ALLEN v 3M COMPANY et al
Consolidated
Lead case: 3:19-md-02885
Lead case: 3:19-md-02885
Florida Northern District Court | |
Judge: | M Casey Rodgers |
Referred: | Gary R Jones |
Case #: | 3:19-cv-01679 |
Nature of Suit | 365 Torts - Personal Injury - Product Liability |
Cause | 28:1332 Diversity-Product Liability |
Case Filed: | Jun 13, 2019 |
Case in other court: | Louisiana Middle, 3:19-cv-00338 |
Last checked: Tuesday Dec 10, 2019 4:04 AM EST |
Defendant
3M COMPANY
|
|
Defendant
AEARO TECHNOLOGIES LLC
|
|
Plaintiff
DANIAL ALLEN
641 Spring Cove Drive
Baton Rouge, LA 70810 |
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 05/30/2023 11:59 PM EDT |
Wednesday, October 30, 2019 | ||
12 | 12
cmp
Amended Complaint
Wed 10/30 2:23 PM
AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants All Defendants., filed by DANIAL ALLEN. (ZAINEY, JAY) |
|
11 | 11
notice
Notice of Change of Address
Wed 10/30 1:49 PM
NOTICE of Change of Address by JAY C ZAINEY, JR (ZAINEY, JAY) |
|
Wednesday, July 03, 2019 | ||
10 | 10
notice
Notice - Other - See Separate Menu for Ntc of Appeal Options
Wed 07/03 9:54 AM
NOTICE of Proof of Service by DANIAL ALLEN (ZAINEY, JAY) |
|
9 | 9
notice
Notice - Other - See Separate Menu for Ntc of Appeal Options
Wed 07/03 9:53 AM
NOTICE of Proof of Service by DANIAL ALLEN (ZAINEY, JAY) |
|
8 | 8
notice
Notice of Appearance
Wed 07/03 9:47 AM
NOTICE of Appearance by JAY C ZAINEY, JR on behalf of DANIAL ALLEN (ZAINEY, JAY) |
|
Thursday, June 13, 2019 | ||
7 | 7
notice
Notice - Other - See Separate Menu for Ntc of Appeal Options
Thu 06/13 9:23 AM
NOTICE REGARDING ATTORNEY ADMISSION TO ATTORNEYS OF RECORD: Brad Cranmer, Collin Roy Melancon, Jay C. Zainey, Jr., Kelley Randlev Dick, Jr., and Scott Michael Mansfield. (Attachment #1 NOTICE REGARDING ELECTRONIC FILING REQUIREMENT). (djb) |
|
6 | 6
transfer
Case Transferred In - District Transfer (COURT USE ONLY)
Thu 06/13 8:43 AM
Case transferred in from District of Louisiana Middle; Case Number 3:19-cv-00338. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received. |
|
Wednesday, June 12, 2019 | ||
5 | 5 Order Transferring Case to JPML Court.(LLH) [Transferred from Louisiana Middle on 6/13/2019.] | |
Att: 1 Conditional Transfer Order | ||
4 | 4 Initial Conditional Transfer Order from the JPML Panel. (LLH) [Transferred from Louisiana Middle on 6/13/2019.] | |
Att: 1 Minute Entry NEF | ||
Thursday, June 06, 2019 | ||
3 | 3 SCHEDULING CONFERENCE ORDER: Scheduling Conference set for 8/8/2019 at 02:30 PM in chambers before Magistrate Judge Richard L. Bourgeois Jr. Status Report due by 7/25/2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Richard L. Bourgeois, Jr. on 6/4/2019. (SGO) [Transferred from Louisiana Middle on 6/13/2019.] | |
Tuesday, June 04, 2019 | ||
Case reassigned to Judge John W. deGravelles. Chief Judge Shelly D. Dick no longer assigned to the case. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no hyperlink or PDF document associated with this entry.) (KAH) [Transferred from Louisiana Middle on 6/13/2019.] | ||
Friday, May 31, 2019 | ||
2 | 2 Summons Issued as to 3M Company, Aearo Technologies, LLC. (NOTICE: Counsel shall print and serve both the summons and all attachments in accordance with Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 4.) (KAH) [Transferred from Louisiana Middle on 6/13/2019.] | |
Thursday, May 30, 2019 | ||
1 | 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number ALAMDC-1949161.), filed by Danial Allen.(Mansfield, Scott) Modified on 5/31/2019 to flatten the documents (KAH). [Transferred from Louisiana Middle on 6/13/2019.] | |
Att: 1 Attachment Civil Case Sheet, | ||
Att: 2 Attachment Summons - 3M Company, | ||
Att: 3 Attachment Summons - Aearo Technologies, LLC |