Consolidated
Lead case: 3:19-md-02885

Florida Northern District Court
Judge:M Casey Rodgers
Referred: Gary R Jones
Case #: 3:19-cv-01729
Nature of Suit245 Real Property - Tort Product Liability
Cause28:1332 Diversity-Product Liability
Case Filed:Jun 24, 2019
Last checked: Saturday Dec 21, 2019 3:36 AM EST
Defendant
3M COMPANY
Plaintiff
SHAWN COULTER
Represented By
THOMAS J HENRY
Thomas J Henry Law Pllc - Corpus Christi Tx
contact info


Docket last updated: 11 hours ago
Wednesday, October 23, 2019
3 3 cmp Amended Complaint Wed 10/23 9:42 AM
SHORT FORM AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants All Defendants., filed by SHAWN COULTER. (HENRY, THOMAS)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, June 25, 2019
2 2 service Summons Issued Tue 06/25 11:24 AM
Summons Issued as to 3M COMPANY. (djb)
Related: [-]
Monday, June 24, 2019
1 1 cmp Complaint Mon 06/24 11:44 AM
COMPLAINT SHAWN COULTER against 3M COMPANY ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number AFLNDC-4529960.), filed by SHAWN COULTER. (HENRY, THOMAS)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet,
Att: 2 Exhibit Summons
utility Add and Terminate Judges Mon 06/24 3:11 PM
MAGISTRATE JUDGE GARY R JONES added. MAGISTRATE JUDGE HOPE T CANNON no longer assigned to case. (djb)
Related: [-]