Morgan County Fiscal Court v. Amerisourcebergen Drug Corporation et al
Consolidated
Lead case: 1:17-md-02804
Lead case: 1:17-md-02804
Ohio Northern District Court | |
Judge: | Dan Aaron Polster |
Case #: | 1:19-op-45571 |
Nature of Suit | 470 Other Statutes - Racketeer Influenced and Corrupt Organizations |
Cause | 18:1961 Racketeering (RICO) Act |
Case Filed: | Jul 02, 2019 |
Case in other court: | Kentucky Eastern, 0:19-cv-00056 |
Last checked: Friday Nov 08, 2019 8:01 PM EST |
Defendant
KVK-Tech, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Purdue Frederick Company, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Purdue Pharma Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Purdue Pharma L.P.
|
|
Defendant
Teva Pharmaceutical Industries Ltd.
|
|
Defendant
Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Watson Laboratories Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Watson Pharmaceuticals, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Amneal Pharmaceuticals, LLC
|
|
Defendant
Ortho-McNeil-Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Mylan Pharmaceuticals, Inc.
781 Chestnut Ridge Road
Morgantown, WV 26505 |
|
Defendant
Par Pharmaceutical Companies, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Par Pharmaceuticals, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Rite Aid Corporation
|
|
Defendant
Rite Aid Dayville Distribution Center
|
|
Defendant
Rite Aid Mid-Atlantic Customer Support Center, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Sandoz Inc.
|
|
Defendant
SpecGX LLC
|
|
Defendant
Janssen Pharmaceutica Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Actavis LLC
|
|
Defendant
Actavis Pharma, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Allergan PLC
|
|
Defendant
AmerisourceBergen Drug Corporation
|
|
Defendant
Cardinal Health Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Cephalon, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Endo Health Solutions Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Endo Pharmaceuticals, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Janssen Pharmaceuticals Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Johnson & Johnson
|
|
Defendant
Mallinckrodt LLC
|
|
Defendant
Mallinckrodt PLC
|
|
Defendant
McKesson Corporation
|
|
Defendant
Noramco, Inc.
|
|
Plaintiff
Morgan County Fiscal Court
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 11/08/2019 3:14 PM EST |
Friday, June 07, 2019 | ||
1 | 1 COMPLAINT (NO PROCESS REQUESTED). ( Filing fee $400; receipt number 0643-4381082), filed by Morgan County Fiscal Court.(JLS) [Transferred from kyed on 7/2/2019.] | |
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet | ||
Monday, June 10, 2019 | ||
Conflict Check run. (JLS) [Transferred from kyed on 7/2/2019.] | ||
Clerk's Note: re1 Complaint; MDL Panel (cc: SKV) notified of possible tag along case (MDL No. 2804) by e-mail with a copy of the complaint and docket sheet. (JLS) [Transferred from kyed on 7/2/2019.] | ||
3 | 3 STANDING ORDER IN RE: CIVIL CASES RELATED TO COMPLAINTS FILED AGAINST AMERISOURCEBERGEN DRUG CORPORATION, CARDINAL HEALTH, INC. and McKESSON CORPORATION: 1. Effective immediately, Clerk is DIRECTED to ASSIGN all matters related to the case, Anderson County Fiscal Court v. AmerisourceBergen Drug Corporation, et al. filed as Frankfort Civil Action 17-cv-70 to the Honorable Gregory F. Van Tatenhove; 2. A copy of this Order shall be filed in each appropriate case with a copy to all counsel. Signed by Judge Karen K. Caldwell on 9/22/17.(JLS)cc: COR [Transferred from kyed on 7/2/2019.] | |
Wednesday, June 26, 2019 | ||
4 | 4 INFORMATION COPY OF MDL CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER: MDL No. 2804 (KSS) [Transferred from kyed on 7/2/2019.] | |
5 | 5 CERTIFIED ORDER received from Northern District of Ohio re: Case Transfer to the MDL Panel pursuant to CTO No. CTO-97 filed in MDL Case Number 2804. (JLS)cc: COR [Transferred from kyed on 7/2/2019.] | |
Tuesday, July 02, 2019 | ||
6 | 6 CASE TRANSFERRED IN from District of Kentucky Eastern. Case number 0:19-cv-00056. Original file, certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received. |