Indiana Northern District Court
Judge:Damon R Leichty
Referred: Susan L Collins
Case #: 1:19-cv-00261
Nature of Suit442 Civil Rights - Employment
Cause28:1441 Petition for Removal - Employment Discrim
Case Filed:Jun 14, 2019
Terminated:Sep 27, 2019
Case in other court:Allen Superior Court, 02C01-1905-PL-000187
Last checked: Wednesday Dec 11, 2019 4:04 AM EST
Defendant
The Otis R Bowen Center for Human Services, Inc
Represented By
Rachel K Steinhofer
Barrett Mcnagny LLP
contact info
Anthony M Stites
Barrett Mcnagny LLP
contact info
Mediator
Daniel Sigler
Plaintiff
Mary B Johnson PhD
Represented By
Samuel L Bolinger
contact info
TERMINATED PARTIES
Defendant
Bowen Center
Terminated: 08/07/2019
Represented By
Rachel K Steinhofer
Barrett Mcnagny LLP
contact info
Anthony M Stites
Barrett Mcnagny LLP
contact info


Docket last updated: 7 hours ago
Friday, September 27, 2019
26 26 order Order Dismissing Case ~Util - Terminate Motions Terminate Civil Case Fri 09/27 11:41 AM
ORDER DISMISSING CASE with prejudice pursuant to Rule 41(a)(1)(A)(ii) and the plaintiff's25 Stipulation to dismiss. This is a text-only entry approved by Judge Damon R Leichty on 9/27/19. (dk)
Related: [-]
Thursday, September 26, 2019
25 25 motion Dismiss Thu 09/26 3:41 PM
MOTION to Dismiss Stipulated by Plaintiff Mary B Johnson PhD. (Bolinger, Samuel)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, August 20, 2019
24 24 answer Answer to Amended Complaint Tue 08/20 1:36 PM
ANSWER to21 Amended Complaint, by Bowen Center.(Steinhofer, Rachel)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, August 14, 2019
23 23 2 pgs order Order Reassigning Case Wed 08/14 5:44 PM
ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Judge Damon R Leichty for all further proceedings. Judge Holly A Brady no longer assigned to case. Signed by Chief Judge Theresa L Springmann on 8/14/19. (ksc)
Related: [-]
22 22 minutes Pretrial Conference - Preliminary - customized ddls & hrgs Wed 08/14 11:16 AM
RULE 16 PRELIMINARY PRETRIAL CONFERENCE held on 8/14/2019 before Magistrate Judge Susan L Collins. Pla appeared with atty Samuel Bolinger. Dft appeared by atty Rachel Steinhofer and Stacy Lohse, VP, Corp. The11 Report of the Parties Planning Meeting is approved in all respects (except dispositive motions deadline and establishment of a trial date) and is hereby made an ORDER of the Court. The Summary Judgment deadline in Fed.R.Civ.P. 56(b) SHALL NOT control. Any dispositive motion SHALL brief out in accordance with L.R. 56-1. DISCOVERY DEADLINE is 7/24/2020. Following the close of discovery, unless otherwise ordered by the Court, the assigned District Judge will establish all further deadlines and dates. Daniel Sigler appointed as Mediator. Atty Bolinger to notify Mediator by letter, copy to atty Steinhofer. Results of the Mediation shall be filed with the Court no later than 10 days before the Final Pretrial Conference. Magistrate Consent forms due by 9/4/2019. (FTR 1st floor.) (mr)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, August 07, 2019
21 21 cmp Amended Complaint Wed 08/07 12:35 PM
AMENDED COMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES against Bowen Center, filed by Mary B Johnson PhD.(Bolinger, Samuel)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit Charge of Discrimination,
Att: 2 Exhibit Charge of Discrimination,
Att: 3 Exhibit Dismissal and Notice of Rights,
Att: 4 Exhibit Dismissal and Notice of Rights
20 20 order Order ~Util - Terminate Motions ~Util - Set Hearings 1 - Terminate Hearings Wed 08/07 8:53 AM
ORDER for Magistrate Judge Susan Collins: Dft's unopposed19 Motion to Continue Preliminary Pretrial Conference is granted. The Rule 16 Preliminary Pretrial Conference set for 8/7/2019 at 9:30 am is VACATED and RESET for 8/14/2019 at 11:00 am in US District Court - Fort Wayne. Text entry order.(mr)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, August 06, 2019
19 19 motion Continue Tue 08/06 6:12 PM
MOTION to Continue Preliminary Pretrial Conference of August 7, 2019 by Plaintiff Mary B Johnson PhD. (Bolinger, Samuel)
Related: [-]
Friday, August 02, 2019
18 18 1 pgs order Order on Motion to Amend/Correct Fri 08/02 11:13 AM
ORDER granting16 Motion to Amend/Correct. Plaintiff is AFFORDED to and including 8/9/19 to file the amended complaint and exhibits (DE 16-1). Signed by Magistrate Judge Susan L Collins on 8/2/19. (nal)
Related: [-]
Thursday, August 01, 2019
17 17 notice Notice - Other Thu 08/01 3:01 PM
NOTICE by Bowen Center re16 First MOTION to Amend/Correct Complaint for Damages (Notice of No Objection) (Steinhofer, Rachel)
Related: [-]
Monday, July 29, 2019
16 16 motion Amend/Correct Mon 07/29 3:57 PM
First MOTION to Amend/Correct Complaint for Damages by Plaintiff Mary B Johnson PhD.(Bolinger, Samuel)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit Amended Complaint and Exhibits
Friday, July 26, 2019
15 15 order Order ~Util - Terminate Motions ~Util - Set Hearings 1 - Terminate Hearings Fri 07/26 11:33 AM
ORDER for Magistrate Judge Susan Collins: Pla's unopposed14 Motion to Continue Preliminary Pretrial Conference is granted. The Preliminary Pretrial Conference set for 7/29/2019 at 9:30 am is VACATED and RESET for 8/7/2019 at 9:30 am in US District Court - Fort Wayne. Text entry order.(mr)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, July 23, 2019
14 14 motion Continue Tue 07/23 7:04 PM
MOTION to Continue Preliminary Pretrial Conference of July 29, 2019 by Plaintiff Mary B Johnson PhD. (Bolinger, Samuel)
Related: [-]
Friday, July 19, 2019
13 13 order Order ~Util - Terminate Motions ~Util - Set Deadlines Fri 07/19 9:53 AM
ORDER for Magistrate Judge Susan Collins:12 Dft's Unopposed Motion for Second Extension of Time to Answer Complaint is granted. Dft granted to and including 8/2/2019 to file an Answer to Complaint. Text entry order.(mr)
Related: [-]
Thursday, July 18, 2019
12 12 motion Extension of Time to File Answer Thu 07/18 1:17 PM
Second MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer to Complaint by Defendant Bowen Center. (Stites, Anthony)
Related: [-]
11 11 misc Report of Rule 26f Planning Meeting Thu 07/18 1:15 PM
REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. (Stites, Anthony)
Related: [-]
Monday, July 08, 2019
10 10 misc Certificate Mon 07/08 12:02 PM
CERTIFICATE Certification by Attorney and Client . (Stites, Anthony)
Related: [-]
Thursday, June 20, 2019
9 9 misc Corporate Disclosure Statement Thu 06/20 9:56 AM
Corporate Disclosure Statement by Bowen Center. (Stites, Anthony)
Related: [-]
8 8 1 pgs order Order of Recusal Thu 06/20 9:01 AM
ORDER OF RECUSAL. Judge William C Lee recused. Case reassigned to Judge Holly A Brady for all further proceedings. Signed by Judge William C Lee on 6/20/2019. (lns)
Related: [-]
Monday, June 17, 2019
7 7 notice Agreed Notice to Extend Time to File Answer Mon 06/17 2:36 PM
AGREED NOTICE to extend time to file answer filed by Bowen Center ; answer due by 07/19/2019. (Steinhofer, Rachel)
Related: [-]
6 6 misc Mag Consent Forms Sent - Standard with pptc - form will be generated Mon 06/17 2:19 PM
MAGISTRATE JUDGE CONSENT FORMS sent to all parties. (mr)
Related: [-]
5 5 notice Notice of Hearing/Deadlines Mon 06/17 2:18 PM
NOTICE of Hearing: Rule 16 Preliminary Pretrial Conference set for 7/29/2019 at 9:30 AM in US District Court - Fort Wayne before Magistrate Judge Susan L Collins. (mr)
Related: [-]
utility Add and Terminate Judges Mon 06/17 1:14 PM
Judge William C Lee and Magistrate Judge Susan L Collins added. (NEW CASE) (ksp)
Related: [-]
Friday, June 14, 2019
3 3 notice Notice of Appearance Fri 06/14 10:06 AM
NOTICE of Appearance by Rachel K Steinhofer on behalf of Otis R. Bowen Center for Human Services Inc The (Steinhofer, Rachel)
Related: [-]
2 2 notice Notice of Appearance Fri 06/14 10:03 AM
NOTICE of Appearance by Anthony M Stites on behalf of Otis R. Bowen Center for Human Services Inc The (Stites, Anthony)
Related: [-]
1 1 notice Notice of Removal Fri 06/14 9:52 AM
NOTICE OF REMOVAL (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0755-3922659.) from Allen Circuit Court, Cause No. 02C01-1905-PL-000187, filed by Otis R. Bowen Center for Human Services Inc The.(Stites, Anthony)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit State Court Complaint,
Att: 2 Civil Cover Sheet
Tuesday, May 21, 2019
4 4 cmp State Court Complaint Mon 06/17 1:13 PM
STATE COURT COMPLAINT against Bowen Center, filed by Mary B Johnson PhD.(ksp)
Related: [-]