Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 7:19-bk-70516

Virginia Western Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 13
Judge:Paul M Black
Case #: 7:19-ap-07024
Nature of Suit21 Bankruptcy - Validity, priority or extent of lien or other interest in property
Case Filed:Jun 11, 2019
Terminated:Jan 05, 2022
Last checked: never
Defendant
BANK OF AMERICA, N.A., Defendant
P.O. Box 31785
TAMPA, FL 33631
Represented By
BANK OF AMERICA, N.A.
contact info
Defendant
PRLAP, Inc., Trustee, Defendant
1400 Best Plaza Drive
Richmond, VA 23227
Represented By
PRLAP, Inc., Trustee
contact info
Defendant
Christopher T. Micale, Defendant
Chapter 13 Trustee 15 Salem Ave SE Ste 300
Roanoke, VA 24011
Represented By
Christopher T. Micale
contact info
Plaintiff
Rita Annette McConnell, Plaintiff
10933 Pine Camp Road
Coeburn, VA 24230
Represented By
Max Cody Morris
Copeland Law Firm, P.C.
contact info
Plaintiff
Frederick Wayne McConnell, Plaintiff
10933 Pine Camp Road
Coeburn, VA 24230
Represented By
Max Cody Morris
Copeland Law Firm, P.C.
contact info


Docket last updated: 12 hours ago
Wednesday, January 05, 2022
18 18 court Close Adversary Case Wed 01/05 8:51 AM
Adversary Case 7:19-ap-7024 Closed (Rose, Ginger)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, December 21, 2021
17 17 order Disposition of Adversary Tue 12/21 9:51 AM
Disposition of Adversary 7:2019-ap-7024-pmb Amended Order on Complaint to Determine the Extent and Validity of a Secured Claim and to Avoid the Lien of said Claimant. Case to Be Closed if Applicable 01/4/2022. (Rose, Ginger)
Related: [-]
Friday, December 10, 2021
utility Reopen AP Case Fri 12/10 11:24 AM
Adversary Proceeding Reopened. (Hensley, Jackie)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, December 08, 2021
16 16 court Entry Wed 12/08 9:11 AM
Entry - Motion is moot as case has been reopened. This adversary proceeding is also reopened. Related [+] (Rose, Ginger)
Related: [-] 14 Motion to Reopen Case filed by Plaintiff Frederick Wayne McConnell, Plaintiff Rita Annette McConnell
Monday, December 06, 2021
15 15 misc Certificate of Mailing Mon 12/06 4:53 PM
Certificate of Mailing Filed by Robert Tayloe Copeland on behalf of Frederick Wayne McConnell, Rita Annette McConnell Related [+]. (Copeland, Robert)
Related: [-] 14 Motion to Reopen Case
14 14 motion Reopen Case Mon 12/06 4:52 PM
Motion to Reopen Case Filed by Plaintiffs Frederick Wayne McConnell, Rita Annette McConnell (Copeland, Robert)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, August 14, 2019
13 13 court Close Adversary Case Wed 08/14 7:29 AM
Adversary Case 7:19-ap-7024 Closed (Nash, Gaye)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, July 30, 2019
12 12 order Disposition of Adversary Tue 07/30 3:07 PM
Disposition of Adversary 7:2019-ap-7024-pmb. Amended Consent Order Resolving Complaint to Determine the Extent and Validity of a Secured Claim and to Avoid the Lien of said Claimant . Case to Be Closed if Applicable 08/13/2019. (Nash, Gaye)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, July 23, 2019
11 11 order Disposition of Adversary Tue 07/23 7:44 AM
Disposition of Adversary 7:2019-ap-7024-pmb. Consent Order Resolving Complaint to Determine the Extent and Validity of a Secured Claim and to Avoid the Lien of said Claimant . Case to Be Closed if Applicable 08/6/2019. (Nash, Gaye)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, July 10, 2019
10 10 cmp Amended Complaint Wed 07/10 10:54 AM
Amended Complaint by Robert Tayloe Copeland on behalf of Frederick Wayne McConnell, Rita Annette McConnell against BANK OF AMERICA, N.A., Christopher T. Micale, PRLAP, Inc.. Related [+]. (Copeland, Robert)
Related: [-] 1 Adversary case 19-07024 Complaint by Max Cody Morris on behalf of Rita Annette McConnell, Frederick Wayne McConnell against BANK OF AMERICA, N.A., PRLAP, Inc., Trustee, Christopher T. Micale. Receipt Number EXEMPT, Fee Amount $0.00. AP Service Due 07/31/2019. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A) Nature of Suit: (21 (Validity, priority or extent of lien or other interest in property)) (Morris, Max) Access to attachment restricted pursuant to Order entered 6/20/19 (d/e #6) Modified on 6/20/2019. filed by Plaintiff Frederick Wayne McConnell, Plaintiff Rita Annette McConnell
Att: 1 Exhibit Deed of Trust - redacted
Wednesday, July 03, 2019
9 9 misc Certificate Wed 07/03 2:52 PM
Certificate of service of Summons and Complaint Filed by Robert Tayloe Copeland on behalf of Frederick Wayne McConnell, Rita Annette McConnell Related [+]. (Copeland, Robert)
Related: [-] 2 Summons Issued to Attorney for Plaintiff
Att: 1 Returned Receipt
Saturday, June 22, 2019
8 8 court BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document Sun 06/23 12:53 AM
BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document. Related [+] No. of Notices: 4. Notice Date 06/22/2019. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 7 Order Directing Compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure 26 (a) and (f)
Thursday, June 20, 2019
7 7 order Directing Compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure 26 Thu 06/20 10:08 AM
Order Directing Compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure 26 (a) and (f) . Hearing scheduled 7/24/2019 at 10:30 AM at Abingdon, US District Courtroom, US Courthouse, 180 W. Main St., Abingdon, VA 24210. (Matherly, Leisa)
Related: [-]
6 6 order Redact/Restrict Thu 06/20 10:05 AM
Order Granting Motion to Redact/Restrict Related [+] (Matherly, Leisa)
Related: [-] 3
Wednesday, June 19, 2019
5 5 answer Answer Wed 06/19 4:15 PM
Answer to Related [+] Filed by Nisha Ryan Patel on behalf of BANK OF AMERICA, N.A. (Patel, Nisha)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint filed by Plaintiff Frederick Wayne McConnell, Plaintiff Rita Annette McConnell
Tuesday, June 18, 2019
4 4 crditcrd Auto-Docket of Credit Card/Debit Card Tue 06/18 3:44 PM
Receipt of Motion to Redact/Restrict 19-07024 [motion,mrdact] ( 25.00) Filing Fee. Receipt number 7707420. Fee amount 25.00. Related [+] (U.S. Treasury)
Related: [-] Doc#3
3 3 motion Redact/Restrict Tue 06/18 3:43 PM
Motion to Redact/Restrict Filed by Plaintiffs Frederick Wayne McConnell, Rita Annette McConnell (Copeland, Robert)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, June 12, 2019
2 2 cmp Summons Issued Wed 06/12 10:56 AM
Summons Issued to Attorney for Plaintiff Defendant Motion or Answer Due Date 7/12/2019. (White, Kristen)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, June 11, 2019
1 1 cmp Complaint Tue 06/11 12:57 PM
Adversary case 19-07024 Complaint by Max Cody Morris on behalf of Rita Annette McConnell, Frederick Wayne McConnell against BANK OF AMERICA, N.A., PRLAP, Inc., Trustee, Christopher T. Micale. Receipt Number EXEMPT, Fee Amount $0.00. AP Service Due 07/31/2019. Nature of Suit: (21 (Validity, priority or extent of lien or other interest in property)) (Morris, Max)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A