Utah District Court
Judge:David Nuffer
Case #: 1:14-cv-00017
Nature of Suit442 Civil Rights - Employment
Cause42:2000 Job Discrimination (Sex)
Case Filed:Feb 26, 2014
Terminated:Apr 13, 2017
Last checked: Tuesday Dec 09, 2014 1:01 PM MST
Defendant
Farmington City
Represented By
Camille N. Johnson
Snow Christensen & Martineau
contact info
Judith D. Wolferts
Snow Christensen & Martineau
contact info
Plaintiff
Sarah Mojazza
Represented By
Andrew W. Stavros
Stavros Law PC
contact info

GPO Jan 09 2017
MEMORANDUM DECISION AND ORDER denying 16 Motion for Summary Judgment. Signed by Judge David Nuffer on 1/6/17 (alt)

Docket last updated: 05/23/2025 11:59 PM MDT
Thursday, April 13, 2017
39 39 order Order on Motion to Dismiss Thu 04/13 12:54 PM
ORDER granting 38 Stipulated Motion to Dismiss With Prejudice - CASE CLOSED. Signed by Judge David Nuffer on 4/13/17 (alt)
Related: [-]
38 38 motion Dismiss Thu 04/13 8:59 AM
Stipulated MOTION to Dismiss and Memorandum in Support With Prejudice filed by Defendant Farmington City.(Young, R.)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order text of proposed order
Tuesday, March 21, 2017
37 37 order Order Cancelling Deadline Tue 03/21 11:16 AM
DOCKET TEXT ORDER Vacating FPT previously set for 4/3/2017 at 10:00 a.m. and 5-Day Jury Trial previously set for 4/17/2017 at 8:00 a.m. Signed by Judge David Nuffer on 3/21/2017. (no attachment)(asb)
Related: [-]
Thursday, March 16, 2017
36 36 notice Notice of Settlement Thu 03/16 8:59 AM
NOTICE of Settlement by Farmington City (Young, R.)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, March 15, 2017
35 35 utility Lodged Document Wed 03/15 11:23 AM
DOCUMENTS LODGED consisting of 2017 Mar 15 Email from Scott Young to Judge Nuffer's chambers informing that case has settled. Judge Nuffer's chambers responded to file a notice of settlement on the docket so that the FPT and trial may be vacated. (asb)
Related: [-]
Friday, January 27, 2017
34 34 notice Notice of Appearance Fri 01/27 3:51 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Christopher W. Droubay on behalf of Farmington City (Droubay, Christopher)
Related: [-]
33 33 notice Notice of Appearance Fri 01/27 3:49 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by R. Scott Young on behalf of Farmington City (Young, R.)
Related: [-]
Monday, January 09, 2017
32 32 order Order on Motion for Summary Judgment Memorandum Decision Mon 01/09 4:21 PM
MEMORANDUM DECISION AND ORDER denying 16 Motion for Summary Judgment. Signed by Judge David Nuffer on 1/6/17 (alt)
Related: [-]
31 31 order Trial Order Mon 01/09 4:08 PM
TRIAL ORDER with instructions to counsel: Final Pretrial Conference set for 4/3/2017 at 10:00 AM in Rm 3.100 before Judge David Nuffer. 5-Day Jury Trial set for 4/17/2017 at 08:30 AM in Rm 3.100 before Judge David Nuffer. Proposed Voir Dire due 3/20/17. Proposed Jury Instructions due 3/20/17. Signed by Judge David Nuffer on 1/9/17 (alt)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, November 15, 2016
30 30 misc Request to Submit for Decision Tue 11/15 1:34 PM
REQUEST to Submit for Decision re16 Defendant's MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Plaintiff Sarah Mojazza. (Stavros, Andrew)
Related: [-]
Thursday, May 26, 2016
29 29 notice Notice of Withdrawal of Counsel Thu 05/26 3:52 PM
NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF COUNSEL of Camille N. Johnson filed by Camille N. Johnson on behalf of Farmington City (Johnson, Camille)
Related: [-]
28 28 notice Notice of Appearance Thu 05/26 3:49 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Maralyn M. English on behalf of Farmington City (English, Maralyn)
Related: [-]
Monday, September 21, 2015
27 27 misc Request for Oral Argument Mon 09/21 11:54 AM
REQUEST for Oral Argument re16 Defendant's MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Plaintiff Sarah Mojazza. (Stavros, Andrew)
Related: [-]
Friday, September 18, 2015
26 26 notice Notice of Supplemental Authority Fri 09/18 4:11 PM
NOTICE of SUPPLEMENTAL AUTHORITY by Sarah Mojazza re16 Defendant's MOTION for Summary Judgment (Stavros, Andrew)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A- Zisumbo v. Ogden Regional Medical Center
Friday, August 28, 2015
notice Notice Vacating Hearing Fri 08/28 8:14 AM
NOTICE VACATING FINAL PRETRIAL CONFERENCE previously set for 11/16/2015 and 4-DAY JURY TRIAL set for 11/30/2015 HEARING set for before Judge David Nuffer. The court will reschedule the final pretrial conference and jury trial upon entry of final ruling on the pending motion for summary judgment16 . (asb)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, August 18, 2015
25 25 respm Reply Memorandum/Reply to Response to Motion Tue 08/18 4:46 PM
REPLY to Response to Motion re16 Defendant's MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Defendant Farmington City.(Wolferts, Judith)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Appendix /Index to Exhibits,
Att: 2 Exhibit 28 Workman Time Sheet,
Att: 3 Exhibit 29 Workman Acknowledgement,
Att: 4 Exhibit 30 Mojazza Driver's License,
Att: 5 Exhibit 31 Guido Smith Deposition,
Att: 6 Exhibit 32 Male Employee Termination Report,
Att: 7 Exhibit 33 Handbook Disclaimer
Tuesday, August 11, 2015
24 24 order Order on Motion for Extension of Time Tue 08/11 9:52 AM
ORDER granting 23 Motion for Extension of Time. Signed by Judge David Nuffer on 8/11/15 (alt)
Related: [-]
Monday, August 10, 2015
23 23 motion Extension of Time Mon 08/10 4:13 PM
MOTION for Extension of Time for Defendant to File Reply Memorandum in Support of Motion for Summary Judgment and Memorandum in Support filed by Defendant Farmington City.(Wolferts, Judith)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order proposed Order
Tuesday, August 04, 2015
22 22 misc Appendix Tue 08/04 3:41 AM
APPENDIX to21 Memorandum in Opposition to Motion filed by Plaintiff Sarah Mojazza .(Stavros, Andrew)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A-Mojazza Deposition,
Att: 2 Exhibit B-Guido Smith Deposition,
Att: 3 Exhibit C-Millheim Deposition,
Att: 4 Exhibit D-Mojazza Performance Evaluations,
Att: 5 Exhibit E-Workman Deposition,
Att: 6 Exhibit F-Thurgood Deposition,
Att: 7 Exhibit G-Workman Veral Warning,
Att: 8 Exhibit H-Workman Termination Notice,
Att: 9 Exhibit I- FFD Disipline Forms and Flow Charts,
Att: 10 Exhibit J-Johnson's Internal Memo,
Att: 11 Exhibit K-Mojazza's Complaint,
Att: 12 Exhibit L-Thurgood's Statement,
Att: 13 Exhibit M- Todd Smith Statement,
Att: 14 Exhibit N- Todd Smith Deposition,
Att: 15 Exhibit O- Keith Johnson Deposition,
Att: 16 Exhibit P-Exit Interview,
Att: 17 Exhibit Q-Mojazza Interrogatory Responses,
Att: 18 Exhibit R-Parker Discipline Notice
Monday, August 03, 2015
21 21 respm Memorandum in Opposition to Motion Mon 08/03 11:47 PM
Plaintiff's MEMORANDUM in Opposition re16 Defendant's MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Plaintiff Sarah Mojazza. (Stavros, Andrew)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, July 21, 2015
20 20 order Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply Tue 07/21 10:24 AM
ORDER granting 19 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply re 16 Defendant's MOTION for Summary Judgment: Response/Opposition due by 8/3/2015. Signed by Judge David Nuffer on 7/20/15 (alt)
Related: [-]
Monday, July 20, 2015
19 19 motion Extension of Time to File Response/Reply Mon 07/20 6:04 PM
Stipulated MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to16 Defendant's MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Plaintiff Sarah Mojazza.(Stavros, Andrew)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order Order re Extension of Time to File Opposition to MSJ
Tuesday, June 30, 2015
18 18 misc Sealed Document Wed 07/01 11:16 AM
**SEALED DOCUMENT** SEALED EXHIBIT 23 TO16 Defendant's MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Defendant Farmington City (exhibit consists of a single disc containing non-PDF material - disc will be kept in permanent storage) (alt)
Related: [-]
17 17 order Order on Motion for Leave to File Tue 06/30 9:56 AM
ORDER granting 15 Motion for Leave to File Single Exhibit to Summary Jgm Motion Under Seal. Signed by Judge David Nuffer on 6/29/15 (alt)
Related: [-]
Monday, June 29, 2015
16 16 motion Summary Judgment Mon 06/29 2:17 PM
Defendant's MOTION for Summary Judgment and Memorandum in Support filed by Defendant Farmington City.(Wolferts, Judith)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Appendix Index to Exhibits,
Att: 2 Exhibit 1 - Guido Smith depo,
Att: 3 Exhibit 2 - Sarah Mojazza depo,
Att: 4 Exhibit 3 - Firefighter Code of Ethics,
Att: 5 Exhibit 4 - Sexual Harassment Policy,
Att: 6 Exhibit 5 - PowerPoint Presentation, Relevant pages,
Att: 7 Exhibit 6 - FFD Probationary Firefighter 8 Week Performance Review (for S. Mojazza),
Att: 8 Exhibit 7 - Mojazza's Confirmation of Receipt of Handbook,
Att: 9 Exhibit 8 - Brian Thurgood depo,
Att: 10 Exhibit 9 - Text Message,
Att: 11 Exhibit 10 - Lindsay Workman depo,
Att: 12 Exhibit 11 - Summary of Workman Comments to Johnson in Sexual Harassment Investigation,
Att: 13 Exhibit 12 - Mojazza Time Records,
Att: 14 Exhibit 13 - Workman Time Records,
Att: 15 Exhibit 14 - Clothing orders and E-mails,
Att: 16 Exhibit 15 - Transcript of Exit Interview,
Att: 17 Exhibit 16 - Firefighter Code of Ethics,
Att: 18 Exhibit 17 - Smith E-mail to Millheim,
Att: 19 Exhibit 18 - Thurgood Statement to Smith,
Att: 20 Exhibit 19 - Thurgood Statement Re Exit Interview,
Att: 21 Exhibit 20 - Thurgood Statement Re Altercation,
Att: 22 Exhibit 21 - Smith Statement (re use of f-word in public & Mojazza showing photo to Smith),
Att: 23 Exhibit 22 - Todd Smith depo,
Att: 24 Exhibit 23 - Photo - filed under seal,
Att: 25 Exhibit 24 - Sexual Harassment Report & Interview,
Att: 26 Exhibit 25 - Transcript of Mojazza's Sexual Harassment Interview,
Att: 27 Exhibit 26 - Workman Personnel Action Form,
Att: 28 Exhibit 27 - Millheim Letter to Mojazza
Friday, June 26, 2015
15 15 motion Miscellaneous Relief Fri 06/26 2:38 PM
Stipulated MOTION Requesting Leave to File Under Seal One Exhibit to Defendant's Summary Judgment Motion and Memorandum in Support filed by Defendant Farmington City.(Wolferts, Judith)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order text of proposed order
Monday, February 09, 2015
14 14 order Order on Motion for Scheduling Order Mon 02/09 5:49 PM
ORDER granting 13 Motion for Amended Scheduling Order: Expert Discovery due by 4/30/2015. Motions due by 6/29/2015. Final Pretrial Conference set for 11/16/2015 at 02:30 PM in Rm 3.100 before Judge David Nuffer. 4-Day Jury Trial set for 11/30/2015 at 08:30 AM in Rm 3.100 before Judge David Nuffer. Signed by Magistrate Judge Evelyn J. Furse on 2/9/15 (alt)
Related: [-]
Thursday, January 15, 2015
13 13 motion Amend/Correct Thu 01/15 2:04 PM
Stipulated MOTION to Amend/Correct Scheduling Order filed by Defendant Farmington City.(Wolferts, Judith)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order Amended Scheduling Order and Order Vacating Hearing
Wednesday, August 06, 2014
12 12 DOCKET TEXT ORDER - The court orders the parties to follow the Short Form Discovery Motion procedure as outlined in the attached document in this case for all discovery disputes arising after this date. Signed by Judge David Nuffer on 8/6/2014. (jds)
Related: [-]
Monday, August 04, 2014
11 11 SCHEDULING ORDER: Initial Pretrial Conference set for 08/13/2014 at 10:00 a.m. vacated. Amended Pleadings due by 8/15/2014. Joinder of Parties due by 8/15/2014. Discovery due by 4/30/2015. Motions due by 5/29/2015. Final Pretrial Conference set for 10/19/2015 02:30 PM in Rm 3.100 before Judge David Nuffer. 4 Day Jury Trial set for 11/2/2015 08:30 AM in Rm 3.100 before Judge David Nuffer. Signed by Magistrate Judge Evelyn J. Furse on 08/04/2014. (tls)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, July 08, 2014
10 10 REPORT OF ATTORNEY PLANNING MEETING.(Stavros, Andrew)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order Scheduling Order and Order Vacating Hearing
Wednesday, June 18, 2014
9 9 NOTICE OF INITIAL PRETRIAL CONFERENCE: (Notice generated by Jennifer Stout, IPT Clerk) The Attorneys Planning Meeting Report and Proposed Scheduling Order forms, available on the court web site at[LINK:http://www.utd.uscourts.gov/documents/formpage.html] , should be prepared 21 days before the Initial Pretrial Conference hearing date. NOTICE TO COUNSEL, The Court may enter a scheduling order and vacate the hearing if counsel (a) file a stipulated Attorneys Planning Meeting Report ; and (b) e-mail a Proposed Scheduling Order to[LINK:ipt@utd.uscourts.gov] 21 days before the scheduled hearing. See instructions at[LINK:http://www.utd.uscourts.gov/documents/ipt.html] If counsel or the parties would like to participate by phone they must contact chambers at least two days in advance at[LINK:ipt@utd.uscourts.gov] to make arrangements. Initial Pretrial Conference set for 8/13/2014 10:00 AM in Rm 7.400 before Magistrate Judge Evelyn J. Furse. (jds)
Related: [-]
Monday, June 09, 2014
8 8 NOTICE FROM THE COURT re: Initial Scheduling The court's IPT Clerk will now set the case for the Initial Pretrial Scheduling Conference (asb)
Related: [-]
Friday, June 06, 2014
7 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Judith D. Wolferts on behalf of Farmington City (Wolferts, Judith)
Related: [-]
6 6 ANSWER to Complaint filed by Farmington City.(Johnson, Camille)
Related: [-]
5 5 NOTICE of Appearance by Camille N. Johnson on behalf of Farmington City (Johnson, Camille)
Related: [-]
Thursday, May 15, 2014
4 4 **RESTRICTED DOCUMENT** Summons Issued Electronically as to Farmington City. Instructions to Counsel: 1. Click on the document number. 2. If you are prompted for an ECF login, enter your 'Attorney' login to CM/ECF. 3. Print the issued summons for service. (eat)
Related: [-]
Thursday, February 27, 2014
3 3 ORDER FOR SCHEDULE. Signed by Judge David Nuffer on 2/27/14 (alt)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, February 26, 2014
2 2 COMPLAINT against Farmington City (Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 1088-2004652), filed by Sarah Mojazza. Assigned to Judge David Nuffer (Stavros, Andrew)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet
1 1 Case has been indexed and assigned to Judge David Nuffer. Plaintiff Sarah Mojazza is directed to E-File the Complaint and cover sheet (found under Complaints and Other Initiating Documents) and pay the filing fee of $ 400 by the end of the business day. NOTE: The court will not have jurisdiction until the opening document is electronically filed and the filing fee paid in the CM/ECF system. Civil Summons may be issued electronically. Prepare the summons using the courts[LINK:PDF version] and email it to utdecf_clerk@utd.uscourts.gov for issuance. (amw)
Related: [-]