North Dakota Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 11
Judge:Shon Hastings
Case #: 3:19-bk-30359
Case Filed:Jun 25, 2019
Terminated:May 08, 2020
Plan Confirmed:Mar 26, 2020

TypeCorporation
Tax IDsubscribers only
# of Creditors50-99
Est. Assets$50,001 to $100,000
Est. Liabilities $1,000,001 to $10 million
Nature of Business Other
Nature of Debts Primarily Business

Debtor
JM Grain, Inc.
PO Box 248
12 North Railroad Street
Garrison, ND 58540-0248
Represented By
Caren W. Stanley
Vogel Law Firm
contact info
Last checked: never
U.S. Trustee
Robert B. Raschke
Assistant U.S. Trustee Suite 1015 U.S. Courthouse 300 South Fourth Street
Minneapolis, MN 55415
Represented By
Sarah J. Wencil
Office Of The U.S. Trustee
contact info


1. North Dakota pulse marketer files Chapter 11 bankruptcy (bismarcktribune.com)
Submitted Tue 07/16/2019
Docket last updated: 05/12/2025 12:02 PM CDT
Monday, August 17, 2020
338 338 misc Notice of Change of Address Mon 08/17 10:32 AM
Notice of Change of Address Filed by creditor Larry A Pease Estate. (Donovan, Patrick) (modified filer role) Modified on 8/17/2020 (vck, Court)
Related: [-]