Williams, Chapter 7 Trustee v. Global Zante, LLC et al
Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 4:17-bk-34196
Lead BK case is: 4:17-bk-34196
Texas Southern Bankruptcy Court | |
Chapter 7 | |
Judge: | David R Jones |
Case #: | 4:19-ap-03555 |
Nature of Suit | 13 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §548 fraudulent transfer |
Case Filed: | Jul 01, 2019 |
Terminated: | Nov 03, 2020 |
Last checked: never |
Defendant
Global Zante, LLC
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Dhanani Investment, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
24 Seven REH, LLC
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Nadyarshah Dhanani
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Randy W. Williams, Chapter 7 Trustee
7924 Broadway, Suite 104
Pearland, TX 77581 |
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 05/03/2024 1:10 PM CDT |
Tuesday, October 17, 2023 | ||
28 | 28
trustee
Remark (batch)
Tue 10/17 1:08 PM
Remark: Case Reassigned from Judge Jones to Judge Norman . (RobbieWestmoreland) |
|
Friday, November 06, 2020 | ||
27 | 27
court
BNC Certificate of Mailing
Sat 11/07 12:04 AM
BNC Certificate of Mailing. No. of Notices: 1. Notice Date 11/06/2020. (Admin.) |
|
Tuesday, November 03, 2020 | ||
26 | 26
order
Dismiss Adversary Proceeding
Wed 11/04 2:13 PM
Order Dismissing and Closing Adversary Signed on 11/3/2020. (VrianaPortillo) |
|
Wednesday, September 23, 2020 | ||
25 | 25
motion
Dismiss Adversary Proceeding
Wed 09/23 3:34 PM
Motion to Dismiss Adversary Proceeding. Objections/Request for Hearing Due in 21 days. Filed by Randy W. Williams, Chapter 7 Trustee (Wolfshohl, Joshua) |
|
Att: 1 Proposed Order | ||
Wednesday, June 17, 2020 | ||
court
Certificate of Notice
Wed 06/17 9:00 AM
Certificate of Email Notice. The parties have indicated that they have reached an agreement and will be uploading a 9019. They will contact the courts case manager once that has been done. The hearing set for June 17, 2020 at 9:30 AM is cancelled. (aalo) |
||
Monday, March 23, 2020 | ||
24 | 24
court
Courtroom Minutes (CM)
Mon 03/23 1:42 PM
Courtroom Minutes. Time Hearing Held: 10:00 AM. Appearances: Josh Wolfshol, Steve Leyh. . By agreement, today's hearing has been continued. Hearing scheduled for 6/17/2020 at 09:30 AM at Houston, Courtroom 400 (DRJ). (aalo) |
|
Thursday, January 16, 2020 | ||
23 | 23
audio
MP3
Thu 01/16 10:00 AM
PDF with attached Audio File. Court Date & Time [ 1/16/2020 9:08:07 AM ]. File Size [ 2816 KB ]. Run Time [ 00:05:52 ]. (Scheduling Conference). (admin) |
|
22 | 22
court
Courtroom Minutes (CM)
Thu 01/16 9:36 AM
Courtroom Minutes. Time Hearing Held: 9:00 am. Appearances: Joshual Wolfshohl for Randy Williams, Trustee, Michael Hirsch for Defendants Global Zante, Dhanani Investment and Nadyarshah Dhanani. The parties are continuing to work through the issues and an audit is being conducted. Scheduling Conference is continued to 3/23/2020 at 10:00 AM at Houston, Courtroom 400 (DRJ). (emiller) |
|
Tuesday, December 17, 2019 | ||
21 | 21
notice
Notice
Tue 12/17 4:02 PM
Notice of Rescheduled Scheduling Conference . Filed by Randy W. Williams, Chapter 7 Trustee (Wolfshohl, Joshua) |
|
court
Certificate of Notice
Tue 12/17 2:04 PM
Certificate of Email Notice. Contacted Josh Wolfshohl. Movant to notice all interested parties and file a certificate of service with the court Hearing rescheduled for 1/16/2020 at 09:00 AM at Houston, Courtroom 400 (DRJ). (aalo) |
||
Wednesday, September 04, 2019 | ||
20 | 20
court
Courtroom Minutes (CM)
Wed 09/04 11:04 AM
Courtroom Minutes. Time Hearing Held: 10:50 AM. Appearances: Joshua Wolfshohl for Randy Williams, Chapter 7 Trustee, Michal Hirsch for Global Zante, LLC. By agreement, today's scheduling conference is continued to 12/18/2019 at 10:00 AM at Houston, Courtroom 400 (DRJ). (VrianaPortillo) |
|
19 | 19
misc
Initial Disclosure Rule 26
Wed 09/04 8:38 AM
Initial Disclosure Rule 26 (Filed By 24 Seven REH, LLC, Nadyarshah Dhanani, Dhanani Investment, Inc., Global Zante, LLC ). (Hirsch, Michael) |
|
Tuesday, September 03, 2019 | ||
18 | 18
misc
Initial Disclosure Rule 26
Tue 09/03 6:32 PM
Initial Disclosure Rule 26 (Filed By Randy W. Williams, Chapter 7 Trustee ). (Wolfshohl, Joshua) |
|
Monday, August 26, 2019 | ||
17 | 17
misc
Joint Discovery/Case Management Plan(for Attorney)
Mon 08/26 2:04 PM
Joint Discovery Plan/Case Management Plan (Filed By Randy W. Williams, Chapter 7 Trustee ). (Wolfshohl, Joshua) |
|
Wednesday, August 07, 2019 | ||
16 | 16
court
BNC Certificate of Mailing
Wed 08/07 11:54 PM
BNC Certificate of Mailing. No. of Notices: 1. Notice Date 08/07/2019. (Admin.) |
|
Monday, August 05, 2019 | ||
15 | 15
order
Adversary Order Setting Hearing
Mon 08/05 3:18 PM
Order Setting Scheduling Conference Scheduling Conference set for 9/4/2019 at 10:00 AM at Houston, Courtroom 400 (DRJ). (aalo) |
|
Thursday, July 25, 2019 | ||
14 | 14
answer
Answer to Complaint
Thu 07/25 1:03 PM
Answer to Complaint Filed by 24 Seven REH, LLC, Nadyarshah Dhanani, Dhanani Investment, Inc., Global Zante, LLC (Hirsch, Michael) |
|
13 | 13
answer
Answer to Complaint
Thu 07/25 12:48 PM
Answer to Complaint Filed by 24 Seven REH, LLC, Nadyarshah Dhanani, Dhanani Investment, Inc., Global Zante, LLC (Hirsch, Michael) |
|
Friday, July 05, 2019 | ||
12 | 12
cmp
Summons Service Executed
Fri 07/05 8:26 AM
Summons Service Executed on Nadyarshah Dhanani 7/3/2019. (Power, Aaron) |
|
11 | 11
cmp
Summons Service Executed
Fri 07/05 8:26 AM
Summons Service Executed on Dhanani Investment, Inc. 7/3/2019. (Power, Aaron) |
|
10 | 10
cmp
Summons Service Executed
Fri 07/05 8:25 AM
Summons Service Executed on 24 Seven REH, LLC 7/3/2019. (Power, Aaron) |
|
9 | 9
cmp
Summons Service Executed
Fri 07/05 8:25 AM
Summons Service Executed on Global Zante, LLC 7/3/2019. (Power, Aaron) |
|
Thursday, July 04, 2019 | ||
8 | 8
court
BNC Certificate of Mailing
Fri 07/05 12:01 AM
BNC Certificate of Mailing. No. of Notices: 1. Notice Date 07/04/2019. (Admin.) |
|
Wednesday, July 03, 2019 | ||
7 | 7
court
Summons Issued
Wed 07/03 9:20 AM
Summons Issued on 24 Seven REH, LLC Date Issued 7/3/2019; Nadyarshah Dhanani Date Issued 7/3/2019; Dhanani Investment, Inc. Date Issued 7/3/2019; Global Zante, LLC Date Issued 7/3/2019. (SarahShelby) |
|
Tuesday, July 02, 2019 | ||
6 | 6
misc
Summons - Request for Issuance
Tue 07/02 4:55 PM
Request for Issuance of Summons on Global Zante, LLC. (Filed By Randy W. Williams, Chapter 7 Trustee ). (Power, Aaron) |
|
5 | 5
misc
Summons - Request for Issuance
Tue 07/02 4:54 PM
Request for Issuance of Summons on Nadyarshah H. Dhanani. (Filed By Randy W. Williams, Chapter 7 Trustee ). (Power, Aaron) |
|
4 | 4
misc
Summons - Request for Issuance
Tue 07/02 4:53 PM
Request for Issuance of Summons on Dhanani Investment, Inc.. (Filed By Randy W. Williams, Chapter 7 Trustee ). (Power, Aaron) |
|
3 | 3
misc
Summons - Request for Issuance
Tue 07/02 4:52 PM
Request for Issuance of Summons on 24 Seven REH, LLC. (Filed By Randy W. Williams, Chapter 7 Trustee ). (Power, Aaron) |
|
2 | 2
order
Judge Jones Order Regarding Exhibit and Witness Lists (Adversary)
Tue 07/02 6:00 AM
|
|
Monday, July 01, 2019 | ||
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint [system event]
Mon 07/01 4:42 PM
Adversary case 19-03555 Nature of Suit: (13 (Recovery of money/property - 548 fraudulent transfer)) Complaint Trustee's Original Complaint by Randy W. Williams, Chapter 7 Trustee against Global Zante, LLC, Dhanani Investment, Inc., 24 Seven REH, LLC, Nadyarshah Dhanani. Fee Amount $350 (Wolfshohl, Joshua) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit A - Global Transfers | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit B - Investment Transfers | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit C - Dhanani Transfers | ||
Att: 4 Exhibit D - Uncashed Checks |