Member Case
Lead case is: 3:19-bk-30289

West Virginia Southern Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 11
Judge:B Mckay Mignault
Case #: 3:19-bk-30292
Case Filed:Jul 01, 2019

TypeCorporation
Tax IDsubscribers only
# of Creditors200-999
Est. Assets$10,000,001 to $50 million
Est. Liabilities $100,000,001 to $500 million
Nature of Business Other
Nature of Debts Primarily Business

Debtor
Revelation Energy, LLC
1051 Main St
Milton, WV 25541-1215
Represented By
Joe M. Supple
contact info
Last checked: never
U.S. Trustee
United States Trustee
2025 Robert C. Byrd U.S. Courthouse 300 Virginia Street, East
Charleston, WV 25301
Represented By
David L. Bissett
U.S. Trustees Office
contact info


1. West Virginia coal company files for bankruptcy protection (news-expressky.com)
Submitted Mon 07/08/2019
Docket last updated: 6 hours ago
Saturday, February 15, 2020
15 15 court BNC Certificate of Mailing Sun 02/16 12:39 AM
BNC Certificate of Mailing. Related Document:14 Notice of Deficiency of Claim. Notice Date 02/15/2020. (Admin.)
Related: [-]
Friday, February 14, 2020
court Uploaded Creditors Fri 02/14 6:30 AM
Creditor(s) added by ljg, . (admin)
Related: [-]
Thursday, February 13, 2020
14 14 court Notice of Deficiency of Claim Thu 02/13 12:42 PM
Notice of Deficiency of Claim Number 24 Held by Accurate Surveying, Inc.. Transmitted to BNC with Instructions for Mailing. (ljg)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, November 05, 2019
court Uploaded Creditors Tue 11/05 6:30 AM
Creditor(s) added by Clay, Paul O.. (admin)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, October 23, 2019
court Uploaded Creditors Wed 10/23 6:30 AM
Creditor(s) added by Stephens, Crystal . (admin)
Related: [-]
Friday, August 09, 2019
court Uploaded Creditors Fri 08/09 6:30 AM
Creditor(s) added by Marsteller, Ryan S.. (admin)
Related: [-]
Thursday, August 08, 2019
court Uploaded Creditors Thu 08/08 6:30 AM
Creditor(s) added by Holbrook, Janet Smith. (admin)
Related: [-]
Monday, August 05, 2019
court Uploaded Creditors Mon 08/05 6:30 AM
Creditor(s) added by Balasko, John Zachary. (admin)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, July 30, 2019
court Uploaded Creditors Tue 07/30 6:30 AM
Creditor(s) added by mfj, . (admin)
Related: [-]
Saturday, July 27, 2019
court Uploaded Creditors Sat 07/27 6:30 AM
Creditor(s) added by McKinstry, Taft A.. (admin)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, July 24, 2019
court Uploaded Creditors Wed 07/24 6:30 AM
Creditor(s) added by Howard, Jennifer L.. (admin)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, July 16, 2019
court Uploaded Creditors Tue 07/16 6:30 AM
Creditor(s) added by Wilson, Eric M.. (admin)
Related: [-]
Friday, July 05, 2019
13 13 court BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document Sat 07/06 12:45 AM
BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document. Related Document:11 Order on Motion For Joint Administration. Notice Date 07/05/2019. (Admin.)
Related: [-]
12 12 court BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document Sat 07/06 12:45 AM
BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document. Related Document:10 Chapter 11 Operating Order. Notice Date 07/05/2019. (Admin.)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, July 03, 2019
11 11 order Joint Administration Wed 07/03 4:45 PM
Order Granting2 Motion For Joint Administration. Lead Case 3:19-bk-30289 with Member Case 3:19-bk-30290,3:19-bk-30291,3:19-bk-30292,3:19-bk-30293. Transmitted to BNC with Instructions for Mailing. (ljg)
Related: [-]
10 10 order Chapter 11 Operating Order Wed 07/03 4:26 PM
Chapter 11 Operating Order . Transmitted to BNC with Instructions for Mailing. (mfj)
Related: [-]
9 9 notice Appearance and Request for Service Under BR 9010 Wed 07/03 9:47 AM
Notice of Appearance and Request for Service filed by Eric M. Wilson, Counsel for State of West Virginia Department of Tax & Revenue. (Wilson, Eric)
Related: [-]
court Entry Wed 07/03 4:50 PM
An order has been entered in this case directing the procedural consolidation and joint administration of the chapter 11 cases of Blackjewel, L.L.C.19-bk-30289 ; Blackjewel Holdings L.L.C. 19-bk-30290 ; Revelation Energy Holdings, LLC 19-bk-30291; Revelation Management Corporation 19-bk-30292 and Revelation Energy, LLC 19-bk-30293. All further pleadings and other papers shall be filed in, and all further docket entries shall be made in, the chapter 11 case of Blackjewel, L.L.C. Case No. 19-bk-30289. Proofs of Claim shall filed in the case for which the debt was incurred. (ljg)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, July 02, 2019
6 6 court Notice of Missing Documents (Chapter 11) Tue 07/02 10:02 AM
Notice of Missing Documents. Related Document:1 Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11) filed by Debtor Revelation Energy, LLC. Transmitted to BNC with Instructions for Mailing. (ljg)
Related: [-]
Monday, July 01, 2019
7 7 court Hearing Held Tue 07/02 10:18 AM
Hearing held, but Debtors and United Bank could not reach agreement, and Debtors could not move forward with relief sought; Court to await Debtor's intent. Related Document:2 Motion for Joint Administration filed by Debtor Revelation Energy, LLC. (ljg)
Related: [-]
5 5 court Hearing Set/Cnt/Rsch (Document) Mon 07/01 10:30 AM
Notice of Expedited Hearing Scheduled for 7/1/2019 at 02:00 PM at Bankruptcy Courtroom A, Charleston. Related Document:2 Motion for Joint Administration filed by Debtor Revelation Energy, LLC. Transmitted to Joe Supple with Instructions for Mailing. (ljg)
Related: [-]
4 4 notice Appearance and Request for Service Under BR 9010 Mon 07/01 9:31 AM
Notice of Appearance and Request for Service filed by David L. Bissett, Counsel for United States Trustee. (Bissett, David)
Related: [-]
3 3 misc Proposed Order Mon 07/01 4:01 AM
PROPOSED ORDER submitted by Debtor Revelation Energy, LLC Re:2 Motion for Joint Administration. PROPOSED ORDER EITHER PERTAINS TO HEARING SCHEDULED IN THE NEXT 5 BUSINESS DAYS OR DISMISSES THE CASE UNDER 11 USC, 521i. (Supple, Joe)
Related: [-]
2 2 motion Joint Administration Mon 07/01 4:01 AM
Motion by Debtor Revelation Energy, LLC for Joint Administration Debtors Motion for an Order Authorizing Joint Administration of their Chapter 11 Cases Pursuant To Fed. R. Bankr. P. 1015(B) and Local Rule 1015-1(B) (Supple, Joe)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A
1 1 16 pgs misc Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11) Mon 07/01 3:29 AM
Chapter 11 Voluntary Petition - all Schedules and Statements: Incomplete Filings Due: 07/15/2019. Chapter 11 Plan Due: 10/29/2019. Disclosure Statement Disclosure Statement Due 10/29/2019. Assets: UNKNOWN, Liabilities: UNKNOWN. (Supple, Joe)
Related: [-]
crditcrd Auto Docket of Credit Card Mon 07/01 3:30 AM
Receipt of Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11)(3:19-bk-30292) [misc,volp11a] (1717.00). Receipt Number 3400102, Amount $1717.00. (U.S. Treasury)
Related: [-]