Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 8:19-bk-04344

Florida Middle Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 7
Judge:Catherine Peek Mcewen
Case #: 8:19-ap-00298
Nature of Suit63 Bankruptcy - Dischargeability - §523(a)(8), student loan
Case Filed:Jun 20, 2019
Terminated:Feb 09, 2021
Last checked: never
Defendant
United States Department of Education
Represented By
United States Department of Education
contact info
Defendant
Missouri Higher Education Loan Authority
Represented By
Missouri Higher Education Loan Authority
contact info
Plaintiff
Shane Michael Conklin
P.O. Box 1070
Safety Harbor, FL 34695
Represented By
Samantha L Dammer
Tampa Law Advocates,p.A.
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/22/2025 1:05 PM EDT
Tuesday, February 09, 2021
court Close Adversary Case Tue 02/09 3:01 PM
Adversary Case 8:19-ap-298 Closed. (Nita)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, January 20, 2021
23 23 order Approve Compromise or Settlement Wed 01/20 5:00 PM
Order Granting Motion to Approve Compromise or Settlement Related [+]. Service Instructions: Joseph Tompkins is directed to serve a copy of this order on interested parties and file a proof of service within 3 days of entry of the order. (Pamella)
Related: [-] 22
Monday, November 16, 2020
court COURT - (NO PAPER) Change of Attorney Law Firm - (Attorney Roll Clerk Only) Mon 11/16 8:55 AM
Attorney Samantha Dammer Firm Name Change from: Samantha L Dammer, Tampa Law Advocates,P.A., A Private Law Firm, 620 East Twiggs Suite 110, Tampa, FL 33602 to: Samantha L Dammer, Samantha L. Dammer, P.A., 620 East Twiggs Suite 110, Tampa, FL 33602 . (Sara M.)
Related: [-]
Friday, October 09, 2020
22 22 motion Motion to Approve Compromise of Controversy or Settlement Agreement Fri 10/09 4:34 PM
Joint Motion to Approve Compromise of Controversy or Settlement Agreement. Contains negative notice. Filed by Joseph Tompkins on behalf of Defendant United States Department of Education. (Tompkins, Joseph)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A
Tuesday, October 06, 2020
21 21 notice Notice (DO NOT USE for appearances or hearings) Tue 10/06 2:24 PM
Notice of Pending Settlement Filed by Joseph Tompkins on behalf of Defendant United States Department of Education. (Tompkins, Joseph)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, September 23, 2020
20 20 misc Witness List Wed 09/23 4:33 PM
Witness List Filed by Joseph Tompkins on behalf of Defendant United States Department of Education Related [+]. (Tompkins, Joseph)
Related: [-] 16
Wednesday, September 16, 2020
19 19 misc Witness List Wed 09/16 11:09 AM
Witness List Filed by Samantha L Dammer on behalf of Plaintiff Shane Michael Conklin. (Dammer, Samantha)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, July 22, 2020
18 18 notice Notice (DO NOT USE for appearances or hearings) Wed 07/22 3:15 PM
Notice of Service of Answers to Interrogatories and Request for Production of Documents Filed by Samantha L Dammer on behalf of Plaintiff Shane Michael Conklin. (Dammer, Samantha)
Related: [-]
Friday, January 17, 2020
17 17 court BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order Sat 01/18 12:26 AM
BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order Related [+]. Notice Date 01/17/2020. (Admin.)
Related: [-] (Related Doc #16 )
Wednesday, January 15, 2020
16 16 2 pgs order Order Scheduling Trial (AP Case Trial) Wed 01/15 9:23 AM
Order Scheduling Trial Related [+]. Trial date set for 10/21/2020 at 09:30 AM at Tampa, FL - Courtroom 8B, Sam M. Gibbons United States Courthouse, 801 N. Florida Avenue. Service Instructions: Clerks Office to serve. (Bernadette)
Related: [-] 1 ,11
Monday, January 13, 2020
15 15 court CHAP Pro Memo - Hearing Held Tue 01/14 5:37 PM
Hearing Proceeding Memo: Hearing Held - APPEARANCES: SAMANTHA DAMMER; JOSEPH TOMPKINS.. RULING: CONTINUED PRETRIAL/STATUS CONFERENCE (ANSWER DOC 11).. TRIAL 10/21/20 AT 9:30 AM (1 DAY); 8/7/20 TO FILE MSJ...CASE MANAGER TO ENTER TRIAL ORDER... . Proposed Orders, if applicable, should be submitted within three days after the date of the hearing - Local Rule 9072-1(c). This docket entry/document is not an official order of the Court . (Dkt)
Related: [-]
Monday, November 18, 2019
14 14 court CHAP Pro Memo - Hearing Held Tue 11/19 12:24 AM
Hearing Proceeding Memo: Hearing Held - APPEARANCES: Samanth Dammer for Plaintiff, Joseph Tompkins for Department of Education RULING: PRETRIAL/STATUS CONFERENCE (ANSWER DOC 11): Cont'd to 01/13/2020 @ 10:30 am. Announced in Open Court Proposed Orders, if applicable, should be submitted within three days after the date of the hearing - Local Rule 9072-1(c). This docket entry/document is not an official order of the Court . (Dkt)
Related: [-]
Thursday, November 07, 2019
13 13 misc Disclosure Thu 11/07 1:26 PM
Disclosure Filed by Samantha L Dammer on behalf of Plaintiff Shane Michael Conklin. (Dammer, Samantha)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, September 25, 2019
12 12 answer Answer (Do not use for answer to complaint) Wed 09/25 1:09 PM
Answer To Defendant United States of America's Affirmative Defenses Filed by Samantha L Dammer on behalf of Plaintiff Shane Michael Conklin. (Dammer, Samantha)
Related: [-]
Thursday, September 12, 2019
11 11 answer Answer to Complaint Thu 09/12 3:43 PM
Answer to Complaint Related [+]. Filed by Joseph Tompkins on behalf of Defendant United States Department of Education.(Tompkins, Joseph)
Related: [-] 1
Att: 1 Exhibit 1
Friday, August 30, 2019
10 10 court BNC Certificate of Mailing - Hearing Notice Sat 08/31 12:29 AM
BNC Certificate of Mailing - Notice of Hearing Related [+]. Notice Date 08/30/2019. (Admin.)
Related: [-] (Related Doc #9 )
Wednesday, August 28, 2019
9 9 court Notice Of Pretrial / Status Conference Wed 08/28 12:50 PM
Notice of Pretrial/ Status Conference. . Pre-Trial Conference set for 11/18/2019 at 10:30 AM at Tampa, FL - Courtroom 8B, Sam M. Gibbons United States Courthouse, 801 N. Florida Avenue. (Pamella)
Related: [-]
Thursday, August 08, 2019
8 8 misc Summons Service Executed Thu 08/08 11:31 AM
Service Executed on Assistant United States Attorney of Summons, Complaint, Local Rule 7001-1. Filed by Samantha L Dammer on behalf of Plaintiff Shane Michael Conklin. (Dammer, Samantha)
Related: [-]
7 7 misc Summons Service Executed Thu 08/08 11:30 AM
Service Executed on Attorney General of the United States of Summons, Complaint, Local Rule 7001-1. Filed by Samantha L Dammer on behalf of Plaintiff Shane Michael Conklin. (Dammer, Samantha)
Related: [-]
6 6 notice Notice Of Withdrawal of Pleadings Thu 08/08 11:27 AM
Notice of Withdrawal of Motion for Entry of Default Filed by Samantha L Dammer on behalf of Plaintiff Shane Michael Conklin Related [+]. (Dammer, Samantha)
Related: [-] 5
Monday, August 05, 2019
5 5 motion Motion for Entry of Default Mon 08/05 2:40 PM
Motion for Entry of Default against United States Department of Education, and Missouri Higher Education Loan Authority (MOHELA), Filed by Samantha L Dammer on behalf of Plaintiff Shane Michael Conklin. (Dammer, Samantha)
Related: [-]
Monday, June 24, 2019
4 4 misc Summons Service Executed Mon 06/24 10:37 AM
Service Executed on United States Dept. of Education of Summons, Complaint, Local Rule 7001-1. Filed by Samantha L Dammer on behalf of Plaintiff Shane Michael Conklin. (Dammer, Samantha)
Related: [-]
3 3 misc Summons Service Executed Mon 06/24 10:36 AM
Service Executed on MOHELA of Summons, Complaint, Local Rule 7001-1. Filed by Samantha L Dammer on behalf of Plaintiff Shane Michael Conklin. (Dammer, Samantha)
Related: [-]
Friday, June 21, 2019
2 2 court Summons Issued (auto) Fri 06/21 11:00 AM
Summons issued along with Local Rule 7001-1 - Adversary Proceedings - Procedures. Answer Due 07/22/2019. If one or more defendants are the United States or an officer or agency thereof, add an additional five days to the Answer Due date. A copy of this summons must be included when filing proof of service of this summons. (ADIclerk)
Related: [-]
Thursday, June 20, 2019
1 1 cmp Complaint - Original Thu 06/20 2:59 PM
Complaint by Shane Michael Conklin against DEPARTMENT OF EDUCATION/FEDLOAN SERVICING, MOHELA (ES). Filing Fee Not Required. Nature of Suit: [63 (Dischargeability - 523(a)(8), student loan)]. (Dammer, Samantha)
Related: [-]