Town of Portsmouth v. Amerisourcebergen Drug Corporation et al
Consolidated
Lead case: 1:17-md-02804
Lead case: 1:17-md-02804
Ohio Northern District Court | |
Judge: | Dan Aaron Polster |
Case #: | 1:19-op-45554 |
Nature of Suit | 470 Other Statutes - Racketeer Influenced and Corrupt Organizations |
Cause | 18:1961 Racketeering (RICO) Act |
Case Filed: | Jun 24, 2019 |
Case in other court: | Rhode Island, 1:19-cv-00315 |
Last checked: Friday Nov 08, 2019 7:59 PM EST |
Defendant
Par Pharmaceutical Companies, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Teva Pharmaceutical Industries Ltd.
|
|
Defendant
Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
The Purdue Frederick Company Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Watson Laboratories Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Watson Pharmaceuticals, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
CVS Health Corporation
|
|
Defendant
Eckerd Corporation
|
|
Defendant
KVK-Tech, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Purdue Pharma L.P.
|
|
Defendant
Par Pharmaceutical, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Rite Aid Corporation
|
|
Defendant
Rite Aid Dayville Distribution Center
|
|
Defendant
Rite Aid of Maryland, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
SpecGX LLC
|
|
Defendant
Walgreens Boots Alliance, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Walmart, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Janssen Pharmaceuticals Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Actavis LLC
|
|
Defendant
Actavis Pharma, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Allergan PLC
|
|
Defendant
AmerisourceBergen Drug Corporation
|
|
Defendant
Cardinal Health Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Cephalon Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Endo Health Solutions Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Endo Pharmaceuticals Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Janssen Pharmaceutica Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Purdue Pharma Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Johnson & Johnson
|
|
Defendant
Mallinckrodt LLC
|
|
Defendant
Mallinckrodt PLC
|
|
Defendant
McKesson Corporation
|
|
Defendant
Noramco Inc
|
|
Defendant
Ortho-McNeil-Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc.
|
|
Plaintiff
Town of Portsmouth
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 07/01/2019 10:42 AM EDT |
Thursday, June 06, 2019 | ||
1 | 1 165 pgs COMPLAINT ( filing fee paid $ 400.00, receipt number 0103-1374335 ), filed by Town of Portsmouth.(Mancuso, Eva) [Transferred from rid on 6/24/2019.] | |
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet | ||
Friday, June 07, 2019 | ||
Case assigned to Chief Judge William E. Smith and Magistrate Judge Lincoln D. Almond. (Potter, Carrie) [Transferred from rid on 6/24/2019.] | ||
2 | 2 CASE OPENING NOTICE ISSUED (Potter, Carrie) [Transferred from rid on 6/24/2019.] | |
Monday, June 24, 2019 | ||
3 | 3 CASE TRANSFERRED IN from District of Rhode Island. Case number 1:19-cv-00315. Original file, certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received. |