Consolidated
Lead case: 3:19-md-02885

Florida Northern District Court
Judge:M Casey Rodgers
Referred: Gary R Jones
Case #: 3:19-cv-01840
Nature of Suit365 Torts - Personal Injury - Product Liability
Cause28:1332 Diversity-Product Liability
Case Filed:Jun 27, 2019
Last checked: Tuesday Dec 24, 2019 4:04 AM EST
Defendant
3M COMPANY
Defendant
3M OCCUPATIONAL SAFETY LLC
Defendant
AEARO HOLDING LLC
Defendant
AEARO INTERMEDIATE LLC
Defendant
AEARO LLC
Defendant
AEARO TECHNOLOGIES LLC
Plaintiff
REGINALD PAYNE
Represented By
THOMAS J HENRY
Thomas J Henry Law Pllc - Corpus Christi Tx
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/02/2025 11:59 PM EDT
Friday, October 25, 2019
3 3 cmp Amended Complaint Fri 10/25 5:35 PM
SHORT FORM AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants All Defendants., filed by REGINALD PAYNE. (HENRY, THOMAS)
Related: [-]
Friday, June 28, 2019
2 2 service Summons Issued Fri 06/28 8:40 AM
Summons Issued as to 3M COMPANY. (djb)
Related: [-]
Thursday, June 27, 2019
1 1 cmp Complaint Thu 06/27 2:21 PM
COMPLAINT against 3M COMPANY ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number AFLNDC-4534872.), filed by REGINALD PAYNE. (HENRY, THOMAS)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet,
Att: 2 Exhibit Summons
utility Add and Terminate Judges Thu 06/27 3:08 PM
MAGISTRATE JUDGE GARY R JONES added. MAGISTRATE JUDGE HOPE T CANNON no longer assigned to case. (djb)
Related: [-]