Puerto Rico District Court
Judge:Francisco A Besosa
Referred: Marshal D Morgan
Case #: 3:19-cv-01649
Nature of Suit430 Other Statutes - Banks and Banking
Cause12:635 Breach of Insurance Contract
Case Filed:Jul 05, 2019
Terminated:Mar 30, 2021
Last checked: Wednesday Jan 01, 2020 4:33 AM AST
Defendant
Jorge A Dulzaides-Gonzalez
Represented By
Roberto Abesada-Aguet
Correa Acevedo & Abesada Law Offices, Psc
contact info
Defendant
Ricardo L Fernandez
213 Ing. Manuel Domenech Street
San Juan, PR 00918
Represented By
Roberto Abesada-Aguet
Correa Acevedo & Abesada Law Offices, Psc
contact info
Defendant
Puerto Rico Farm Credit, ACA
123 Ing. Manuel Domenech Street
San Juan, PR 00918
Represented By
Karena Montes-Berrios
Marini Pietrantoni Muniz LLC
contact info
Sheila M. Cruz-Rodriguez
Marini Pietrantoni Muniz LLC
contact info
Mauricio O. Muniz-Luciano
Marini Pietrantoni Muniz LLC
contact info
Defendant
Conjugal Partnership Dulzaides-Doe
Represented By
Roberto Abesada-Aguet
Correa Acevedo & Abesada Law Offices, Psc
contact info
Defendant
Conjugal Partnership Fernandez-Doe
Represented By
Roberto Abesada-Aguet
Correa Acevedo & Abesada Law Offices, Psc
contact info
Defendant
Mrs. FNU Dulzaides
Defendant
Mrs. FNU Fernandez
Defendant
XYZ Insurance Co.
Plaintiff
Juan Pagan-Caraballo
E-1 Street 1 Luchetti Development
Yauco, PR 00698
Represented By
Hector E. Pedrosa-Luna
The Law Offices Of Hector E. Pedrosa-Luna
contact info
Frank Torres-Viada
Bufete Frank Torres-Viada
contact info
Plaintiff
Henry Pagan-Perez
E-1 Street 1 Luchetti Development
Yauco, PR 00698
Represented By
Hector E. Pedrosa-Luna
The Law Offices Of Hector E. Pedrosa-Luna
contact info
Frank Torres-Viada
Bufete Frank Torres-Viada
contact info
Plaintiff
Steven Pagan-Perez
E-1 Street 1 Lucheti Development
Yauco, PR 00698
Represented By
Hector E. Pedrosa-Luna
The Law Offices Of Hector E. Pedrosa-Luna
contact info
Frank Torres-Viada
Bufete Frank Torres-Viada
contact info
Plaintiff
Carmen Perez-Quintana
E-1 Street 1 Luchetti Development
Yauco, PR 00698
Represented By
Hector E. Pedrosa-Luna
The Law Offices Of Hector E. Pedrosa-Luna
contact info
Frank Torres-Viada
Bufete Frank Torres-Viada
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/16/2025 11:59 PM AST
Tuesday, March 30, 2021
86 86 order Order on Motion for Reconsideration Tue 03/30 3:16 PM
ORDER re85 Motion for Reconsideration: DENIED. Signed by Judge Francisco A. Besosa on 03/30/2021. (brc)
Related: [-]
85 85 motion Reconsideration Tue 03/30 1:50 PM
MOTION for Reconsideration re84 Judgment,83 Order on Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim,, Order on Motion for Sanctions, filed by Alexandra Rivera-Rios on behalf of All Plaintiffs Responses due by 4/13/2021. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. Related [+] (Rivera-Rios, Alexandra)
Related: [-] 84 ,83
84 84 order Judgment Tue 03/30 9:23 AM
JUDGMENT: In accordance with the Opinion and Order entered on March 30, 2021, this case is DISMISSED, with prejudice.This case is now closed for statistical purposes. Signed by Judge Francisco A. Besosa on 3/30/2021.(AA)
Related: [-]
83 83 1 pgs order Order on Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim Order on Motion for Sanctions Tue 03/30 9:18 AM
ORDER: The parties have reached an extrajudicial agreement that puts an end to this case. (Docket No. 77, Ex. 1.) Consequently, this case is dismissed, with prejudice. Judgment shall be entered accordingly. The Court will not retain jurisdiction to enforce the terms of the parties' agreement. Signed by Judge Francisco A. Besosa on 3/30/2021. (AA)
Related: [-]