Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 2:18-bk-20630

Utah Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 7
Judge:Joel T Marker
Case #: 2:19-ap-02066
Nature of Suit65 Bankruptcy - Dischargeability - other
67 Bankruptcy - Dischargeability - §523(a)(4), fraud as fiduciary, embezzlement, larceny
62 Bankruptcy - Dischargeability - §523(a)(2), false pretenses, false representation, actual fraud
Case Filed:Jul 05, 2019
Terminated:Feb 07, 2020
Last checked: never
Defendant
Timothy Eugene Bray
9448 South Electra Street
Sandy, UT 84094
Represented By
Jesse P. Murff
Murff Law Offices
contact info
Plaintiff
Salt Lake Cable & Harness, Inc.
421 W. 900 N.
North Salt Lake, UT 84054
Represented By
Rita M. Cornish
Parr Brown Gee & Loveless
contact info
Joseph M.R. Covey
Parr Brown Gee & Loveless
contact info


Docket last updated: 8 hours ago
Sunday, February 09, 2020
16 16 generic BNC Certificate of Mailing Re: Order Sun 02/09 10:27 PM
Certificate of Service Re: Order. Related [+]. Notice Date 02/09/2020. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 14 Order on Motion for Default Judgment
15 15 generic BNC Certificate of Mailing Re: Order Sun 02/09 10:27 PM
Certificate of Service Re: Order. Related [+]. Notice Date 02/09/2020. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 13 Findings of Fact and Conclusions of Law and Order
Friday, February 07, 2020
14 14 order Default Judgment (order) Fri 02/07 10:51 AM
Order Granting Motion For Default Judgment Related [+] (adw)
Related: [-] 9
13 13 order Findings of Fact and Conclusions of Law and Order (order) Fri 02/07 10:49 AM
Findings of Fact and Conclusions of Law and Order Regarding Motion for Entry of Default Judgment (adw)
Related: [-]
court Dispose Adversary Case Fri 02/07 11:15 AM
Adversary Case 2:19-ap-2066 Disposed. (adw)
Related: [-]
Thursday, February 06, 2020
12 12 misc Pending Order Thu 02/06 5:39 PM
Pending Order (Hearing Held) Re:9 Motion for Default Judgment. (Cornish, Rita)
Related: [-]
11 11 misc Pending Order Thu 02/06 5:38 PM
Pending Order (Hearing Held) Re:9 Motion for Default Judgment. (Cornish, Rita)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, December 11, 2019
10 10 notice *Notice of Hearing Wed 12/11 10:47 AM
Notice of Hearing Related [+] Filed by Salt Lake Cable & Harness, Inc. Hearing scheduled for 1/14/2020 at 10:00 AM at US Bankruptcy Court. Deadline for filing objections: 12/30/2019. (Cornish, Rita)
Related: [-] 9 Motion for Default Judgment
9 9 motion Default Judgment (Motion) Wed 12/11 10:44 AM
Motion for Default Judgment Filed by Salt Lake Cable & Harness, Inc. (Cornish, Rita)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Index of Exhibits
Att: 2 Exhibit A Complaint in Civil Action
Att: 3 Exhibit B Order Granting SJ
Att: 4 Exhibit C - Order Dismissing Other Claims
Att: 5 Exhibit D Order Renewing Judgment
Att: 6 Exhibit E Order of Restitution
Att: 7 Exhibit F Decl. of Loren East in Support of Motion for Entry of Default
Wednesday, November 20, 2019
8 8 court Default Certificate Wed 11/20 9:17 AM
Default Certificate. (djf)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, November 19, 2019
7 7 notice Pending Default Certificate Tue 11/19 11:47 AM
Pending Default Certificate Filed by Salt Lake Cable & Harness, Inc. (Cornish, Rita)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Affidavit in Support of Entry of Default Certificate against Timothy Eugene Bray
Tuesday, September 03, 2019
6 6 cmp Summons Service Executed Tue 09/03 11:01 AM
Summons Service Executed. Party Served: Timothy Bray. (Covey, Joseph)
Related: [-]
5 5 cmp Summons Service Executed Tue 09/03 10:57 AM
Summons Service Executed. Party Served: Jesse P. Murff. (Covey, Joseph)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, August 20, 2019
misc Request for Reissuance of Summons (NO IMAGE) Tue 08/20 4:46 PM
Request for Reissuance of Summons Filed by Salt Lake Cable & Harness, Inc. (Cornish, Rita)
Related: [-]
Monday, July 29, 2019
4 4 cmp Summons Service Executed Mon 07/29 10:04 AM
Summons Service Executed. Party Served: Timothy Eugene Bray. (Cornish, Rita)
Related: [-]
Sunday, July 07, 2019
3 3 court BNC Certificate of Service - Notice Sun 07/07 10:28 PM
BNC Certificate of Service Re: Notice Related [+]. Notice Date 07/07/2019. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 2 Notice Re: the Filing of a Complaint Objecting to Your Discharge
Friday, July 05, 2019
2 2 court Notice Re: the Filing of a Complaint Objecting to Your Discharge Fri 07/05 4:30 PM
Notice Regarding the Filing of a Complaint Objecting to Your Bankruptcy Discharge. (Admin.)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint Fri 07/05 11:14 AM
Adversary case[LINK 19-02066 . Complaint by Salt Lake Cable & Harness, Inc. against Timothy Eugene Bray. Fee Amount $350. Payment to be made via Pay.gov. Nature of Suit(s): [62 (Dischargeability - 523(a)(2), false pretenses, false representation, actual fraud), 67 (Dischargeability - 523(a)(4), fraud as fiduciary, embezzlement, larceny), 65 (Dischargeability - other)]. (Cornish, Rita)
Related: [-]