Florida Southern District Court
Case #: 1:19-cr-20141
Case Filed:Mar 12, 2019
Last checked: Monday Jun 10, 2019 3:16 AM EDT
Defendant
Juan Rojas (3)
Represented By
Alex A. Hanna
Law Offices Of Alex A. Hanna, PA
contact info
Defendant
Victor Rojas (2)
Represented By
Scott William Sakin
Scott W. Sakin, P.A.
contact info
Defendant
Ruben Dario Rojas Bascope (1)
Plaintiff
USA
Represented By
Timothy J. Abraham
United States Attorneys Office
contact info


Docket last updated: 06/10/2019 3:17 AM EDT
Tuesday, March 12, 2019
1 1 1 pgs MOTION to Seal by USA as to Ruben Dario Rojas Bascope, Victor Rojas, Juan Rojas. (nc)
Related: [-]
2 2 ORDER Granting1 Motion to Seal as to Ruben Dario Rojas Bascope (1), Victor Rojas (2), Juan Rojas (3). Signed by Ch. Magistrate Judge John J. O'Sullivan on 3/12/2019. See attached document for full details. (nc)
Related: [-]
3 3 7 pgs INDICTMENT as to Ruben Dario Rojas Bascope (1) count(s) 1, 2-4, Victor Rojas (2) count(s) 1, Juan Rojas (3) count(s) 1, 2-4 and Forfeiture. (nc) (nc).
Related: [-]
Att: 1 (3/13/2019) Restricted Unredacted Indictment