New Jersey District Court
Judge:Jamel K Semper
Referred: Jessica S Allen
Case #: 2:19-cv-14139
Nature of Suit360 Torts - Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury
Cause42:1981 Civil Rights
Case Filed:Jun 21, 2019
Terminated:Jan 16, 2025
Last checked: Wednesday Dec 18, 2019 3:26 AM EST
Cross Claimant
DETECTIVE SHAYNE BODNAR
Represented By
LORI A. DVORAK
Dvorak & Associates, LLC
contact info
MARC D. MORY
Dvorak & Associates, LLC
contact info
Cross Claimant
DETECTIVE JUAN CARLOS BONILLA, JR.
Represented By
LORI A. DVORAK
Dvorak & Associates, LLC
contact info
MARC D. MORY
Dvorak & Associates, LLC
contact info
Cross Claimant
PATROLMAN JEIAN RASTEGARPANAH
Represented By
LORI A. DVORAK
Dvorak & Associates, LLC
contact info
MARC D. MORY
Dvorak & Associates, LLC
contact info
Cross Claimant
DETECTIVE BRIAN JAREMCZAK
Represented By
LORI A. DVORAK
Dvorak & Associates, LLC
contact info
MARC D. MORY
Dvorak & Associates, LLC
contact info
Cross Claimant
DETECTIVE NICOLE HUBNER
Represented By
LORI A. DVORAK
Dvorak & Associates, LLC
contact info
MARC D. MORY
Dvorak & Associates, LLC
contact info
Cross Claimant
DETECTIVE PATRICK HARRIS
Represented By
LORI A. DVORAK
Dvorak & Associates, LLC
contact info
MARC D. MORY
Dvorak & Associates, LLC
contact info
Cross Defendant
HAYDEE ZAMORA-DALTON
Cross Defendant
JACQUELINE CARDONA
Cross Defendant
CARMEN DIAZ-PETTI
Cross Defendant
CHRISTINE NORBUT BEYER, MSW
Cross Defendant
KEISHA RIDLY
Cross Defendant
STATE OF NEW JERSEY
Cross Defendant
TOWNSHIP OF WOODBRIDGE
Represented By
ALAN J. BARATZ
Weiner Law Group LLP
contact info
Defendant
KUZMA CAPTAIN SCOTT
Represented By
ALAN J. BARATZ
Weiner Law Group LLP
contact info
Defendant
HAYDEE ZAMORA-DALTON
Defendant
TOWNSHIP OF WOODBRIDGE
Represented By
ALAN J. BARATZ
Weiner Law Group LLP
contact info
Defendant
STATE OF NEW JERSEY
Defendant
SUPERIOR POLICE OFFICER ROB ROE 1-10
Defendant
KEISHA RIDLY
Defendant
SUPERVISOR PAULA POE 1-10
Defendant
ABC CORP 1-10
Defendant
BOB BOE 1-10
Defendant
DETECTIVE SHAYNE BODNAR
Represented By
LORI A. DVORAK
Dvorak & Associates, LLC
contact info
MARC D. MORY
Dvorak & Associates, LLC
contact info
Defendant
DETECTIVE JUAN CARLOS BONILLA, JR.
Represented By
LORI A. DVORAK
Dvorak & Associates, LLC
contact info
MARC D. MORY
Dvorak & Associates, LLC
contact info
Defendant
JACQUELINE CARDONA
Defendant
DEF CORP 1-10
Defendant
CARMEN DIAZ-PETTI
Defendant
POLICE OFFICER JOHN DOE 1-20
Defendant
GHI CORP. 1-10
Defendant
DETECTIVE PATRICK HARRIS
Represented By
LORI A. DVORAK
Dvorak & Associates, LLC
contact info
MARC D. MORY
Dvorak & Associates, LLC
contact info
Defendant
DETECTIVE NICOLE HUBNER
Represented By
LORI A. DVORAK
Dvorak & Associates, LLC
contact info
MARC D. MORY
Dvorak & Associates, LLC
contact info
Defendant
PATROLMAN JEIAN RASTEGARPANAH
Represented By
LORI A. DVORAK
Dvorak & Associates, LLC
contact info
MARC D. MORY
Dvorak & Associates, LLC
contact info
Defendant
CHRISTINE NORBUT BEYER, MSW
Defendant
DEPUTY POLICE DIRECTOR JOSEPH NISKY
Represented By
ALAN J. BARATZ
Weiner Law Group LLP
contact info
Defendant
DETECTIVE BRIAN JAREMCZAK
Represented By
LORI A. DVORAK
Dvorak & Associates, LLC
contact info
MARC D. MORY
Dvorak & Associates, LLC
contact info
Defendant
POLICE DIRECTOR ROBERT HUBNER
Represented By
ALAN J. BARATZ
Weiner Law Group LLP
contact info
Defendant
CHIEF LAW ENFORCEMENT OFFICER CAPTAIN ROY HOPPOCK
Represented By
ALAN J. BARATZ
Weiner Law Group LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
KATIRIA ORTIZ
Represented By
ROSEMARIE ARNOLD
contact info
Plaintiff
JANE DOE
Represented By
ROSEMARIE ARNOLD
contact info
TERMINATED PARTIES
Cross Claimant
PATROLMAN ROBERT BESNER
Terminated: 10/17/2019
Represented By
LORI A. DVORAK
Dvorak & Associates, LLC
contact info
MARC D. MORY
Dvorak & Associates, LLC
contact info
Cross Claimant
SARGEANT RICHARD WOJACZYK
Terminated: 10/17/2019
Represented By
LORI A. DVORAK
Dvorak & Associates, LLC
contact info
MARC D. MORY
Dvorak & Associates, LLC
contact info
Defendant
PATROLMAN ROBERT BESNER
Terminated: 10/17/2019
Represented By
LORI A. DVORAK
Dvorak & Associates, LLC
contact info
MARC D. MORY
Dvorak & Associates, LLC
contact info
Defendant
SARGEANT RICHARD WOJACZYK
Terminated: 10/17/2019
Represented By
LORI A. DVORAK
Dvorak & Associates, LLC
contact info
MARC D. MORY
Dvorak & Associates, LLC
contact info
Defendant
CITY OF SOUTH AMBOY
Terminated: 10/17/2019
Represented By
ALAN J. BARATZ
Weiner Law Group LLP
contact info
Defendant
POLICE CHIEF DARREN LAVIGNE
Terminated: 10/17/2019
Represented By
ALAN J. BARATZ
Weiner Law Group LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
MARY MOE
Terminated: 10/14/2019
Represented By
ROSEMARIE ARNOLD
contact info
Plaintiff
K. O.
Terminated: 10/14/2019
Represented By
ROSEMARIE ARNOLD
contact info

GPO Oct 20 2020
OPINION. Signed by Judge John Michael Vazquez on 10/20/20. (jc, )
GPO Aug 17 2021
OPINION. Signed by Judge John Michael Vazquez on 8/17/21. (jc, )
GPO Jun 27 2022
OPINION. Signed by Judge John Michael Vazquez on 6/27/2022. (jd, )

Docket last updated: 05/23/2025 11:59 PM EDT
Monday, May 19, 2025
141 141 order Stipulation and Order 1 - Terminate Deadlines Tue 05/20 10:16 AM
STIPULATION AND ORDER OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE. Signed by Judge Jamel K. Semper on 5/20/2025. (adc, )
Related: [-]
140 140 order Stipulation and Order ~Util - Add and Terminate Parties Tue 05/20 10:12 AM
STIPULATION AND ORDER OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE as to TOWNSHIP OF WOODBRIDGE only. Signed by Judge Jamel K. Semper on 5/20/2025. (adc) Modified on 5/20/2025 (adc)
Related: [-]