Trinidad v. TRIVAGO GMBH et al
Florida Southern District Court | |
Judge: | Federico A Moreno |
Referred: | Edwin G Torres |
Case #: | 1:19-cv-22629 |
Nature of Suit | 890 Other Statutes - Other Statutory Actions |
Cause | 22:6082 Cuban Liberty and Democratic Solidarity Act of 1996 |
Case Filed: | Jun 25, 2019 |
Re-opened: | Mar 28, 2023 |
Terminated: | Mar 30, 2021 |
Last checked: Sunday Dec 22, 2019 3:39 AM EST |
Defendant
Expedia, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Diego Trinidad
|
Represented By
|
TERMINATED PARTIES | |
Defendant
Booking.Com.B.V.
Terminated: 09/27/2019
|
|
Defendant
Corporacion de Comercio y Turismo Internacional Cubanacan S.A.
Terminated: 09/27/2019
|
|
Defendant
Grupo Hotelero Gran Caribe
Terminated: 09/27/2019
|
|
Defendant
Grupo de Turismo Gaviota S.A.
Terminated: 09/27/2019
|
|
Defendant
Mariela Roe 1-5
Terminated: 09/27/2019
|
|
Defendant
Raul Doe 1-5
Terminated: 09/27/2019
|
|
Defendant
TRIVAGO GMBH
Terminated: 09/27/2019
|
GPO
Jan 13 2020
ORDER denying 43 Defendant's Motion to Stay Discovery. Signed by Judge Federico A. Moreno on 1/13/2020. See attached document for full details. (km02) |
Docket last updated: 05/08/2024 11:59 PM EDT |
Tuesday, April 30, 2024 | ||
210 | 210
motion
Reconsideration
Tue 04/30 8:09 PM
Defendant's MOTION for Reconsideration re207 Order on Motion to Continue, or in the Alternative, Motion for Further Continuance by Expedia Group, Inc., Hotels.com GP, Hotels.com L.P., Orbitz, LLC. (Perez, Lorayne) |