Texas Western District Court
Case #: 5:19-cr-00411
Case Filed:Jun 05, 2019
Terminated:Sep 14, 2022
Last checked: Saturday Jun 08, 2019 2:23 AM CDT
Defendant
Anthony Pujol (1)
Represented By
George B. Dombart
Attorney At Law
contact info
Marina Thais Douenat
Office Of The Federal Public Defender
contact info
Duty Pub. Defender-San Antonio
Federal Public Defender
contact info
Defendant
Vanessa Valenciana (2)
Represented By
Thomas A. Clarke
Attorney At Law
contact info
Plaintiff
USA
Represented By
Sam L. Ponder
Assistant United States Attorney
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/19/2025 5:01 PM CDT
Wednesday, May 15, 2019
Arrest of Anthony Pujol, Vanessa Belen Valenciana (bc) [5:19-mj-00538-ESC]
Related: [-]
1 1 COMPLAINT Signed by Judge Elizabeth S. Chestney as to Anthony Pujol (1), Vanessa Belen Valenciana (2). (bc) [5:19-mj-00538-ESC]
Related: [-]
2 2 MOTION to Continue, MOTION to Detain Defendant without Bond by USA as to Anthony Pujol. (bc) [5:19-mj-00538-ESC]
Related: [-]
3 3 MOTION to Continue, MOTION to Detain Defendant without Bond by USA as to Vanessa Belen Valenciana. (bc) [5:19-mj-00538-ESC]
Related: [-]
4 4 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Elizabeth S. Chestney:Initial Appearance as to Anthony Pujol, Vanessa Belen Valenciana held on 5/15/2019 (Minute entry documents are not available electronically.) (Court Reporter FTR Gold.) (bc)[5:19-mj-00538-ESC]
Related: [-]
5 5 CJA 23 Financial Affidavit by Anthony Pujol (SEALED pursuant to E-Government Act of 2002). (bc) [5:19-mj-00538-ESC]
Related: [-]
6 6 CJA 23 Financial Affidavit by Vanessa Belen Valenciana (SEALED pursuant to E-Government Act of 2002). (bc) [5:19-mj-00538-ESC]
Related: [-]
7 7 ORDER APPOINTING FEDERAL PUBLIC DEFENDER as to Anthony Pujol. Signed by Judge Elizabeth S. Chestney. (bc) [5:19-mj-00538-ESC]
Related: [-]
8 8 ORDER APPOINTING COUNSEL- Thomas A Clarke as to Vanessa Belen Valenciana. Signed by Judge Elizabeth S. Chestney. (bc) [5:19-mj-00538-ESC]
Related: [-]
9 9 ORDER OF TEMPORARY DETENTION: as to Anthony Pujol (Detention Hearing and Preliminary Hearing set for 5/29/2019 9:30 AM before Judge Richard B. Farrer) Granted2 MOTION to Continue filed by USA. Signed by Judge Elizabeth S. Chestney. (bc) [5:19-mj-00538-ESC]
Related: [-]
10 10 ORDER OF TEMPORARY DETENTION: as to Vanessa Belen Valenciana (Detention Hearing and Preliminary Hearing set for 5/20/2019 2:00 PM before Judge Richard B. Farrer) Granted3 MOTION to Continue filed by USA. Signed by Judge Elizabeth S. Chestney. (bc) [5:19-mj-00538-ESC]
Related: [-]
Monday, May 20, 2019
11 11 NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE: Marina Thais Douenat appearing for Anthony Pujol . Attorney Marina Thais Douenat added to party Anthony Pujol(pty:dft) (Douenat, Marina) [5:19-mj-00538-ESC]
Related: [-]
12 12 WAIVER of Detention Hearing by Vanessa Belen Valenciana (bc) [5:19-mj-00538-ESC]
Related: [-]
13 13 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Richard B. Farrer:Bond Hearing as to Vanessa Belen Valenciana held on 5/20/2019 (Minute entry documents are not available electronically.) (Court Reporter FTR Gold.) (bc) [5:19-mj-00538-ESC]
Related: [-]
14 14 AGREED ORDER Setting Conditions of Release as to Vanessa Belen Valenciana (2) $50,000.00 Unsecured Bond. Motions terminated:3 MOTION to Detain Defendant without Bond filed by USA. Signed by Judge Richard B. Farrer. (bc) [5:19-mj-00538-ESC]
Related: [-]
15 15 Unsecured Bond Filed as to Vanessa Belen Valenciana in amount of $50,000.00. (bc) [5:19-mj-00538-ESC]
Related: [-]
Monday, May 27, 2019
16 16 NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE: George B. Dombart appearing for Anthony Pujol . Attorney George B. Dombart added to party Anthony Pujol(pty:dft) (Dombart, George) [5:19-mj-00538-ESC]
Related: [-]
Tuesday, May 28, 2019
17 17 Waiver of Preliminary Hearing by Anthony Pujol (Dombart, George) [5:19-mj-00538-ESC]
Related: [-]
18 18 Waiver of Detention Hearing by Anthony Pujol (Dombart, George) [5:19-mj-00538-ESC]
Related: [-]
Wednesday, May 29, 2019
19 19 ORDER GRANTING2 Motion to Detain Defendant without Bond. Bond set to NO BOND as to Anthony Pujol (1). Signed by Judge Richard B. Farrer. (kh2) [5:19-mj-00538-ESC]
Related: [-]
Wednesday, June 05, 2019
20 20 3 pgs Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Elizabeth S. Chestney:Preliminary Hearing as to Oscar Ramirez held on 4/21/2020 (Minute entry documents are not available electronically.), Detention Hearing as to Oscar Ramirez held on 4/21/2020 (Minute entry documents are not available electronically.) (Court Reporter FTR Gold.) (vs1) [5:20-mj-00337-RBF]
Related: [-] dacted Version
22 22 Personal Data Sheet (SEALED) as to Anthony Pujol (mgr)
Related: [-]
23 23 ORDER Setting District Court Arraignment as to Anthony Pujol Arraignment set for 6/18/2019 2:00 PM before Judge Richard B. Farrer,. Signed by Judge Henry J. Bemporad. (mgr) Modified on 6/6/2019, to correct date (mgr).
Related: [-]
24 24 Personal Data Sheet (SEALED) as to Vanessa Valenciana (mgr)
Related: [-]
25 25 ORDER Setting District Court Arraignment as to Vanessa Valenciana Arraignment set for 6/18/2019 2:00 PM before Judge Richard B. Farrer,. Signed by Judge Henry J. Bemporad. (mgr)
Related: [-]