New York Eastern District Court
Judge:Peggy Kuo
Referred: Peggy Kuo
Case #: 1:19-cv-03830
Nature of Suit710 Labor - Fair Labor Standards Act
Cause29:201 Fair Labor Standards Act
Case Filed:Jul 02, 2019
Terminated:Nov 13, 2020
Last checked: Sunday Dec 29, 2019 3:28 AM EST
Defendant
Juan Rafael Espinal
Represented By
Andrea Moss
Ali Law Group, P.C.
contact info
Sima Asad Ali
Ali Law Group, P.C.
contact info
Defendant
Los Primos Meat Market, Inc.
Represented By
Andrea Moss
Ali Law Group, P.C.
contact info
Sima Asad Ali
Ali Law Group, P.C.
contact info
Defendant
Franklin Rivera
Represented By
Andrea Moss
Ali Law Group, P.C.
contact info
Sima Asad Ali
Ali Law Group, P.C.
contact info
Plaintiff
Adalberto Guzman
Represented By
Catalina Cadavid
Pechman Law Group
contact info
Gianfranco J Cuadra
Pechman Law Group, PLLC
contact info
Louis Pechman
Pechman Law Group PLLC
contact info
Plaintiff
Sergio Rodriguez
Represented By
Catalina Cadavid
Pechman Law Group
contact info
Gianfranco J Cuadra
Pechman Law Group, PLLC
contact info
Louis Pechman
Pechman Law Group PLLC
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/09/2025 11:59 PM EDT
Friday, November 13, 2020
29 29 2 pgs order Order Dismissing Case Fri 11/13 10:35 AM
ORDER DISMISSING CASE: This action is hereby dismissed and discontinued in its entirety, with prejudice, pursuant to Rule 41(a)(2) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Peggy Kuo on 11/13/2020. (O'Neil-Berven, Ryan)
Related: [-]
Thursday, November 12, 2020
28 28 misc Stipulation of Dismissal Thu 11/12 10:19 AM
STIPULATION of Dismissal on behalf of all parties by Juan Rafael Espinal, Los Primos Meat Market, Inc., Franklin Rivera (Moss, Andrea)
Related: [-]
order 1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings Status Report Order Thu 11/12 8:43 AM
ORDER: Pursuant to the Order filed on October 27, 2020 , the parties were directed to file a stipulation of dismissal by November 9, 2020. The parties have failed to comply with this Court Order and are directed to submit the outstanding Stipulation no later than November 16, 2020. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Peggy Kuo on 11/12/2020. (O'Neil-Berven, Ryan)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, October 27, 2020
order Order on Motion for Settlement Order(Other) ~Util - Set Deadlines Tue 10/27 3:35 PM
Order. Having reviewed the proposed Settlement Agreement26 and related submissions, the Court finds, pursuant to Cheeks v. Freeport Pancake House, Inc. , 796 F.3d 199 (2d Cir. 2015), that the Settlement Agreement is fair and reasonable, that the releases are appropriately limited to the wage and hour claims, and that the attorneys' fees are reasonable. See Wolinsky v. Scholastic Inc. , 900 F.Supp.2d 332, 335-36 (S.D.N.Y. 2012). Accordingly, the Motion for Settlement is granted and the Settlement Agreement is approved. The parties are directed to file a Stipulation of Dismissal no later than November 9, 2020 . Ordered by Magistrate Judge Peggy Kuo on 10/27/2020. (Rand, Matthew)
Related: [-]
Monday, October 26, 2020
27 27 misc Consent to Jurisdiction by US Magistrate Judge Mon 10/26 2:43 PM
CONSENT to Jurisdiction by US Magistrate Judge Case reassigned to Magistrate Judge Peggy Kuo for all further proceedings. Judge Eric N. Vitaliano no longer assigned to case Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned Judges, located on our[LINK:website] . Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. (Almonte, Giselle)
Related: [-]
utility Case No Longer Referred Mon 10/26 2:42 PM
Case no longer referred to Magistrate Judge Peggy Kuo. (Almonte, Giselle)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, October 14, 2020
26 26 motion Settlement Wed 10/14 5:45 PM
MOTION for Settlement Approval by Adalberto Guzman, Sergio Rodriguez. (Pechman, Louis)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit Settlement Agreement,
Att: 2 Exhibit Billing Records
25 25 misc Consent to Jurisdiction by US Magistrate Judge Wed 10/14 4:39 PM
CONSENT to Jurisdiction by US Magistrate Judge by Adalberto Guzman, Sergio Rodriguez. (Pechman, Louis)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, October 13, 2020
order Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File ~Util - Set Deadlines 1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings Tue 10/13 11:50 AM
ORDER granting24 Motion for Extension of Time to File. The deadline for the parties to file a Motion for settlement approval pursuant to Cheeks v. Freeport Pancake House, Inc. , 796 F.3d 199 (2d Cir. 2015) is extended to October 14, 2020. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Peggy Kuo on 10/13/2020. (O'Neil-Berven, Ryan)
Related: [-]
Saturday, October 10, 2020
24 24 motion Extension of Time to File Document Sat 10/10 9:59 AM
First MOTION for Extension of Time to File Settlement Motion by Juan Rafael Espinal, Los Primos Meat Market, Inc., Franklin Rivera. (Moss, Andrea)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, October 07, 2020
order ~Util - Set Deadlines 1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings Wed 10/07 9:23 AM
ORDER: Pursuant to the Minute Entry filed on September 14, 2020 , the parties were directed to file a motion for settlement approval by October 2, 2020. The parties have failed to comply with this Court Order and are directed to submit the outstanding motion no later than October 9, 2020. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Peggy Kuo on 10/7/2020. (O'Neil-Berven, Ryan)
Related: [-]
Monday, September 14, 2020
minutes Settlement Conference ~Util - Set Deadlines 1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings Tue 09/15 8:56 AM
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Peggy Kuo. Settlement Conference held on September 14, 2020. Attorney Catalina Cadavid appeared on behalf of Plaintiffs. Plaintiffs Adalberto Guzman and Sergio Rodriguez were also present, along with a Spanish language interpreter. Attorney Andrea Moss was present for Defendants. Defendant Juan Espinal, son of Juan Rafael Espinal, was present on behalf of Defendants. The parties reached an agreement to settle the case. Pursuant to Cheeks v. Freeport Pancake House, Inc. , 796 F.3d 199 (2d Cir. 2015), the parties are directed to file a motion for settlement approval by October 2, 2020 that includes 1) the proposed settlement agreement; 2) a fairness letter explaining how the settlement agreement, including any attorneys' fees in the agreement, comports with caselaw; and 3) time records, if attorneys' fees are included in the agreement. For guidance, the parties are directed to Lopez v. Nights of Cabiria , 96 F.Supp.3d 170 (S.D.N.Y. 2015); Wolinsky v. Scholastic Inc. , 900 F.Supp.2d 332 (S.D.N.Y. 2012); and Flores v. Food Express Rego Park, Inc. , No. 15-CV-1410 (KAM) (SMG), 2016 WL 386042 (E.D.N.Y. Feb. 1, 2016). If the parties wish to consent to Magistrate Judge Kuo's jurisdiction in this action, they must file the required consent form. A PDF version of which may be found at:[LINK:https://www.uscourts.gov/forms/civil-forms/notice-consent-and-reference-civil-action-magistrate-judge] . (O'Neil-Berven, Ryan)
Related: [-]
Friday, August 28, 2020
order Order on Motion to Adjourn Conference 1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings Fri 08/28 12:26 PM
ORDER granting23 Motion to Adjourn Conference. The Telephone Settlement Conference previously scheduled for August 31, 2020 is adjourned to September 14, 2020 at 2:00 p.m. before Magistrate Judge Peggy Kuo. Counsel are directed to get their clients on the phone, then call toll free (877) 336-1274 and input the Access Code 1453850 at the time of the Conference. Once all parties are on the line, the call will be connected. The security code for the conference will be provided to the parties via e-mail upon receipt of their Settlement Statements. The parties are directed to submit confidential ex parte settlement statements which must include the last offer and demand, to Chambers via email to Kuo_Chambers@nyed.uscourts.gov by September 8, 2020. For guidance on the requirements for the statements, the parties should consult Magistrate Judge Peggy Kuo's Individual Practice RulesDefendants are ordered to produce to Plaintiffs all documents necessary for productive settlement discussions no later than September 8, 2020 . Ordered by Magistrate Judge Peggy Kuo on 8/28/2020. (O'Neil-Berven, Ryan)
Related: [-]
Thursday, August 27, 2020
23 23 motion Adjourn Conference Thu 08/27 3:15 PM
Second MOTION to Adjourn Conference by Juan Rafael Espinal, Los Primos Meat Market, Inc., Franklin Rivera. (Moss, Andrea)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, August 26, 2020
order Order(Other) Wed 08/26 9:21 AM
ORDER: Pursuant to the Order filed on August 11, 2020 , the parties were directed to submit confidential ex parte settlement statements to Chambers via e-mail by August 24, 2020. Defendants have failed to comply with this Court Order and are directed to submit the outstanding documents immediately . Ordered by Magistrate Judge Peggy Kuo on 8/26/2020. (O'Neil-Berven, Ryan)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, August 11, 2020
22 22 motion Adjourn Conference Tue 08/11 9:01 AM
First MOTION to Adjourn Conference by Juan Rafael Espinal, Los Primos Meat Market, Inc., Franklin Rivera. (Moss, Andrea)
Related: [-]
order Order on Motion to Adjourn Conference 1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings Tue 08/11 5:50 PM
ORDER granting22 Motion to Adjourn Conference. The Telephone Settlement Conference previously scheduled for August 19, 2020 is adjourned to August 31, 2020 at 2:00 p.m. before Magistrate Judge Peggy Kuo. Counsel are directed to get their clients on the phone, then call toll free (877) 336-1274 and input the Access Code 1453850 at the time of the Conference. Once all parties are on the line, the call will be connected. The security code for the conference will be provided to the parties via e-mail upon receipt of their Settlement Statements. The parties are directed to submit confidential ex parte settlement statements which must include the last offer and demand, to Chambers via email to Kuo_Chambers@nyed.uscourts.gov by August 24, 2020. For guidance on the requirements for the statements, the parties should consult Magistrate Judge Peggy Kuo's Individual Practice Rules. The parties are directed to exchange all relevant discovery records necessary for the settlement conference as soon as possible. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Peggy Kuo on 8/11/2020. (O'Neil-Berven, Ryan)
Related: [-]
Thursday, July 30, 2020
order Scheduling Order 1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings Thu 07/30 9:33 AM
SCHEDULING ORDER: Due to the Court's unavailability, the Telephone Settlement Conference scheduled for August 20, 2020 is advanced to August 19, 2020 at 2:00 p.m. before Magistrate Judge Peggy Kuo. Plaintiffs, individual defendants, and representatives of the corporate defendants with complete settlement authority must be present. Counsel are directed to get their clients on the phone, then call toll free (877) 336-1274 and input the Access Code 1453850 at the time of the Conference. Once all parties are on the line, the call will be connected. The security code for the conference will be provided to the parties via e-mail upon receipt of their Settlement Statements. Alternatively, all parties may dial in separately. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Peggy Kuo on 7/30/2020. (O'Neil-Berven, Ryan)
Related: [-]
Friday, June 19, 2020
21 21 minutes Initial Conference Hearing ~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings Fri 06/19 4:56 PM
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Peggy Kuo. Initial Conference held on 6/19/2020. Attorney Catalina Cadavid appeared on behalf of plaintiffs. Attorney Andrea Moss appeared on behalf of defendants. The attached Scheduling Order was entered setting deadlines for discovery and other pretrial proceedings. A telephone settlement conference will be held on August 20, 2020 at 2:00 pm before Magistrate Judge Peggy Kuo. Plaintiffs, individual defendants, and representatives of the corporate defendants with complete settlement authority must be present. Counsel are directed to get their clients on the phone, then call toll free (877) 336-1274 and input the Access Code 1453850 at the time of the Conference. Once all parties are on the line, the call will be connected. The security code for the conference will be provided to the parties via e-mail upon receipt of their Settlement Statements. Alternatively, all parties may dial in separately. The parties were directed to submit confidential ex parte Settlement Statements which must include the last offer and demand, to Chambers via email to Kuo_Chambers@nyed.uscourts.gov by August 12, 2020. For guidance on the requirements for the statements, the parties should consult Magistrate Judge Peggy Kuo's Individual Practice Rules. Any request to adjourn the Settlement Conference should be filed by July 31, 2020 . (FTR Log: 10:07 10:26) (O'Neil-Berven, Ryan)
Related: [-]
Thursday, June 18, 2020
20 20 misc Case Management Statement Thu 06/18 3:57 PM
CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT (Moss, Andrea)
Related: [-]
19 19 motion Adjourn Conference Thu 06/18 3:15 PM
First MOTION to Adjourn Conference by Juan Rafael Espinal, Los Primos Meat Market, Inc., Franklin Rivera. (Moss, Andrea)
Related: [-]
order Order on Motion to Adjourn Conference 1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings Thu 06/18 7:36 PM
ORDER granting19 Motion to Adjourn Conference. The Telephone Initial Conference previously scheduled for June 19, 2020 at 10:30 a.m. is advanced to 10:00 a.m. before Magistrate Judge Peggy Kuo. The parties are directed to call toll free (877) 336-1274 and input the Access Code 1453850 at the time of the Conference. No additional security code is needed. Once all parties are on the line, the call will be connected. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Peggy Kuo on 6/18/2020. (O'Neil-Berven, Ryan)
Related: [-]
Thursday, June 04, 2020
order Mediation Status Report Order 1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings Thu 06/04 9:22 AM
MEDIATION STATUS REPORT ORDER: Pursuant to the Order dated March 31, 2020 the parties were directed to submit a joint status report by June 2, 2020. The parties have failed to comply with this Court order and are directed to submit the outstanding status report by June 9, 2020. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Peggy Kuo on 6/4/2020. (O'Neil-Berven, Ryan)
Related: [-]
order Order on Motion for Hearing 1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings Thu 06/04 1:47 PM
ORDER granting18 Motion for Conference. A Telephone Initial Conference is scheduled for June 19, 2020 at 10:30 a.m. before Magistrate Judge Peggy Kuo. The parties are directed to call toll free (877) 336-1274 and input the Access Code 1453850 at the time of the Conference. No additional security code is needed. Once all parties are on the line, the call will be connected. At least five days before the Conference, the parties must file a joint and completed copy of the Proposed Discovery Plan, a PDF version of which may be found at: [LINK:https://img.nyed.uscourts.gov/files/forms/PK-discovplan.pdf] Any request for adjournment of this or any other conference must be made in writing on notice to opposing parties, and must disclose whether or not all parties consent. No request for adjournment will be considered unless made at least two (2) business days before the scheduled conference, except in the event of an emergency. Counsel with knowledge and authority must be present. Per diem counsel may not appear without prior permission of the Court. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Peggy Kuo on 6/4/2020. (O'Neil-Berven, Ryan)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, June 03, 2020
18 18 adr Report of Mediation(Settled/Unsettled) Wed 06/03 8:04 AM
REPORT of Mediation UNSETTLED Both parties must submit a Mediation Report which can be found at: https://www.nyed.uscourts.gov/adr-forms. The Mediation Report must be e-mailed to nyed_adr@nyed.uscourts.gov within two weeks following mediation session.Mediation Report due by 6/17/2020. (Moss, Andrea)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, March 31, 2020
order Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Mediation Status Report Order 1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings Tue 03/31 10:12 AM
ORDER granting17 Motion for Extension of Time to File. The deadline to complete mediation is extended to May 29, 2020. The parties are directed to file a joint status report regarding the result of mediation by June 2, 2020. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Peggy Kuo on 3/31/2020. (O'Neil-Berven, Ryan)
Related: [-]
Monday, March 30, 2020
17 17 motion Extension of Time to File Document Mon 03/30 6:16 PM
MOTION for Extension of Time to File Report of Mediation by Adalberto Guzman, Sergio Rodriguez. (Cadavid, Catalina)
Related: [-]
Thursday, February 27, 2020
adr Selection of Mediator Thu 02/27 10:42 AM
SELECTION OF MEDIATOR: Giulio Zanolla as Mediator. The first mediation session will take place on March 30, 2020 at 10:00 AM at the EDNY Brooklyn Courthouse in Rooms 524 N and 525 N. Fourteen days on or before the session date, counsel shall file with the Mediator their client's mediation statement summarizing the facts, legal issues, particulars of any prior settlement discussions, and the name and title of the client or client representative with full settlement authority who will attend the mediation in person. Attendance in person is required of the trial attorney, insurance adjuster, and client or client representative with full settlement authority. The Confidentiality Stipulation must be signed at the mediation session by all participants and the Mediator and returned via e-mail nyed_adr@nyed.uscourts.gov or fax (718) 613-2333. Contact information for the Mediator is on the docket sheet. Upon completion of the mediation, both parties must submit a Mediation Report which can be found at: https://www.nyed.uscourts.gov/adr-forms. The Mediation Report must be e-mailed to nyed_adr@nyed.uscourts.gov within two weeks following mediation session. Report of Mediation due by 4/13/2020. (Priftakis, Tina)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, February 05, 2020
16 16 motion Extension of Time to File Document Wed 02/05 12:36 PM
Second MOTION for Extension of Time to File Report of Mediation by Juan Rafael Espinal, Los Primos Meat Market, Inc., Franklin Rivera, Giulio Zanolla. (Moss, Andrea)
Related: [-]
order Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File 1 - Terminate Deadlines ~Util - Set Deadlines Wed 02/05 4:28 PM
ORDER granting16 Motion for Extension of Time to File. The deadline to complete mediation is extended to March 20, 2020. The parties are directed to file a joint status report regarding the result of mediation by March 27, 2020. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Peggy Kuo on 2/5/2020. (Riquelme, Claudia)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, January 07, 2020
15 15 motion Extension of Time to File Document Tue 01/07 10:58 AM
First MOTION for Extension of Time to File Report of Mediation by Los Primos Meat Market, Inc.. (Moss, Andrea)
Related: [-]
order Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File 1 - Terminate Deadlines ~Util - Set Deadlines Tue 01/07 4:10 PM
ORDER granting15 Motion for Extension of Time to File. The deadline to complete mediation is extended to February 5, 2020. The parties are directed to file a joint status report regarding the result of mediation by February 12, 2020. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Peggy Kuo on 1/7/2020. (Riquelme, Claudia)
Related: [-]
Monday, January 06, 2020
adr Selection of Mediator Mon 01/06 12:55 PM
SELECTION OF MEDIATOR: Giulio Zanolla selected as Mediator. The first mediation session will take place on February 5, 2020 at 10:00 AM at the EDNY Brooklyn Courthouse in Rooms 102 AN and 110 N. Fourteen days on or before the session date, counsel shall file with the Mediator their client's mediation statement summarizing the facts, legal issues, particulars of any prior settlement discussions, and the name and title of the client or client representative with full settlement authority who will attend the mediation in person. Attendance in person is required of the trial attorney, insurance adjuster, and client or client representative with full settlement authority. The Confidentiality Stipulation must be signed at the mediation session by all participants and the Mediator and returned via e-mail nyed_adr@nyed.uscourts.gov or fax (718) 613-2333. Contact information for the Mediator is on the docket sheet. Upon completion of the mediation, both parties must submit a Mediation Report which can be found at: https://www.nyed.uscourts.gov/adr-forms. The Mediation Report must be e-mailed to nyed_adr@nyed.uscourts.gov within two weeks following mediation session. Report of Mediation due by 2/19/2020. (Priftakis, Tina)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, December 04, 2019
order Order Referring Case to Mediation 1 - Terminate Deadlines ~Util - Set Deadlines Wed 12/04 2:23 PM
ORDER REFERRING CASE to Mediation. This case is referred to EDNY Court-Annexed Mediation to be completed by January 8, 2020. The parties are directed to file a joint status report regarding the result of mediation by January 15, 2020. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Peggy Kuo on 12/4/2019. (Riquelme, Claudia)
Related: [-]
adr Mediation Instructions Wed 12/04 3:24 PM
MEDIATION INSTRUCTIONS for Counsel are available at: https://www.nyed.uscourts.gov/adr-forms. Counsel are to select a mediator, schedule the first mediation session, and file the name of the mediator, date, time and place of the first mediation session via CM/ECF using the event Selection of Mediator. For a list of the EDNY Mediators and their qualifications, see the Court's website at https://www.nyed.uscourts.gov/adr/Mediation/displayAll.cfm. EDNY Mediators are compensated in accordance with EDNY Local Civil Rule 83.8(f)(1)[formerly EDNY Local Civil Rule 83.11(f)(1)]. The Confidentiality Stipulation must be signed at the mediation session by all participants, including the mediator, and sent via email to Robyn_Weinstein@nyed.uscourts.gov. The Confidentiality Stipulation is available at: https://www.nyed.uscourts.gov/adr-forms. Upon completion of the mediation, both parties must submit a Mediation Report which can be found at: https://www.nyed.uscourts.gov/adr-forms. The Mediation Report must be e-mailed to nyed_adr@nyed.uscourts.gov within two weeks following mediation session. (Priftakis, Tina)
Related: [-]
Friday, November 15, 2019
14 14 misc Letter Fri 11/15 12:41 AM
Letter by Juan Rafael Espinal, Los Primos Meat Market, Inc., Franklin Rivera (Ali, Sima)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, November 13, 2019
order ~Util - Set Deadlines Wed 11/13 10:16 AM
ORDER: In light of the parties' status report at13 , if the parties have not provided documents pertaining to Plaintiffs' wages, job description, time sheets, payroll records, and other documents the Court required the parties to exchange prior to their mediation ( See Order at12 ), they must explain their failure to do so by November 15, 2019 . Ordered by Magistrate Judge Peggy Kuo on 11/13/2019. (Prentice, Amanda)
Related: [-]
Friday, November 08, 2019
13 13 misc Status Report Fri 11/08 6:38 PM
STATUS REPORT by Juan Rafael Espinal, Los Primos Meat Market, Inc., Franklin Rivera (Moss, Andrea)
Related: [-]
Friday, August 30, 2019
12 12 order Status Report Order Fri 08/30 2:38 PM
ORDER IN FLSA CASE REQUIRING DISCOVERY AND SETTING INITIAL PRETRIAL DISCOVERY AND MEDIATION SCHEDULE: The parties are ordered to engage in discovery as outlined in the attached Order, and to engage in early settlement discussions. A joint status report regarding settlement efforts must be filed by November 8, 2019. If the parties are unable to settle on their own, the case will be referred to EDNY Court-Annexed Mediation for formal mediation to be completed by January 8, 2020 with a joint report on mediation due by January 15, 2020. The parties may move to waive these requirements and permit the parties to proceed by way of a Proposed Discovery Plan only for good cause, by filing a joint letter request on ECF. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Peggy Kuo on 8/30/2019. (Riquelme, Claudia)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Discovery Plan
Thursday, August 29, 2019
11 11 answer Answer to Complaint Thu 08/29 2:39 PM
FIRST ANSWER to1 Complaint, by All Defendants. (Moss, Andrea)
Related: [-]
Monday, August 19, 2019
10 10 notice Notice of Appearance Mon 08/19 3:22 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Gianfranco J Cuadra on behalf of Adalberto Guzman, Sergio Rodriguez (aty to be noticed) (Cuadra, Gianfranco)
Related: [-]
Monday, July 29, 2019
order Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer Mon 07/29 3:32 PM
ORDER granting9 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. The deadline for defendant Los Primos Meat Market, Inc. to answer or otherwise respond to the complaint is extended to August 30, 2019. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Peggy Kuo on 7/29/2019. (Riquelme, Claudia)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, July 24, 2019
9 9 motion Extension of Time to File Answer Wed 07/24 2:46 PM
First MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re1 Complaint, by Los Primos Meat Market, Inc.. (Moss, Andrea)
Related: [-]
Monday, July 15, 2019
8 8 misc Corporate Disclosure Statement Mon 07/15 5:54 PM
Corporate Disclosure Statement by Juan Rafael Espinal, Los Primos Meat Market, Inc., Franklin Rivera (Moss, Andrea)
Related: [-]
7 7 notice Notice of Appearance Mon 07/15 5:49 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Andrea Moss on behalf of All Defendants (aty to be noticed) (Moss, Andrea)
Related: [-]
6 6 notice Notice of Appearance Mon 07/15 5:48 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Sima Asad Ali on behalf of All Defendants (aty to be noticed) (Ali, Sima)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, July 02, 2019
5 5 misc Quality Control Check - Attorney Case Opening Tue 07/02 11:41 AM
This attorney case opening filing has been checked for quality control. See the attachment for corrections that were made, if any. (Bowens, Priscilla)
Related: [-]
4 4 misc Clerks Notice of Rule 73 Tue 07/02 11:40 AM
In accordance with Rule 73 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Rule 73.1, the parties are notified that if all parties consent a United States magistrate judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action including a (jury or nonjury) trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. Attached to the Notice is a blank copy of the consent form that should be filled out, signed and filed electronically only if all parties wish to consent. The form may also be accessed at the following link:[LINK:http://www.uscourts.gov/uscourts/FormsAndFees/Forms/AO085.pdf] . You may withhold your consent without adverse substantive consequences . Do NOT return or file the consent unless all parties have signed the consent. (Bowens, Priscilla)
Related: [-]
3 3 notice Notice of Appearance Tue 07/02 11:37 AM
NOTICE of Appearance by Catalina Cadavid on behalf of Adalberto Guzman, Sergio Rodriguez (aty to be noticed) (Cadavid, Catalina)
Related: [-]
2 2 service Summons Issued Tue 07/02 11:36 AM
Summons Issued as to All Defendants. (Bowens, Priscilla)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint Tue 07/02 9:13 AM
COMPLAINT against Juan Rafael Espinal, Los Primos Meat Market, Inc., Franklin Rivera filing fee $ 400, receipt number ANYEDC-11627013 Was the Disclosure Statement on Civil Cover Sheet completed -NO,, filed by Adalberto Guzman, Sergio Rodriguez. (Pechman, Louis)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet,
Att: 2 Proposed Summons,
Att: 3 Proposed Summons,
Att: 4 Proposed Summons
utility Case Assigned/Reassigned Tue 07/02 11:34 AM
Case assigned to Judge Eric N. Vitaliano and Magistrate Judge Peggy Kuo. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned Judges, located on our[LINK:website] . Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. (Bowens, Priscilla)
Related: [-]