Consolidated
Lead case: 3:19-md-02885

Florida Northern District Court
Judge:M Casey Rodgers
Referred: Gary R Jones
Case #: 3:19-cv-01885
Nature of Suit365 Torts - Personal Injury - Product Liability
Cause28:1332 Diversity-Product Liability
Case Filed:Jul 01, 2019
Terminated:May 06, 2022
Case in other court:Pennsylvania Eastern, 2:19-cv-02465
Last checked: Saturday Dec 28, 2019 3:26 AM EST
Defendant
3M COMPANY
Plaintiff
PHILIP LUBIN
Represented By
LEONARD V FODERA
Fodera & Long - Philadelphia PA
contact info
LEONARD V. FODERA
Fodera & Long, P.C.
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/02/2025 11:59 PM EDT
Friday, May 06, 2022
8 8 30+ pgs order Order Dismissing Case Tue 05/10 10:32 PM
ORDER. The plaintiffs' cases identified on Exhibit A are hereby DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE for failure to comply with a court order. The Clerk is directed to enter a copy of this Order on the main MDL docket and on the individual dockets, and close the cases in their entirety for all purposes. Signed by JUDGE M CASEY RODGERS on 5/6/2022. (lsd)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, July 27, 2021
7 7 notice Notice of Appearance Tue 07/27 12:24 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by LAURA E LAUGHLIN on behalf of PHILIP LUBIN (LAUGHLIN, LAURA)
Related: [-]
Friday, November 01, 2019
6 6 cmp Amended Complaint Fri 11/01 2:50 PM
Master Short Form Complaint AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants All Defendants., filed by PHILIP LUBIN. (FODERA, LEONARD)
Related: [-]
Monday, July 01, 2019
5 5 notice Notice - Other - See Separate Menu for Ntc of Appeal Options Mon 07/01 4:21 PM
NOTICE REGARDING ATTORNEY ADMISSION to Counsel of Record, LEONARD V. FODERA. (djb)
Related: [-]
4 4 transfer Case Transferred In - District Transfer (COURT USE ONLY) Mon 07/01 4:17 PM
Case transferred in from District of Pennsylvania Eastern; Case Number 2:19-cv-02465. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received.
Related: [-]
Thursday, June 27, 2019
3 3 CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER TRANSFERRING CASE TO THE U.S.D.C. FOR THE NORTHERN DISTRICT OF FLORIDA. 6/28/19 ENTERED. (kw, ) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 7/1/2019.]
Related: [-]
Wednesday, June 19, 2019
2 2 AFFIDAVIT of Service by Kevin J Broderick re: served Complaint, Summons upon Christina Olund, Corporation Service Associates by Personal Service on 6/11/2019 (FODERA, LEONARD) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 7/1/2019.]
Related: [-]
Thursday, June 06, 2019
1 1 COMPLAINT against 3M COMPANY ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 198516.), filed by PHILIP LUBIN.(jwl, ) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 7/1/2019.]
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Case Management Track Form,
Att: 2 Civil Cover Sheet,
Att: 3 Designation Form
Summons Issued as to 3M COMPANY. One Forwarded To: Counsel on 6/6/19 (jwl, ) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 7/1/2019.]
Related: [-]
DEMAND for Trial by Jury by PHILIP LUBIN. (jwl, ) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 7/1/2019.]
Related: [-]