Florida Southern District Court
Judge:Kathleen M Williams
Referred: Edwin G Torres
Case #: 1:19-cv-22702
Nature of Suit890 Other Statutes - Other Statutory Actions
Cause28:1331 Federal Question
Case Filed:Jun 28, 2019
Terminated:Sep 30, 2022
Last checked: Wednesday Dec 25, 2019 3:35 AM EST
Defendant
Asquared Brands LLC
Represented By
Alessandro A Apolito
Lippes Mathias Wexler Friedman
contact info
Brendan H. Little
Lippes Mathias Wexler Friedman LLP
contact info
Defendant
CT Health Solutions LLC
Represented By
David Stephen Johnson
Johnson Daboll Anderson, PLLC
contact info
Defendant
GMAX Central LLC
Represented By
Clinton Sawyer Payne
Hinshaw & Culbertson, LLP
contact info
Barbara Fernandez
Hinshaw & Culbertson LLP
contact info
Defendant
Vitamins Because LLC
Represented By
David Stephen Johnson
Johnson Daboll Anderson, PLLC
contact info
Defendant
We Like Vitamins LLC
Represented By
Yaniv Adar
Mark Migdal & Hayden
contact info
Joshua Adam Migdal
Mark, Migdal & Hayden
contact info
Plaintiff
Shannon Hood
Represented By
Tod N. Aronovitz
Aronovitz Law
contact info
Barbara Perez
Aronovitz Law
contact info
Jay I. Brody
Kantrowitz, Goldhamer & Graifman, P.C.
contact info
Gary S. Graifman
Kantrowitz Goldhamer & Graifman, P.C.
contact info
Plaintiff
Noah Malgeri
Represented By
Tod N. Aronovitz
Aronovitz Law
contact info
Barbara Perez
Aronovitz Law
contact info
Jay I. Brody
Kantrowitz, Goldhamer & Graifman, P.C.
contact info
Gary S. Graifman
Kantrowitz Goldhamer & Graifman, P.C.
contact info
Plaintiff
Robert McKeown
Represented By
Tod N. Aronovitz
Aronovitz Law
contact info
Barbara Perez
Aronovitz Law
contact info
Jay I. Brody
Kantrowitz, Goldhamer & Graifman, P.C.
contact info
Gary S. Graifman
Kantrowitz Goldhamer & Graifman, P.C.
contact info
Plaintiff
Bill Wilson
Represented By
Tod N. Aronovitz
Aronovitz Law
contact info
Barbara Perez
Aronovitz Law
contact info
Jay I. Brody
Kantrowitz, Goldhamer & Graifman, P.C.
contact info
Gary S. Graifman
Kantrowitz Goldhamer & Graifman, P.C.
contact info
Plaintiff
Kalyn Wolf
Represented By
Tod N. Aronovitz
Aronovitz Law
contact info
Barbara Perez
Aronovitz Law
contact info
Jay I. Brody
Kantrowitz, Goldhamer & Graifman, P.C.
contact info
Gary S. Graifman
Kantrowitz Goldhamer & Graifman, P.C.
contact info
Plaintiff
Cori Ann Ginsberg
Represented By
Tod N. Aronovitz
Aronovitz Law
contact info
Barbara Perez
Aronovitz Law
contact info
Jay I. Brody
Kantrowitz, Goldhamer & Graifman, P.C.
contact info
Gary S. Graifman
Kantrowitz Goldhamer & Graifman, P.C.
contact info

GPO Apr 20 2022
ORDER GRANTING in part and DENYING in part Defendant Vitamins Because's Motion to Strike Plaintiff's Expert 303, and DENYING Defendants Vitamins Because's and aSquared's Motions to Exclude Expert 297 and Strike Rebuttal Report 275. Signed by Ch. Magistrate Judge Edwin G. Torres on 4/20/2022. See attached document for full details. (jfz)
GPO Sep 01 2023
REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS re 387 MOTION for Bill of Costs filed by Asquared Brands LLC, 389 MOTION to Tax Costs filed by Vitamins Because LLC:Recommending Motions be GRANTED in part and DENIED in part; Objections to R&R expedited and due by 9/13/2023. Signed by Chief Magistrate Judge Edwin G. Torres on 9/1/2023. See attached document for full details. (EGT)
GPO Sep 28 2023
ORDER re 387 Motion for Bill of Costs, filed by Asquared Brands LLC, 389 Motion to Tax Costs filed by Vitamins Because LLC, CT Health Solutions LLC, 414 Report and Recommendations, ; granting in part and denying in part 387 Motion for Bill of Costs; granting in part and denying in part 389 Motion to Tax Costs. ; Adopting 414 Report and Recommendations on 387 Motion for Bill of Costs, filed by Asquared Brands LLC, 389 Motion to Tax Costs filed by Vitamins Because LLC, CT Health Solutions LLC, 414 Report and Recommendations,. Certificate of Appealability: No Ruling A cost judgment should be entered against Plaintiffs in the sum of $5,572.40 in favor of aSquared and $8,377.54 in favor of Vitamins Because. Signed by Judge Kathleen M. Williams on 9/28/2023. See attached document for full details. (nan)

Docket last updated: 05/09/2025 11:59 PM EDT
Thursday, April 24, 2025
438 438 misc Stipulation Thu 04/24 1:15 PM
STIPULATION (Joint Stipulation Agreeing to Final Dismissal) by Noah Malgeri, Kalyn Wolf, Bill Wilson, Shannon Hood(Graifman, Gary)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order Granting Final Judgment,
Att: 2 Supplement (Letter from Gary S. Graifman to Honorable Judge Kathleen M. Williams Re: Final Judgment)
437 437 notice Notice of Striking Thu 04/24 1:01 PM
NOTICE of Striking435 Stipulation, filed by Shannon Hood, Noah Malgeri, Bill Wilson, Kalyn Wolf,434 Notice of Striking filed by Shannon Hood, Noah Malgeri, Bill Wilson, Kalyn Wolf by Noah Malgeri, Kalyn Wolf, Bill Wilson, Shannon Hood (Graifman, Gary)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, April 23, 2025
436 436 notice Clerk's Notice of Docket Correction and Instruction to Filer - Attorney Thu 04/24 12:31 PM
Clerk's Notice to Filer re434 Notice of Striking and435 STIPULATION (Joint Stipulation Agreeing to Final Dismissal) Login/Signature Block Violation ; CORRECTIVE ACTION REQUIRED WITHIN 3 DAYS - The name of attorney e-filing this document via their CM/ECF login does not match the name of attorney on the signature block of the document. The name used for login must match typed name on signature block of the document. This filing is a violation of Section 3J(1) of CM/ECF Admin Procedures and LR 5.1(b). Filer must File a Notice of Striking, then refile document pursuant to CM/ECF Admin Procedures and Local Rules. (ebz) Modified text on 4/24/2025 (ebz)
Related: [-]
435 435 misc Stipulation Wed 04/23 4:03 PM
STIPULATION (Joint Stipulation Agreeing to Final Dismissal) by Noah Malgeri, Kalyn Wolf, Bill Wilson, Shannon Hood(Graifman, Gary)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order Granting Final Judgment,
Att: 2 Supplement (Letter from Gary S. Graifman to Honorable Judge Kathleen M. Williams Re: Final Judgment)
434 434 notice Notice of Striking Wed 04/23 3:52 PM
NOTICE of Striking432 Stipulation, filed by Shannon Hood, Noah Malgeri, Bill Wilson, Kalyn Wolf by Noah Malgeri, Kalyn Wolf, Bill Wilson, Shannon Hood (Graifman, Gary)
Related: [-]
Monday, April 21, 2025
433 433 notice Clerk's Notice of Docket Correction and Instruction to Filer - Attorney Tue 04/22 12:00 PM
Clerk's Notice to Filer re432 Stipulation,. Proposed Order Docketed as Main Document ; CORRECTIVE ACTION REQUIRED WITHIN 3 DAYS - Filer must File a Notice of Striking, then resubmit the proposed order as instructed in the CM/ECF Administrative Procedures. (ebz)
Related: [-]
432 432 misc Stipulation Mon 04/21 3:36 PM
STIPULATION And Proposed Consent Order by Noah Malgeri, Kalyn Wolf, Bill Wilson, Shannon Hood, #2 Text of Proposed Order Granting Final Judgment)(Graifman, Gary)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Supplement (Letter from Gary S. Graifman to Honorable Judge Kathleen M. Williams Re: Final Judgment)