Consolidated
Lead case: 3:19-md-02885

Florida Northern District Court
Judge:M Casey Rodgers
Referred: Gary R Jones
Case #: 3:19-cv-01748
Nature of Suit365 Torts - Personal Injury - Product Liability
Cause28:1332 Diversity-Product Liability
Case Filed:Jun 24, 2019
Last checked: Saturday Dec 21, 2019 4:44 AM EST
Defendant
3M COMPANY
Defendant
3M OCCUPATIONAL SAFETY LLC
Defendant
AEARO HOLDING LLC
Defendant
AEARO INTERMEDIATE LLC
Defendant
AEARO LLC
Defendant
AEARO TECHNOLOGIES LLC
Plaintiff
NICHOLAS KENRICK
Represented By
THOMAS J HENRY
Thomas J Henry Law Pllc - Corpus Christi Tx
contact info


Docket last updated: 9 hours ago
Thursday, October 24, 2019
3 3 cmp Amended Complaint Thu 10/24 12:05 PM
SHORT FORM AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants All Defendants., filed by NICHOLAS KENRICK. (HENRY, THOMAS)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, June 25, 2019
2 2 service Summons Issued Tue 06/25 2:07 PM
Summons Issued as to 3M COMPANY. (djb)
Related: [-]
Monday, June 24, 2019
1 1 cmp Complaint Mon 06/24 3:51 PM
COMPLAINT NICHOLAS KENRICK against 3M COMPANY ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number AFLNDC-4530542.), filed by NICHOLAS KENRICK. (HENRY, THOMAS)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet,
Att: 2 Exhibit Summons
utility Add and Terminate Judges Mon 06/24 4:18 PM
JUDGE M CASEY RODGERS and MAGISTRATE JUDGE GARY R JONES added. MAGISTRATE JUDGE MICHAEL J FRANK and SENIOR JUDGE ROGER VINSON no longer assigned to case. (djb)
Related: [-]