Seoul Semiconductor Co., LTD et al v. The Factory Depot Advantages, Inc.
California Central District Court | |
Judge: | George H Wu |
Referred: | Alka Sagar |
Case #: | 2:19-cv-05065 |
Nature of Suit | 830 Property Rights - Patent |
Cause | 35:271 Patent Infringement |
Case Filed: | Jun 11, 2019 |
Terminated: | Aug 24, 2020 |
Last checked: Sunday Dec 08, 2019 12:20 AM PST |
Defendant
The Factory Depot Advantages, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Seoul Semiconductor Co., LTD
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Seoul Viosys Co., Ltd.
|
Represented By
|
ThirdParty Defendant
Bluestar Inc.
|
Represented By
|
ThirdParty Defendant
The Factory Depot Advantages, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
ThirdParty Plaintiff
The Factory Depot Advantages, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 04/30/2024 11:59 PM PDT |
Monday, August 24, 2020 | ||
44 | 44
judgmentCV
Judgment - Consent Permanent Injunction
Wed 08/26 10:17 AM
CONSENT JUDGMENT AND PERMANENT INJUNCTION by Judge George H. Wu in favor of plaintiffs Seoul Semiconductor Co., LTD, and Seoul Viosys Co., Ltd. against defendant The Factory Depot Advantages, Inc. Related to: Stipulation for Judgment,43 . (See document for details) (MD JS-6. Case Terminated) (mrgo) |
|
43 | 43
stip
Judgment
Mon 08/24 8:38 AM
Joint STIPULATION for Judgment as to against Defendant The Factory Depot Advantages, Inc. and in favor of Plaintiffs Seoul Semiconductor Co., Ltd. and Seoul Viosys Co., Ltd. filed by Plaintiffs Seoul Semiconductor Co., LTD, Seoul Viosys Co., Ltd..(Wang, Stacey) |
|
Att: 1 [PROPOSED] Consent Judgment and Permanent Injunction | ||
Tuesday, July 28, 2020 | ||
42 | 42
3
pgs
order
Order ~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings
Wed 07/29 9:17 AM
ORDER GRANTING JOINT STIPULATION RE PRE-TRIAL DEADLINES by Judge George H. Wu, re Stipulation to Amend/Correct,41 . Close of Fact Discovery deadline is 10/14/2020. Last day to hear motions is 11/23/20. (See document for additional deadlines and hearings) (mrgo) |
|
Friday, July 24, 2020 | ||
41 | 41
stip
Amend/Correct
Fri 07/24 3:56 PM
Joint STIPULATION to Amend Minutes of In Chambers Order/Directive - no proceeding held,, Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings,38 filed by Plaintiffs Seoul Semiconductor Co., LTD, Seoul Viosys Co., Ltd..(Wang, Stacey) |
|
Att: 1 Proposed Order | ||
Friday, July 17, 2020 | ||
40 | 40
order
Protective Order
Fri 07/17 4:01 PM
PROTECTIVE ORDER by Magistrate Judge Alka Sagar re Stipulation for Protective Order39 . (see document for details) (hr) |
|
Thursday, July 16, 2020 | ||
39 | 39
stip
Protective Order
Thu 07/16 4:37 PM
STIPULATION for Protective Order filed by Plaintiffs Seoul Semiconductor Co., LTD, Seoul Viosys Co., Ltd..(Wang, Stacey) |
|
38 | 38
order
Minutes of In Chambers Order/Directive - no proceeding held ~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings
Thu 07/16 12:10 PM
MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS - ORDER by Judge George H. Wu. Pursuant to the parties' Statement and the fact that several dates set is this matter were based upon the day that the final claims constr11ction order was issued (which is not longer applicable), the scheduling previously delineated is amended as follows. See minute order for new dates / deadlines. (lom) |
|
Thursday, July 09, 2020 | ||
37 | 37
notice
Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel (G-123)
Thu 07/09 4:30 PM
Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Stacey Hsiang Chun Wang counsel for Plaintiffs Seoul Semiconductor Co., LTD, Seoul Viosys Co., Ltd.. Adding Jennifer L. Jonak as counsel of record for Seoul Semiconductor Co., Ltd. and Seoul Viosys Co., Ltd. for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Plaintiffs Seoul Semiconductor Co., Ltd. and Seoul Viosys Co., Ltd.. (Wang, Stacey) |
|
Thursday, April 23, 2020 | ||
36 | 36
misc
Statement
Thu 04/23 2:53 PM
STATEMENT JOINT CLAIM CONSTRUCTION AND PREHEARING STATEMENT filed by Plaintiffs Seoul Semiconductor Co., LTD, Seoul Viosys Co., Ltd. (Wang, Stacey) |
|
Wednesday, January 15, 2020 | ||
35 | 35
respoth
Amended Answer to Complaint
Wed 01/15 4:33 PM
AMENDED ANSWER (FIRST) to Third Party Complaint17 filed by Third Party Defendant Bluestar Inc.. (Petito, Deborah) |
|
Friday, December 20, 2019 | ||
34 | 34
order
Appear Pro Hac Vice
Mon 12/23 8:48 AM
ORDER by Judge George H. Wu: granting32 Non-Resident Attorney Lucas T. Elliot APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of 3rd party defendant United Radio Inc, designating Deborah H. Petito as local counsel. (mrgo) |
|
Wednesday, December 18, 2019 | ||
32 | 32
motion
Appear Pro Hac Vice (G-64)
Wed 12/18 12:19 PM
APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Lucas T. Elliot to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of ThirdParty Defendant Bluestar Inc. (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $400 Fee Paid, Receipt No. 0973-24976409) filed by Third Party Defendant United Radio Incorporated dba Bluestar Bluestar Inc.. (Hyam, Stephen) |
|
Att: 1 Proposed Order | ||
Tuesday, December 17, 2019 | ||
33 | 33
order
Minutes of In Chambers Order/Directive - no proceeding held ~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings
Wed 12/18 1:50 PM
MINUTES: SCHEDULING CONFERENCE by Judge George H. Wu: (See minutes for further details) (yl) |
|
Monday, December 16, 2019 | ||
31 | 31
minutes
Scheduling Conference - optional html form ~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings
Tue 12/17 4:04 PM
MINUTES OF Scheduling Conference held before Judge George H. Wu. A post mediation status conference is set for September 10, 2020 at 8:30 a.m. Parties may mediate up to and including September 9, 2020 Court Reporter: Terri A. Hourigan. (SEE MINUTES FOR FURTHER DETAILS) (yl) |
|
Monday, December 09, 2019 | ||
30 | 30
misc
Joint Report Rule 26(f) Discovery Plan
Mon 12/09 1:02 PM
JOINT REPORT Rule 26(f) Discovery Plan ; estimated length of trial 5 to 8 days, filed by Plaintiffs Seoul Semiconductor Co., LTD, Seoul Viosys Co., Ltd... (Wang, Stacey) |
|
Thursday, November 21, 2019 | ||
29 | 29
textonly
Text Only Scheduling Notice
Thu 11/21 8:52 AM
TEXT-ONLY ENTRY (IN CHAMBERS): by Judge George H. Wu: Pursuant to the request of Plaintiff's counsel, the SCHEDULING CONFERENCE previously scheduled for 12/05/2019 is CONTINUED to 12/16/2019 at 08:30 AM before Judge George H. Wu. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (jag) |
|
Thursday, November 14, 2019 | ||
28 | 28
2
pgs
order
Order ~Util - Set/Reset Hearings
Mon 11/18 2:21 PM
ORDER GRANTING STIPULATION TO CONTINUE SCHEDULING CONFERENCE O DECEMBER 5, 2019 8:30 AM27 by Judge George H. Wu (lc) |
|
Wednesday, November 13, 2019 | ||
27 | 27
stip
Continue
Wed 11/13 9:26 AM
STIPULATION to Continue Scheduling Conference from November 20, 2019 to December 6, 2019 filed by Third-Party Defendant Bluestar Inc..(Hyam, Stephen) |
|
Att: 1 Proposed Order | ||
Wednesday, November 06, 2019 | ||
26 | 26
notice
Certificate/Notice of Interested Parties
Wed 11/06 3:51 PM
NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Third-Party Defendant Bluestar Inc., identifying United Radio Incorporated and Bluestar. (Hyam, Stephen) |
|
25 | 25
answer
Answer to Third Party Complaint
Wed 11/06 3:47 PM
ANSWER to Third Party Complaint17 filed by Third-Party Defendant Bluestar Inc..(Attorney Stephen Eric Hyam added to party Bluestar Inc.(pty:3pd))(Hyam, Stephen) |
|
Friday, September 20, 2019 | ||
24 | 24
2
pgs
order
Order ~Util - Set/Reset Hearings
Wed 09/25 11:05 AM
ORDER GRANTING JOINT STIPULATION TO CONTINUE SCHEDULING CONFERENCE DATE by Judge George H. Wu, re Stipulation to Continue23 . (Scheduling Conference reset for 11/20/2019 at 08:30 AM before Judge George H. Wu.) (mrgo) |
|
Thursday, September 19, 2019 | ||
23 | 23
stip
Continue
Thu 09/19 5:04 PM
Joint STIPULATION to Continue SCHEDULING CONFERENCE DATE from October 10, 2019 to November 20, 2019 filed by Plaintiffs Seoul Semiconductor Co., LTD, Seoul Viosys Co., Ltd..(Wang, Stacey) |
|
Att: 1 Proposed Order | ||
Wednesday, September 11, 2019 | ||
22 | 22
service
Waiver of Service Executed
Wed 09/11 2:18 PM
WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by Defendant The Factory Depot Advantages, Inc.. upon Bluestar Inc. waiver sent by Plaintiff on 9/9/2019, answer due 11/8/2019. Waiver of Service signed by Jeffrey Rosenstiel. (Campitiello, Lawrence) |
|
Friday, September 06, 2019 | ||
21 | 21
order
Minutes of In Chambers Order/Directive - no proceeding held ~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings
Fri 09/06 3:26 PM
MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS - ORDER SETTING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE by Judge George H. Wu. The Court sets a Scheduling Conference for October 10, 2019 at 8:30 a.m. Counsel are reminded of their obligations to disclose information, confer on a discovery plan, and report to the Court, as required by F.R.C.P. 26 and the Local Rules of this Court. Trial counsel are ordered to be present. A Joint 26(f) Report shall be filed with the Court no later than September 26, 2019. See Local Rule 26-1. (lom) |
|
Wednesday, September 04, 2019 | ||
20 | 20
service
Summons Issued
Wed 09/04 3:30 PM
21 DAY Summons Issued re Third Party Complaint17 as to Third Party Defendant Bluestar Inc. (yl) |
|
Friday, August 30, 2019 | ||
19 | 19
notice
Summons Request
Fri 08/30 12:06 PM
Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Third Party Complaint17 filed by Third party plaintiff The Factory Depot Advantages, Inc.. (Campitiello, Lawrence) |
|
18 | 18
notice
Certificate/Notice of Interested Parties
Fri 08/30 12:04 PM
CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties filed by defendant All Defendants, identifying Tianquan Lai. (Campitiello, Lawrence) |
|
17 | 17
cmp
Third Party Complaint
Fri 08/30 12:00 PM
THIRD PARTY COMPLAINT against Blue Star, Inc. The Factory Depot Advantages, Inc., filed by Defendant The Factory Depot Advantages, Inc..(Campitiello, Lawrence) |
|
16 | 16
answer
Answer to Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening)
Fri 08/30 11:56 AM
ANSWER to Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening),1 of Seoul Semiconductor, Co., et al. filed by Defendant The Factory Depot Advantages, Inc..(Campitiello, Lawrence) |
|
Friday, August 02, 2019 | ||
15 | 15
order
Extending Answer Due Deadline
Mon 08/05 2:17 PM
ORDER APPROVING STIPULATION FOR FURTHER EXTENSION OF TIME TO FILE A RESPONSIVE PLEADING by Judge George H. Wu re Stipulation Extending Time to Answer (30 days or less),12 . Defendant The Factory Depot Advantages, Inc's answer due 9/2/2019. (mrgo) |
|
14 | 14
notice
Deficiency in Electronically Filed Documents (G-112A) - optional html form
Fri 08/02 9:01 AM
NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Documents RE: Second REQUEST for Extension of Time to File a Responsive Pleading13 . The following error(s) was/were found: Incorrect event selected. Correct event to be used is: Extension of Time. Proposed Document was not submitted as separate attachment. Other error(s) with document(s): To find the correct efiling event, see: Other Filings - Stipulation - Extension of Time. In response to this notice, the Court may: (1) order an amended or correct document to be filed; (2) order the document stricken; or (3) take other action as the Court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the Court directs you to do so. (lom) |
|
Thursday, August 01, 2019 | ||
13 | 13
motion
Extension of Time to File Document
Thu 08/01 8:46 AM
Second REQUEST for Extension of Time to File a Responsive Pleading filed by Defendant The Factory Depot Advantages, Inc.. (Campitiello, Lawrence) |
|
Wednesday, July 03, 2019 | ||
12 | 12
stip
Extending Time to Answer (30 days or less)
Wed 07/03 9:17 AM
STIPULATION Extending Time to Answer the complaint as to The Factory Depot Advantages, Inc. answer now due 8/2/2019, re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening),1 filed by Defendant The Factory Depot Advantages, Inc..(Attorney Lawrence G Campitiello added to party The Factory Depot Advantages, Inc. (pty:dft))(Campitiello, Lawrence) |
|
Thursday, June 20, 2019 | ||
11 | 11
10
pgs
order
Order
Thu 06/20 1:07 PM
Standing Order Re Final Pre-Trial Conferences for Civil Jury Trials Before Judge George H. Wu by Judge George H. Wu. (See document for details) (mrgo) |
|
Tuesday, June 18, 2019 | ||
10 | 10
order
Appear Pro Hac Vice
Thu 06/20 11:43 AM
ORDER by Judge George H. Wu: granting9 Non-Resident Attorney Michael B. Eisenberg APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of plaintiffs, designating Stacey H. Wang as local counsel. (mrgo) |
|
9 | 9
motion
Appear Pro Hac Vice (G-64)
Tue 06/18 11:34 AM
APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Michael B. Eisenberg to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiffs Seoul Semiconductor Co., LTD, Seoul Viosys Co., Ltd. (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $400 Fee Paid, Receipt No. 0973-23938844) filed by Plaintiff Seoul Semiconductor Co., LTD, Seoul Viosys Co., Ltd.. (Wang, Stacey) |
|
Att: 1 Proposed Order | ||
Wednesday, June 12, 2019 | ||
8 | 8
service
Summons Issued (Attorney Civil Case Opening)
Wed 06/12 9:58 AM
21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening),1 as to Defendant The Factory Depot Advantages, Inc. (car) |
|
7 | 7
attorney
Pro Hac Vice Application Due (G-109) - optional html form
Wed 06/12 9:56 AM
NOTICE OF PRO HAC VICE APPLICATION DUE for Non-Resident Attorney Michael B Eisenberg. A document recently filed in this case lists you as an out-of-state attorney of record. However, the Court has not been able to locate any record that you are admitted to the Bar of this Court, and you have not filed an application to appear Pro Hac Vice in this case. Accordingly, within 5 business days of the date of this notice, you must either (1) have your local counsel file an application to appear Pro Hac Vice (Form G-64) and pay the applicable fee, or (2) complete the next section of this form and return it to the court at cacd_attyadm@cacd.uscourts.gov. You have been removed as counsel of record from the docket in this case, and you will not be added back to the docket until your Pro Hac Vice status has been resolved. (car) |
|
6 | 6
adr
Notice to Parties of Court-Directed ADR Program (ADR-8) - optional html form
Wed 06/12 9:32 AM
NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (car) |
|
5 | 5
notice
Notice of Assignment to United States Judges (CV-18) - optional html form
Wed 06/12 9:32 AM
NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge George H. Wu and Magistrate Judge Alka Sagar. (car) |
|
Tuesday, June 11, 2019 | ||
4 | 4
notice
Certificate/Notice of Interested Parties
Tue 06/11 3:22 PM
CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff Seoul Semiconductor Co., LTD, (Wang, Stacey) |
|
3 | 3
notice
Summons Request
Tue 06/11 3:11 PM
Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening),1 filed by Plaintiff Seoul Semiconductor Co., LTD. (Wang, Stacey) |
|
2 | 2
misc
Civil Cover Sheet (CV-71)
Tue 06/11 3:01 PM
CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff Seoul Semiconductor Co., LTD. (Wang, Stacey) |
|
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening)
Tue 06/11 2:50 PM
COMPLAINT Receipt No: 0973-23900787 - Fee: $400, filed by Plaintiff Seoul Semiconductor Co., LTD. (Attorney Stacey Hsiang Chun Wang added to party Seoul Semiconductor Co., LTD(pty:pla))(Wang, Stacey) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit 1, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit 2, | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit 3, | ||
Att: 4 Exhibit 4, | ||
Att: 5 Exhibit 5, | ||
Att: 6 Exhibit 6, | ||
Att: 7 Exhibit 7, | ||
Att: 8 Exhibit 8, | ||
Att: 9 Exhibit 9, | ||
Att: 10 Exhibit 10 |