Consolidated
Lead case: 3:16-md-02734

Florida Northern District Court
Judge:M Casey Rodgers
Referred: Gary R Jones
Case #: 3:19-cv-01909
Nature of Suit367 Torts - Personal Injury - Health Care/Pharmaceutical Personal Injury/Product Liability
Cause28:1332 Diversity-Product Liability
Case Filed:Jul 01, 2019
Terminated:Jul 14, 2021
Last checked: Saturday Dec 28, 2019 3:17 AM EST
Defendant
BRISTOL-MYERS SQUIBB COMPANY
Defendant
OTSUKA AMERICA PHARMACEUTICAL INC
Defendant
OTSUKA PHARMACEUTICAL CO LTD
Plaintiff
EMILY KELLY
Represented By
KIMBALL J JONES
Bighorn Law Llc - Las Vegas Nv
contact info
Plaintiff
WILLIAM KELLY
Represented By
KIMBALL J JONES
Bighorn Law Llc - Las Vegas Nv
contact info


Docket last updated: 2 hours ago
Wednesday, July 14, 2021
10 10 3 pgs order Order Dismissing Case Wed 07/14 2:19 PM
ORDER - The cases identified on Exhibit A are DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE from the active docket of the Court. The Clerk is directed to enter this Order on the docket for each of the cases identified on Exhibit A and then to close those cases for administrative purposes. At the expiration of 30 days without activity, the Clerk must close the cases in their entirety for all purposes. Signed by JUDGE M CASEY RODGERS on 7/14/2021. (djb)
Related: [-]
Monday, January 04, 2021
utility Action Required by District Judge - No NEFs in SEALED Cases Mon 01/04 7:48 AM
ACTION REQUIRED BY DISTRICT JUDGE: Chambers of JUDGE M CASEY RODGERS notified that action is needed Re:9 Consent MOTION for Extension of Deadlines (djb)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, December 30, 2020
9 9 motion Extension of Time to Complete Discovery Wed 12/30 11:43 AM
First MOTION for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery CONSENT MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF DEADLINES by EMILY KELLY, WILLIAM KELLY. (JONES, KIMBALL)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, September 02, 2020
8 8 order Scheduling Order Wed 09/02 2:35 PM
The Court hereby adopts the schedule for case-specific deadlines which was stipulated and agreed to by the parties. See ECF No. 7 . Signed by JUDGE M CASEY RODGERS on 9/2/2020. Deadline to file Kelly-specific Daubert motions and Kelly-specific summary judgment motions on or before 4/30/2021 . (djb)
Related: [-]
Monday, August 31, 2020
utility Action Required by District Judge - No NEFs in SEALED Cases Mon 08/31 8:08 AM
ACTION REQUIRED BY DISTRICT JUDGE: Chambers of JUDGE M CASEY RODGERS notified that action is needed Re:7 Stipulation and Proposed Scheduling Order for Case Specific Deadlines. (djb)
Related: [-]
Friday, August 28, 2020
7 7 misc Stipulation Fri 08/28 3:28 PM
STIPULATION and [Proposed] Scheduling Order for Case Specific Deadlines by OTSUKA AMERICA PHARMACEUTICAL INC, OTSUKA PHARMACEUTICAL CO LTD. (CONNELLY, LUKE)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, September 04, 2019
6 6 service Waiver of Service Executed Wed 09/04 6:39 PM
WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by WILLIAM KELLY, EMILY KELLY. BRISTOL-MYERS SQUIBB COMPANY waiver sent on 8/22/2019, answer due 10/21/2019. (JONES, KIMBALL)
Related: [-]
5 5 service Affidavit of Service Wed 09/04 5:32 PM
AFFIDAVIT of Service for SUMMONS and COMPLAINT served on OTSUKA AMERICA PHARMACEUTICAL, INC. on OTSUKA AMERICA PHARMACEUTICAL, INC., filed by EMILY KELLY, WILLIAM KELLY. (JONES, KIMBALL)
Related: [-]
4 4 misc Affidavit Wed 09/04 2:20 PM
AFFIDAVIT OF FOSS BAKER FOR STATUS REPORT ON SERVICE OF OTSUKA PHARMACEUTICAL CO., LTD. IN JAPAN by EMILY KELLY, WILLIAM KELLY. (JONES, KIMBALL)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, July 02, 2019
3 3 service Summons Issued Tue 07/02 9:55 AM
Summons Issued as to BRISTOL-MYERS SQUIBB COMPANY, #1 OTSUKA AMERICA PHARMACEUTICAL INC, #2 OTSUKA PHARMACEUTICAL CO LTD (djb)
Related: [-]
utility Action Required by District Judge - No NEFs in SEALED Cases Tue 07/02 10:12 AM
ACTION REQUIRED BY DISTRICT JUDGE: Chambers of JUDGE M CASEY RODGERS notified that action is needed Re:2 GOOD FAITH CERTIFICATION AND ACKNOWLEDGMENT (djb)
Related: [-]
Monday, July 01, 2019
2 2 misc Acknowledgment Mon 07/01 2:57 PM
ACKNOWLEDGMENT GOOD FAITH CERTIFICATION AND ACKNOWLEDGMENT . (JONES, KIMBALL)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint Mon 07/01 2:56 PM
COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number AFLNDC-4538139.), filed by WILLIAM KELLY, EMILY KELLY. (JONES, KIMBALL)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet,
Att: 2 Exhibit SUMMONS- Bristol,
Att: 3 Exhibit SUMMONS- OPC,
Att: 4 Exhibit SUMMONS- OAP
utility Add and Terminate Judges Mon 07/01 3:49 PM
JUDGE M CASEY RODGERS and MAGISTRATE JUDGE GARY R JONES added. MAGISTRATE JUDGE MICHAEL J FRANK and SENIOR JUDGE ROGER VINSON no longer assigned to case. (djb)
Related: [-]