Consolidated
Lead case: 3:19-md-02885

Florida Northern District Court
Judge:M Casey Rodgers
Referred: Gary R Jones
Case #: 3:19-cv-01978
Nature of Suit365 Torts - Personal Injury - Product Liability
Cause28:1332 Diversity-Product Liability
Case Filed:Jul 03, 2019
Last checked: Monday Dec 30, 2019 4:05 AM EST
Defendant
3M COMPANY
Defendant
3M OCCUPATIONAL SAFETY LLC
Defendant
AEARO HOLDING LLC
Defendant
AEARO INTERMEDIATE LLC
Defendant
AEARO LLC
Defendant
AEARO TECHNOLOGIES LLC
Plaintiff
BENJAMIN THOMAS
Represented By
THOMAS J HENRY
Thomas J Henry Law Pllc - Corpus Christi Tx
contact info


Docket last updated: 51 minutes ago
Sunday, October 27, 2019
3 3 cmp Amended Complaint Sun 10/27 10:12 AM
SHORT FORM AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants All Defendants., filed by BENJAMIN THOMAS. (HENRY, THOMAS)
Related: [-]
Friday, July 05, 2019
2 2 service Summons Issued Fri 07/05 11:07 AM
Summons Issued as to 3M COMPANY. (djb)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, July 03, 2019
1 1 cmp Complaint Wed 07/03 9:52 AM
COMPLAINT against 3M COMPANY ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number AFLNDC-4540840.), filed by BENJAMIN THOMAS. (HENRY, THOMAS)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet,
Att: 2 Exhibit Summons
utility Add and Terminate Judges Wed 07/03 3:34 PM
JUDGE M CASEY RODGERS and MAGISTRATE JUDGE GARY R JONES added. MAGISTRATE JUDGE MICHAEL J FRANK and SENIOR JUDGE ROGER VINSON no longer assigned to case. (djb)
Related: [-]