Jones et al v. Becerra et al
California Southern District Court | |
Judge: | M James Lorenz |
Referred: | Allison H Goddard |
Case #: | 3:19-cv-01226 |
Nature of Suit | 950 Other Statutes - Constitutionality of State Statutes |
Cause | 42:1983bv Bivens Non-Prisoner |
Case Filed: | Jul 01, 2019 |
Last checked: Saturday Dec 28, 2019 1:44 AM PST |
Defendant
Xavier Becerra
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
DOES 1-20
|
|
Defendant
Martin Horan
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Beebe Family Arms and Munitions LLC
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Firearms Policy Coalition, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Firearms Policy Foundation
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Thomas Furrh
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Matthew Jones
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
North County Shooting Center, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
PWGG, L.P.
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Second Amendment Foundation
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
The Calguns Foundation
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 48 minutes ago |
Friday, March 29, 2024 | ||
138 | 138
2
pgs
order
Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief
Fri 03/29 11:55 AM
Order Granting Joint Motion to Vacate Mandatory Settlement Conference [ECF No.137 ]. Signed by Magistrate Judge Allison H. Goddard on 3/29/2024. (dim) |
|
Thursday, March 28, 2024 | ||
137 | 137
motion
Miscellaneous Relief
Thu 03/28 3:31 PM
Joint MOTION for Exusal from Mandatory Settlement Conference and Related Requirements by Rob Bonta, Allison Mendoza.(Rosenberg, Jennifer) |
|
Att: 1 Declaration of Jennifer E. Rosenberg |