Winston et al v. The Hershey Company
New York Eastern District Court | |
Judge: | Eric N Vitaliano |
Referred: | James Orenstein |
Case #: | 1:19-cv-03735 |
Nature of Suit | 370 Torts - Personal Property - Other Fraud |
Cause | 28:1332 Diversity-Fraud |
Case Filed: | Jun 26, 2019 |
Terminated: | Oct 27, 2020 |
Last checked: Monday Dec 23, 2019 4:21 AM EST |
Defendant
The Hershey Company
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Curtis Winston
|
Represented By
|
TERMINATED PARTIES | |
Plaintiff
Jane Doe
Terminated: 12/09/2019
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 05/09/2025 11:59 PM EDT |
Tuesday, October 27, 2020 | ||
27 | 27
![]() JUDGMENT: ORDERED and ADJUDGED that defendants motion to dismiss for failure to state a claim is granted in its entirety; and that leave to amend is denied. Signed Douglas C. Palmer, Clerk of Court by Jalitza Poveda, Deputy Clerk on 10/27/2020. (Almonte, Giselle) |
|
Monday, October 26, 2020 | ||
26 | 26
![]() ORDER granting14 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim. For the reasons stated in the attached order, defendant's motion to dismiss for failure to state a claim is granted in its entirety. Given the nature of the case and the bases of decision, any attempted amendment would be futile, and, for that reason, leave to amend shall not be granted. The Clerk of Court is directed to enter judgment accordingly and to close this case. Ordered by Judge Eric N. Vitaliano on 10/26/2020. (Guo, Alicia) |
|
Monday, June 29, 2020 | ||
25 | 25
![]() NOTICE of Appearance by Cheryl Zak Lardieri on behalf of The Hershey Company (notification declined or already on case) (Lardieri, Cheryl) |
|
Wednesday, June 24, 2020 | ||
24 | 24
![]() MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 150, receipt number ANYEDC-12970652. by The Hershey Company. (Lardieri, Cheryl) |
|
Att: 1
![]() |
||
Att: 2
![]() |
||
order
Order on Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice
Wed 06/24 3:39 PM
ORDER granting24 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice -- Attorney Cheryl Zak Lardieri, Esq. is permitted to argue or try this case in whole or in part as counsel or advocate. By July 1, 2020, Ms. Lardieri shall register for ECF. Registration is available online at the EDNY's homepage. Once registered, Ms. Lardieri shall file a notice of appearance and ensure that she receives electronic notification of activity in this case. Ms. Lardieri shall also ensure that the $150 admission fee be submitted to the Clerk's Office. Ordered by Magistrate Judge James Orenstein on 6/24/2020. (Walker, Anna) |
||
Monday, June 15, 2020 | ||
23 | 23
![]() Joint MOTION to Adjourn Conference by The Hershey Company. (Hopkins, Dennis) |
|
order
Order on Motion to Adjourn Conference
Mon 06/15 4:40 PM
ORDER granting23 Motion to Adjourn Conference -- The motion is granted. The telephonic initial conference previously scheduled for June 18, 2020 is adjourned without date pending resolution of the motion to dismiss. Ordered by Magistrate Judge James Orenstein on 6/15/2020. (Walker, Anna) |
||
Wednesday, June 10, 2020 | ||
order
Scheduling Order
Wed 06/10 12:11 PM
SCHEDULING ORDER -- Due to a conflict in the court's calendar, the telephonic initial conference previously scheduled for June 18, 2020, at 10:30 a.m. is rescheduled for June 18, 2020, at 9:30 a.m. The call-in information for the conference remains the same. Ordered by Magistrate Judge James Orenstein on 6/10/2020. (Walker, Anna) |
||
Tuesday, June 09, 2020 | ||
22 | 22
![]() NOTICE by The Hershey Company re14 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim Second Notice of Supplemental Authority (Hopkins, Dennis) |
|
Saturday, April 18, 2020 | ||
21 | 21
![]() REPLY in Opposition re20 Notice(Other) of Supplemental Authority of Defendant filed by Curtis Winston. (Sheehan, Spencer) |
|
Tuesday, April 14, 2020 | ||
20 | 20
![]() NOTICE by The Hershey Company re14 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim Notice of Supplemental Authority (Hopkins, Dennis) |
|
Att: 1
![]() |
||
Att: 2
![]() |
||
19 | 19
![]() Joint MOTION to Adjourn Conference by Jane Doe, Curtis Winston. (Sheehan, Spencer) |
|
order
Scheduling Order
Tue 04/14 12:06 PM
SCHEDULING ORDER -- The initial conference scheduled for April 16, 2020, at 9:30 a.m. is converted to a telephone conference. I respectfully direct all counsel to call 1-877-336-1839 five minutes before the scheduled start of the conference and use access code 391-4302. Any party experiencing difficulty accessing the telephone conference should contact chambers by email at[LINK:Orenstein_Chambers@nyed.uscourts.gov] . Ordered by Magistrate Judge James Orenstein on 4/14/2020. (Walker, Anna) |
||
order
Order on Motion to Adjourn Conference
Tue 04/14 3:04 PM
ORDER granting19 Motion to Adjourn Conference -- The motion is granted; the telephonic initial conference previously scheduled for April 16, 2020 is rescheduled for June 18, 2020 at 10:30 a.m. The call-in information for the conference remains the same. Ordered by Magistrate Judge James Orenstein on 4/14/2020. (Walker, Anna) |
||
Thursday, February 27, 2020 | ||
18 | 18
![]() AFFIDAVIT/DECLARATION in Support re14 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by The Hershey Company. (Hopkins, Dennis) |
|
Att: 1
![]() |
||
17 | 17
![]() REPLY in Support re14 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by The Hershey Company. (Hopkins, Dennis) |
|
16 | 16
![]() MEMORANDUM in Opposition re14 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by The Hershey Company. (Hopkins, Dennis) |
|
15 | 15
![]() MEMORANDUM in Support re14 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by The Hershey Company. (Hopkins, Dennis) |
|
14 | 14
![]() MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim by The Hershey Company. (Hopkins, Dennis) |
|
Monday, December 16, 2019 | ||
13 | 13
![]() Letter / Joint Letter to the Hon. Eric N. Vitaliano Re: Proposed Briefing Schedule for the Motion to Dismiss by The Hershey Company (Hopkins, Dennis) |
|
order
Order(Other)
Mon 12/16 1:08 PM
ORDER: The parties' joint proposed briefing schedule at13 is adopted. Defendant shall serve its opening papers by January 16, 2020. Plaintiff shall serve his opposition papers by February 13, 2020. Defendant shall serve its reply papers by February 27, 2020. The fully-briefed motion shall be filed on ECF in accordance with Individual Rule III.D (the "Bundling Rule") by February 27, 2020. Ordered by Judge Eric N. Vitaliano on 12/16/2019. (LoMonaco, Anthony) |
||
Tuesday, December 10, 2019 | ||
12 | 12
![]() Letter MOTION to Adjourn Conference and Stay Discovery by The Hershey Company. (Hopkins, Dennis) |
|
order
Order on Motion to Adjourn Conference Order(Other) 1 - Terminate Hearings
Tue 12/10 5:35 PM
ORDER granting12 Motion to Adjourn Conference -- The motion is granted on consent. The initial conference previously scheduled for December 19, 2019 is rescheduled for April 16, 2020, at 9:30 a.m. in Courtroom 11D South. Discovery is stayed pending the resolution of the defendant's forthcoming motion to dismiss and the court's decision on that anticipated motion. Ordered by Magistrate Judge James Orenstein on 12/10/2019. (Walker, Anna) |
||
Monday, December 09, 2019 | ||
11 | 11
![]() Order: As per10 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal, Plaintiff Jane Doe's (individually and on behalf of all others similarly situated) claims are hereby voluntarily dismissed. The Clerk of Court is directed to terminated Jane Doe as a party. So Ordered by Judge Eric N. Vitaliano on 12/6/2019. (Almonte, Giselle) |
|
Thursday, December 05, 2019 | ||
10 | 10
![]() NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Jane Doe, Curtis Winston of negligent misrepresentation claims (Winston) and all claims asserted by Jane Doe as placeholder for non-New York plaintiffs (Sheehan, Spencer) |
|
Monday, December 02, 2019 | ||
order
Order on Motion for Pre Motion Conference
Mon 12/02 10:30 AM
ORDER denying6 Motion for Pre-Motion Conference. Upon review of the parties' submissions at6 and9 , the Court concludes that a pre-motion conference is unnecessary. Defendant may proceed with its motion to dismiss. The parties are directed to file a joint proposed briefing schedule no later than December 16, 2019. Ordered by Judge Eric N. Vitaliano on 12/2/2019. (LoMonaco, Anthony) |
||
Monday, November 25, 2019 | ||
9 | 9
![]() MEMORANDUM in Opposition re6 Letter MOTION for pre motion conference Letter-Motion filed by Jane Doe, Curtis Winston. (Sheehan, Spencer) |
|
Thursday, November 21, 2019 | ||
8 | 8
![]() SCHEDULING ORDER: Pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 16(a), I order the parties to appear for an initial discovery planning conference on, December 19, 2019, at 10:30 a.m. in Courtroom 11D South of the United States Courthouse, 225 Cadman Plaza East, Brooklyn, New York. No later than December 17, 2019, the parties must submit, by means of electronic filing on the court's ECF (Electronic Case Filing) system, a joint proposed discovery plan. Each party's counsel must be personally prepared to discuss all factual and legal issues in the case, including the possibility of settlement; otherwise, the client must attend in person as well. SEE ATTACHED ORDER. Ordered by Magistrate Judge James Orenstein on 11/21/2019. (Guy, Alicia) |
|
Monday, November 18, 2019 | ||
7 | 7
![]() Corporate Disclosure Statement by The Hershey Company (Hopkins, Dennis) |
|
6 | 6
![]() Letter MOTION for pre motion conference by The Hershey Company. (Hopkins, Dennis) |
|
Wednesday, September 18, 2019 | ||
5 | 5
![]() WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Curtis Winston, Jane Doe. The Hershey Company waiver sent on 9/18/2019, answer due 11/18/2019. (Sheehan, Spencer) |
|
Thursday, June 27, 2019 | ||
4 | 4
![]() This attorney case opening filing has been checked for quality control. See the attachment for corrections that were made, if any. (Bowens, Priscilla) |
|
3 | 3
![]() In accordance with Rule 73 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Rule 73.1, the parties are notified that if all parties consent a United States magistrate judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action including a (jury or nonjury) trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. Attached to the Notice is a blank copy of the consent form that should be filled out, signed and filed electronically only if all parties wish to consent. The form may also be accessed at the following link:[LINK:http://www.uscourts.gov/uscourts/FormsAndFees/Forms/AO085.pdf] . You may withhold your consent without adverse substantive consequences . Do NOT return or file the consent unless all parties have signed the consent. (Bowens, Priscilla) |
|
Wednesday, June 26, 2019 | ||
2 | 2
![]() Summons Issued as to The Hershey Company. (Bowens, Priscilla) |
|
1 | 1
![]() COMPLAINT against The Hershey Company filing fee $ 400, receipt number ANYEDC-11613096 Was the Disclosure Statement on Civil Cover Sheet completed -NO,, filed by Curtis Winston, Jane Doe. (Sheehan, Spencer) |
|
Att: 1
![]() |
||
Att: 2
![]() |
||
utility
Case Assigned/Reassigned
Thu 06/27 10:43 AM
Case assigned to Judge Eric N. Vitaliano and Magistrate Judge James Orenstein. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned Judges, located on our[LINK:website] . Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. (Bowens, Priscilla) |