Consolidated
Lead case: 3:19-md-02885

Florida Northern District Court
Judge:M Casey Rodgers
Referred: Gary R Jones
Case #: 3:19-cv-01889
Nature of Suit365 Torts - Personal Injury - Product Liability
Cause28:1332 Diversity-Product Liability
Case Filed:Jul 01, 2019
Last checked: Saturday Dec 28, 2019 3:33 AM EST
Defendant
3M COMPANY
Defendant
3M OCCUPATIONAL SAFETY LLC
Defendant
AEARO HOLDING LLC
Defendant
AEARO INTERMEDIATE LLC
Defendant
AEARO LLC
Defendant
AEARO TECHNOLOGIES LLC
Plaintiff
XAVIER TREMBLE
Represented By
THOMAS J HENRY
Thomas J Henry Law Pllc - Corpus Christi Tx
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/02/2025 11:59 PM EDT
Sunday, October 27, 2019
3 3 cmp Amended Complaint Sun 10/27 10:26 AM
SHORT FORM AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants All Defendants., filed by XAVIER TREMBLE. (HENRY, THOMAS)
Related: [-]
Monday, July 01, 2019
2 2 service Summons Issued Mon 07/01 3:10 PM
Summons Issued as to 3M COMPANY. (djb)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint Mon 07/01 11:09 AM
COMPLAINT against 3M COMPANY ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number AFLNDC-4537605.), filed by XAVIER TREMBLE. (HENRY, THOMAS)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet,
Att: 2 Exhibit Summons
utility Add and Terminate Judges Mon 07/01 1:27 PM
MAGISTRATE JUDGE GARY R JONES added. MAGISTRATE JUDGE ELIZABETH M TIMOTHY no longer assigned to case. (djb)
Related: [-]