCO, INC.,
|
|
Defendant
PAR PHARMACEUTICAL COMPANIES, INC. F/K/A PAR PHARMACEUTICAL HOLDINGS, INC.
|
|
Defendant
Par Pharmaceutical, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
RHODES TECHNOLOGIES
|
|
Defendant
Rhodes Pharmaceuticals Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Rhodes Pharmaceuticals L.P.
|
|
Defendant
Rhodes Technologies Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Beverly Sackler
|
|
Defendant
ENDO PHARMACEUTICALS, INC.,
|
|
Defendant
Jonathan D. Sackler
|
|
Defendant
Kathe A. Sackler
|
|
Defendant
Mortimer D. A. Sackler
|
|
Defendant
Theresa Sackler
|
|
Defendant
Ilene Sackler Lefcourt
|
|
Defendant
SpecGX LLC
|
|
Defendant
TEVA PHARMACEUTICALS USA, INC.,
|
|
Defendant
Teva Pharmaceutical Industries, Ltd.
|
|
Defendant
Trust for the Benefit of Members of the Raymond Sackler Family
|
|
Defendant
WATSON LABORATORIES, INC.,
|
|
Defendant
Walgreens Boots Alliance, Inc. a/k/a Walgreen Co.
|
|
Defendant
Walmart Inc. f/k/a Wal-Mart Stores, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
West-Ward Pharmaceutical Corp.
|
|
Defendant
Sevan Pharmacy, LLC
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Donald Dillinger
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Doctors Osteopathic Care, P.S., Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Doe Entities
|
|
Defendant
John and Jane Does 1 through 100
|
|
Defendant
Hieu Tu Le
|
|
Defendant
Frank D. Li
|
|
Defendant
McKesson Corporation
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
NW Green Medical, PLLC
|
|
Defendant
NW Green Wellness, PLLC
|
|
Defendant
Purdue Frederick Company Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Purdue Pharma Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Purdue Pharma L.P.
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Seattle Pain Center Medical Corporation
|
|
Defendant
Statcare Inc PS
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Thrifty Payless, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Delbert Whetstone
|
|
Defendant
ACTAVIS LLC,
|
|
Defendant
ACTAVIS PHARMA, INC. f/k/a WATSON PHARMA, INC.,
|
|
Defendant
ALLERGAN FINANCE LLC, F/K/A/ ACTAVIS, INC., F/K/A WATSON PHARMACEUTICALS, INC.
|
|
Defendant
Allergan PLC f/k/a Actavis PLC
|
|
Defendant
AmerisourceBergen Drug Corporation
|
|
Defendant
Anda, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Cardinal Health, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Cephalon, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
ENDO HEALTH SOLUTIONS INC.,
|
|
Plaintiff
Snohomish County
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 06/17/2019 5:16 PM EDT |
Wednesday, March 13, 2019 | ||
1 | 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Snohomish County Superior Court, case number 19 2-00908 31; Attorney Thomas Dean Adams added to party Purdue Pharma LP(pty:dft), Attorney Thomas Dean Adams added to party Purdue Pharma, Inc.(pty:dft), Attorney Thomas Dean Adams added to party The Purdue Frederick Company, Inc.(pty:dft), filed by The Purdue Frederick Company, Inc., Purdue Pharma, Inc., Purdue Pharma LP.(Adams, Thomas) [Transferred from wawd on 6/7/2019.] | |
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet, | ||
Att: 2 Complaint, | ||
Att: 3 Jury Demand | ||
2 | 2 VERIFICATION OF STATE COURT RECORDS re1 Notice of Removal,, by Defendants Purdue Pharma LP, Purdue Pharma, Inc., The Purdue Frederick Company, Inc.(Adams, Thomas) [Transferred from wawd on 6/7/2019.] | |
Att: 1 Exhibit 1, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit 2, | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit 3, | ||
Att: 4 Exhibit 4, | ||
Att: 5 Exhibit 5, | ||
Att: 6 Exhibit 6, | ||
Att: 7 Exhibit 7, | ||
Att: 8 Exhibit 8, | ||
Att: 9 Exhibit 9, | ||
Att: 10 Exhibit 10, | ||
Att: 11 Exhibit 11, | ||
Att: 12 Exhibit 12, | ||
Att: 13 Exhibit 13, | ||
Att: 14 Exhibit 14, | ||
Att: 15 Exhibit 15, | ||
Att: 16 Exhibit 16, | ||
Att: 17 Exhibit 17, | ||
Att: 18 Exhibit 18, | ||
Att: 19 Exhibit 19 | ||
Thursday, March 14, 2019 | ||
Judge Thomas S. Zilly added. (GT) [Transferred from wawd on 6/7/2019.] | ||
NOTICE Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 7.1, Purdue Pharma LP, Purdue Pharma Inc, Purdue Frederick Company Inc, McKesson Corporation, Sevan Pharmacy LLC, and Statcare Inc must file a Corporate Disclosure Statement by 3/21/2019. (GT) [Transferred from wawd on 6/7/2019.] | ||
3 | 3 LETTER from Clerk to counsel re receipt of case from Snohomish County Superior Court and advising of WAWD case number and judge assignment. (GT) [Transferred from wawd on 6/7/2019.] | |
4 | 4 NOTICE of Related Case(s) 2:17-CV-00209-RSM, by Plaintiff Snohomish County. (Huck, Christopher) [Transferred from wawd on 6/7/2019.] | |
5 | 5 NOTICE of Pendency of Other Action in Northern District of Ohio, case number in other court 17-md-02804 ; filed by Defendants Purdue Frederick Company Inc, Purdue Pharma Inc, Purdue Pharma LP. (Adams, Thomas) [Transferred from wawd on 6/7/2019.] | |
Friday, March 15, 2019 | ||
6 | 6 SUPPLEMENT re1 Notice of Removal,, (McKesson's Supplemental Notice of Removal) by Defendant McKesson Corporation (Clifford, Dwain) [Transferred from wawd on 6/7/2019.] | |
7 | 7 VERIFICATION OF STATE COURT RECORDS re6 Supplement (Declaration of Dwain M. Clifford in Support of McKesson's Supplemental Notice of Removal) by Defendant McKesson Corporation(Clifford, Dwain) [Transferred from wawd on 6/7/2019.] | |
Att: 1 Attachment 1, | ||
Att: 2 Attachment 2, | ||
Att: 3 Attachment 3, | ||
Att: 4 Exhibit 1, | ||
Att: 5 Exhibit 2, | ||
Att: 6 Exhibit 3, | ||
Att: 7 Exhibit 4, | ||
Att: 8 Exhibit 5, | ||
Att: 9 Exhibit 6, | ||
Att: 10 Exhibit 7, | ||
Att: 11 Exhibit 8, | ||
Att: 12 Exhibit 9, | ||
Att: 13 Exhibit 10, | ||
Att: 14 Exhibit 11, | ||
Att: 15 Exhibit 12, | ||
Att: 16 Exhibit 13, | ||
Att: 17 Exhibit 14, | ||
Att: 18 Exhibit 15, | ||
Att: 19 Exhibit 16, | ||
Att: 20 Exhibit 17, | ||
Att: 21 Exhibit 18 | ||
8 | 8 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT indicating no Corporate Parents and/or Affiliates. Filed pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 7.1. Filed by McKesson Corporation (Clifford, Dwain) [Transferred from wawd on 6/7/2019.] | |
9 | 9 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT indicating no Corporate Parents and/or Affiliates. Filed pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 7.1. Filed by Purdue Frederick Company Inc, Purdue Pharma Inc, Purdue Pharma LP (Adams, Thomas) [Transferred from wawd on 6/7/2019.] | |
Monday, March 18, 2019 | ||
10 | 10 DEMAND for JURY TRIAL by Plaintiff Snohomish County (Huck, Christopher) [Transferred from wawd on 6/7/2019.] | |
11 | 11 Stipulated MOTION for Extension of Time for Defendants' to Respond to Complaint and Extend Plaintiff's Time to Move to Remand , filed by Defendants Purdue Frederick Company Inc, Purdue Pharma Inc, Purdue Pharma LP. Noting Date 3/18/2019, (Adams, Thomas) [Transferred from wawd on 6/7/2019.] | |
Tuesday, March 19, 2019 | ||
12 | 12 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT indicating no Corporate Parents and/or Affiliates. Filed pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 7.1. Filed by Sevan Pharmacy LLC (Peick, John) [Transferred from wawd on 6/7/2019.] | |
13 | 13 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT indicating no Corporate Parents and/or Affiliates. Filed pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 7.1. Filed by Statcare Inc PS (Norman, Eric) [Transferred from wawd on 6/7/2019.] | |
14 | 14 AMENDMENT to11 Stipulated MOTION for Extension of Time for Defendants' to Respond to Complaint and Extend Plaintiff's Time to Move to Remand by Defendants Purdue Frederick Company Inc, Purdue Pharma Inc, Purdue Pharma LP (Adams, Thomas) [Transferred from wawd on 6/7/2019.] | |
15 | 15 STIPULATION AND ORDER to extend defendants' time to respond to complaint and extend plaintiff's time to move to remand re parties'11 Stipulated Motion and14 Amendment. Signed by Judge Thomas S. Zilly. (SWT) [Transferred from wawd on 6/7/2019.] | |
Wednesday, March 20, 2019 | ||
16 | 16 NOTICE of Pendency of Other Action in Northern District of Ohio, case number in other court 17-md-02804 ; filed by Defendant McKesson Corporation. (Clifford, Dwain) [Transferred from wawd on 6/7/2019.] | |
Thursday, March 21, 2019 | ||
Attorney Derek Alan Newman,Rachel J Horvitz for Thrifty PayLess Inc added; per17 Notice of Appearance. (SWT) [Transferred from wawd on 6/7/2019.] | ||
17 | 17 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Keith P Scully on behalf of Defendant Thrifty PayLess Inc. (Scully, Keith) [Transferred from wawd on 6/7/2019.] | |
Monday, March 25, 2019 | ||
18 | 18 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT identifying Corporate Parent Rite Aid Corporation for Thrifty PayLess Inc. Filed pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 7.1. Filed by Thrifty PayLess Inc (Scully, Keith) [Transferred from wawd on 6/7/2019.] | |
19 | 19 STIPULATION AND PROPOSED ORDER TO STIPULATED MOTION AND [PROPOSED] ORDER TO EXTEND DEFENDANTS TIME TO RESPOND TO COMPLAINT AND EXTEND PLAINTIFFS TIME TO MOVE TO REMAND by parties (Scully, Keith) [Transferred from wawd on 6/7/2019.] | |
Thursday, April 18, 2019 | ||
20 | 20 NOTICE of Filing Affidavit of Service re: Purdue Frederick Company, Inc. ; filed by Plaintiff Snohomish County. (Huck, Christopher) [Transferred from wawd on 6/7/2019.] | |
21 | 21 NOTICE of Filing Affidavit of Service re: Purdue Pharma, Inc. ; filed by Plaintiff Snohomish County. (Huck, Christopher) [Transferred from wawd on 6/7/2019.] | |
22 | 22 NOTICE of Filing Affidavit of Service re: Purdue Pharma, L.P. ; filed by Plaintiff Snohomish County. (Huck, Christopher) [Transferred from wawd on 6/7/2019.] | |
23 | 23 NOTICE of Filing Declaration of Service re: Donald Dillinger ; filed by Plaintiff Snohomish County. (Huck, Christopher) [Transferred from wawd on 6/7/2019.] | |
24 | 24 NOTICE of Filing Declaration of Service re: McKesson Corporation ; filed by Plaintiff Snohomish County. (Huck, Christopher) [Transferred from wawd on 6/7/2019.] | |
25 | 25 NOTICE of Filing Declaration of Service re: Sevan Pharmacy, LLC ; filed by Plaintiff Snohomish County. (Huck, Christopher) [Transferred from wawd on 6/7/2019.] | |
26 | 26 NOTICE of Filing Declaration of Service re: Thrifty Payless, Inc. d/b/a Rite Aid ; filed by Plaintiff Snohomish County. (Huck, Christopher) [Transferred from wawd on 6/7/2019.] | |
Wednesday, April 24, 2019 | ||
27 | 27 PRAECIPE TO ISSUE SUMMONS by Plaintiff Snohomish County(Huck, Christopher) [Transferred from wawd on 6/7/2019.] | |
Att: 1 Summons, | ||
Att: 2 Summons, | ||
Att: 3 Summons, | ||
Att: 4 Summons, | ||
Att: 5 Summons | ||
Thursday, April 25, 2019 | ||
28 | 28 Summons(es) Electronically Issued as to defendant(s) Doctors Osteopathic Care PS Inc, NW Green Medical PLLC, NW Green Wellness PLLC, Statcare Inc PS, Delbert Whetstone (main document)(SWT) [Transferred from wawd on 6/7/2019.] | |
Att: 1 Summons for Doctors Osteopathic Care, | ||
Att: 2 Summons for NW Green Medical, | ||
Att: 3 Summons for NW Green Wellness, | ||
Att: 4 Summons for Statcare Inc | ||
29 | 29 WAIVER OF SERVICE of Summons upon defendant Statcare Inc PS mailed on 4/25/2019 (Huck, Christopher) [Transferred from wawd on 6/7/2019.] | |
Monday, May 13, 2019 | ||
30 | 30 MOTION to Remand , filed by Plaintiff Snohomish County. Oral Argument Requested. Noting Date 6/7/2019, (Huck, Christopher) [Transferred from wawd on 6/7/2019.] | |
Att: 1 Proposed Order PROPOSED ORDER Granting Motion to Remand | ||
31 | 31 DECLARATION of Christopher M. Huck filed by Plaintiff Snohomish County re30 MOTION to Remand(Huck, Christopher) [Transferred from wawd on 6/7/2019.] | |
Att: 1 Exhibit Exhibit A, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit Exhibit B, | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit Exhibit C, | ||
Att: 4 Exhibit Exhibit D, | ||
Att: 5 Exhibit Exhibit E, | ||
Att: 6 Exhibit Exhibit F, | ||
Att: 7 Exhibit Exhibit G | ||
Thursday, May 16, 2019 | ||
32 | 32 MOTION to Stay , filed by Defendants Purdue Frederick Company Inc, Purdue Pharma Inc, Purdue Pharma LP. Noting Date 5/31/2019, (Adams, Thomas) [Transferred from wawd on 6/7/2019.] | |
Att: 1 Proposed Order | ||
Tuesday, May 21, 2019 | ||
33 | 33 NOTICE that the following is RE-NOTED:32 MOTION to Stay . Filed by Defendants Purdue Frederick Company Inc, Purdue Pharma Inc, Purdue Pharma LP. Noting Date 7/19/2019, (Adams, Thomas) [Transferred from wawd on 6/7/2019.] | |
34 | 34 NOTICE that the following is RE-NOTED:30 MOTION to Remand . Filed by Plaintiff Snohomish County. Noting Date 7/19/2019, (Huck, Christopher) [Transferred from wawd on 6/7/2019.] | |
Wednesday, May 29, 2019 | ||
35 | 35 PRAECIPE TO ISSUE SUMMONS re Hieu Tue Le by Plaintiff Snohomish County (Huck, Christopher) [Transferred from wawd on 6/7/2019.] | |
Thursday, May 30, 2019 | ||
36 | 36 Summons Electronically Issued as to defendant Hieu Tue Le (SWT) [Transferred from wawd on 6/7/2019.] | |
37 | 37 MOTION to Correct Case Caption , filed by Plaintiff Snohomish County. Noting Date 6/14/2019, (Huck, Christopher) [Transferred from wawd on 6/7/2019.] | |
Att: 1 Proposed Order | ||
38 | 38 DECLARATION of Christopher M. Huck filed by Plaintiff Snohomish County re37 MOTION to Correct Case Caption(Huck, Christopher) [Transferred from wawd on 6/7/2019.] | |
Att: 1 Exhibit A, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit B | ||
39 | 39 NOTICE: Defendant Delbert Whetstone has registered to electronically file and receive electronic service in this case. (PS) [Transferred from wawd on 6/7/2019.] | |
Thursday, June 06, 2019 | ||
40 | 40 MDL 2804 TRANSFER ORDER in re National Prescription Opiate Litigation; directing transfer of case to the Northern District of Ohio; assigned to Judge Dan A. Polster.(PM) [Transferred from wawd on 6/7/2019.] | |
Att: 1 Email re: case transfer | ||
Friday, June 07, 2019 | ||
41 | 41 CASE TRANSFERRED IN from District of Washington Western. Case number 2:19-cv-00368. Original file, certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received. |