New Jersey District Court
Judge:Renee Marie Bumb
Case #: 8:19-cv-13327
Nature of Suit890 Other Statutes - Other Statutory Actions
CauseCivil Miscellaneous Case
Case Filed:Jun 11, 2019
Re-opened:Nov 04, 2024
Terminated:Nov 12, 2024
Case in other court:SUPREME COURT OF NEW JERSEY, D-184-17
Last checked: Sunday Dec 08, 2019 3:49 AM EST
Notice Only
attydisc
Respondent
IHAB AWAD IBRAHIM
Represented By
IHAB AWAD IBRAHIM
The Ibrahim Law Firm
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/16/2025 11:59 PM EDT
Tuesday, November 12, 2024
16 16 2 pgs order Order on Attorney Discipline (NEF to BK/Fin) Tue 11/12 5:40 PM
ORDER that Respondent, IHAB AWAD IBRAHIM, be and he hereby is restored to the practice of law before this Court and IHAB AWAD IBRAHIM, is reinstatement to the practice of law before this Court, subject to the Supreme Court's conditions. Signed by Chief Judge Renee Marie Bumb on 11/12/2024. (jd, )
Related: [-]
utility Terminate Civil Case Tue 11/12 5:41 PM
***Civil Miscellaneous Case Terminated. (jd, )
Related: [-]
Monday, November 04, 2024
15 15 misc Application/Petition Thu 11/07 4:05 PM
APPLICATION for reinstatement by Attorney, IHAB AWAD IBRAHIM.(jd, ) Modified on 11/7/2024 (jd, )
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Certificate of good standing
Monday, October 02, 2023
14 14 utility Remark (public) Mon 10/02 4:04 PM
Copy of D-10-23 from the Supreme Court of New Jersey reinstating IHAB AWAD IBRAHIM to practice, effective immediately, subject to the condition that respondent practice law under the supervision of a practicing attorney approved by the Office of Attorney Ethics for a period of two years. (qa, )
Related: [-]
Tuesday, July 11, 2023
12 12 2 pgs order Order on Attorney Discipline (NEF to BK/Fin) Tue 07/18 9:14 AM
ORDER that reciprocal discipline is imposed, pursuant to L. Civ. R. 104.1(b)(4), and that IHAB AWAD IBRAHIM, be and he hereby is suspended from the practice of law before this Court for a period of one year, effective retroactive to April 30, 2022, and until further Order of the Court. Signed by Chief Judge Renee Marie Bumb on 7/11/2023. (qa, )
Related: [-]
utility Terminate Civil Case Tue 07/18 9:16 AM
***Civil Miscellaneous Case Terminated. (qa, )
Related: [-]
Monday, June 05, 2023
10 10 minutes Miscellaneous Hearing Mon 06/05 10:34 AM
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Chief Judge Renee Marie Bumb: Miscellaneous Hearing held on 6/5/2023. On return day of Order to Show Cause for respondent Ihab Awad Ibrahim, Esquire, why the imposition of identical, reciprocal discipline by this Court would be unwarranted and the reasons therefor. Response on behalf of respondent filed with no objection to reciprocal discipline. Order to be entered. (Court Reporter, None) (ar1, )
Related: [-]
Friday, May 12, 2023
9 9 service Certified Mail Receipt Returned Fri 05/12 3:54 PM
Certified Mail Receipt Returned sent to counsel on behalf of IHAB AWAD IBRAHIM, re7 Order to Show Cause. (qa, )
Related: [-]
Wednesday, May 10, 2023
8 8 misc Certification Wed 05/10 2:31 PM
Certification on behalf of IHAB AWAD IBRAHIM. (POPLAR, CARL)
Related: [-]
Thursday, April 27, 2023
7 7 2 pgs order Order to Show Cause Thu 04/27 10:40 AM
ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE: ORDERED, pursuant to L. Civ. R. 104.1(b) and Standing Order 2023-01, that respondent show cause, in writing, on or before 5/30/2023 why the imposition of identical, reciprocal discipline by this Court would be unwarranted and the reasons therefor. Signed by Chief Judge Renee Marie Bumb on 4/27/2023. (qa, )
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 25, 2023
6 6 order Order Reassigning Case Tue 04/25 2:24 PM
TEXT ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Chief Judge Renee Marie Bumb for all further proceedings. Judge Esther Salas no longer assigned to case. So Ordered by Chief Judge Renee Marie Bumb on 4/25/2023. (qa, )
Related: [-]
Thursday, January 05, 2023
5 5 utility Remark (public) Thu 01/05 11:21 AM
Copy of Order R-18-20 from the Supreme Court of New Jersey denying the petition for review. (qa, )
Related: [-]
4 4 utility Remark (public) Thu 01/05 11:19 AM
Copy of Order D-100-21 from the Supreme Court of New Jersey suspending IHAB AWAD IBRAHIM from the practice of law for a period of one year, effective April 11, 2022, and until the further Order of the Court. (qa, )
Related: [-]
Monday, April 11, 2022
3 3 misc Letter Wed 04/13 2:31 PM
Letter Regarding Upcoming Ineligibility from Ihab Ibrahim. (qa, )
Related: [-]
Tuesday, January 25, 2022
utility Terminate Civil Case Tue 01/25 9:20 AM
***Civil Miscellaneous Case Terminated. (qa, )
Related: [-]
Tuesday, December 08, 2020
2 2 utility Remark (public) Tue 12/08 5:01 PM
Copy of Order D-84-19 from the Supreme Court of New Jersey censuring IHAB AWAD IBRAHIM. (qa, )
Related: [-]
Monday, February 24, 2020
utility Terminate Civil Case Tue 02/25 4:59 PM
***Civil Miscellaneous Case Terminated. (qa, )
Related: [-]
Tuesday, June 11, 2019
1 1 utility Remark (public) Tue 06/11 3:59 PM
Copy of Order D-184-17 from the Supreme Court of New Jersey censuring respondent, IHAB AWAD IBRAHIM (Ti)
Related: [-]