Kevin Vann v. Eastman Chemical Company
Original Case: 5:17-cv-01013
Fourth Circuit U.S. Court of Appeals | |
Case #: | 0:19-cv.pr-01647 |
Type | civil private / private |
Nature of Suit | 360 Torts - Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury |
Case Filed: | Jun 18, 2019 |
Terminated: | Nov 23, 2022 |
Last checked: Thursday Nov 24, 2022 3:33 AM EST |
Defendant - Appellee
EASTMAN CHEMICAL COMPANY
|
Represented By
|
Defendant - Appellee
MUNDY MAINTENANCE SERVICE AND OPERATIONS LLC
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff - Appellant
KEVIN R. VANN
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff - Appellant
KELLI D. VANN
|
Represented By
|
GPO
Nov 23 2022
PUBLISHED AUTHORED OPINION filed. Originating case number: 5:17-cv-01010-JMC. [1001271578] [19-1643, 19-1646, 19-1647] |
Docket last updated: 11/24/2022 3:33 AM EST |
Tuesday, June 18, 2019 | ||
1 | 1 1 pgs Case docketed. Originating case number: 5:17-cv-01013-JMC. Case manager: REdwards. 19-1647 RE [Entered: 06/18/2019 11:10 AM] | |
2 | 2 6 pgs DOCKETING NOTICE issued Re: [1] case. Originating case number: 5:17-cv-01013-JMC. Mailed to: Samuel Morgan and Charles Slaughter. 19-1647 RE [Entered: 06/18/2019 11:54 AM] |