Member Case
Lead case is: 4:19-bk-40883

Missouri Eastern Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 11
Judge:Kathy A Surratt-States
Case #: 4:19-bk-44210
Case Filed:Jul 07, 2019
Terminated:Mar 17, 2020

TypeCorporation
Tax IDsubscribers only
# of Creditors1-49
Est. Assets$0 to $50,000
Est. Liabilities $0 to $50,000
Nature of Business Other
Nature of Debts Primarily Business

Debtor
Payless Sourcing, LLC, Debtor
3231 SE 6th Ave
Topeka, KS 66607-2260
Represented By
Richard W. Engel, Jr.
Armstrong Teasdale LLP
contact info
Last checked: never
U.S. Trustee
Office of US Trustee
111 S Tenth St, Ste 6.353
St. Louis, MO 63102


Docket last updated: 32 minutes ago
Thursday, March 19, 2020
19 19 court BNC Certificate of Mailing Thu 03/19 11:42 PM
BNC Certificate of Mailing Notice Date 03/19/2020. Related [+] (Admin.)
Related: [-] 18
Tuesday, March 17, 2020
18 18 order Final Decree Tue 03/17 11:29 AM
Final Decree . (jer, j)
Related: [-]
17 17 8 pgs order Order (Generic) Tue 03/17 11:29 AM
Order Granting(1913 Application to / Reorganized Debtors' Application for Entry of an Order (I) Directing Administrative Consolidation of Claims Registers in Certain Jointly Administered Chapter 11 Cases, (II) Closing Certain Chapter 11 Cases, and (III) Granting Rel filed by Debtor Payless Holdings LLC) . (jer, j)
Related: [-]
court Close Bankruptcy Case Tue 03/17 11:30 AM
Bankruptcy Case Closed (jer, j)
Related: [-]
Friday, July 19, 2019
16 16 order Joint Administration Fri 07/19 3:10 PM
Order Granting Motion For Joint Administration Related [+] (jer, j)
Related: [-] 3
Monday, July 15, 2019
15 15 misc Declaration Concerning Debtor's Schedules Mon 07/15 3:16 PM
Declaration Concerning Debtor's Schedules , Schedule A/B: Property Non-Individual , Schedule D: Non-Individual , Schedule E/F: Creditors Who Have Unsecured Claims Non-Individual , Schedule G: Non-Individual , Schedule H: Non-Individual , Statement of Financial Affairs for Non-Individual , Summary of Assets and Liabilities Schedules for Non-Individual Filed by Debtor Payless Sourcing, LLC. (Engel, Richard)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, July 10, 2019
14 14 misc Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice Wed 07/10 2:15 PM
Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice Filed by U.S. Trustee Office of US Trustee. (Ryczek, Carole)
Related: [-]
13 13 misc Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice Wed 07/10 12:07 PM
Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice Filed by U.S. Trustee Office of US Trustee. (Randolph, Paul)
Related: [-]
12 12 misc Corrected PDF Wed 07/10 11:51 AM
Corrected PDF Filed by Debtor Payless Sourcing, LLC Related [+]. (Engel, Richard)
Related: [-] 10 Amended List of Creditors and Verification of Matrix, 20 Largest Unsecured Creditors
11 11 crditcrd none Wed 07/10 11:18 AM
Receipt of filing fee for Amended List of Creditors and Verification of Matrix 19-44210 [misc,amdcmtrx] ( 31.00). Receipt number 16266078, amount $ 31.00. Related [+] (U.S. Treasury)
Related: [-] Doc#10
10 10 misc 20 Largest Unsecured Creditors Wed 07/10 11:16 AM
Amended List of Creditors and Verification of Matrix. Fee Amount $31, Chapter 11 or Chapter 9 Cases Non- Individual: 20 Largest Unsecured Creditors Filed by Debtor Payless Sourcing, LLC. (Engel, Richard)
Related: [-]
court Case Assigned Wed 07/10 1:03 PM
Judge Kathy A. Surratt-States added to case (ahl, s)
Related: [-]
Monday, July 08, 2019
9 9 misc Creditor Request for Notices Mon 07/08 11:13 AM
Creditor Request for Notices Filed by Creditor PRA Receivables Management LLC. (Smith, Valerie)
Related: [-]
Sunday, July 07, 2019
8 8 notice Notice of Hearing Sun 07/07 4:41 PM
Notice of Hearing Filed by Debtor Payless Sourcing, LLC Related [+]. Hearing to be held on 7/17/2019 at 10:00 AM Bankruptcy Courtroom 7 North for5 and for7 and for3 and for6 , (Engel, Richard)
Related: [-] 3 Motion for Joint Administration Filed by Debtor Payless Sourcing, LLC Hearing scheduled 7/17/2019 at 10:00 AM at Bankruptcy Courtroom 7 North.,5 Motion to / for an Order Directing that Certain Orders in the Chapter 11 Cases of Payless Holdings LLC, et al be made Applicable to the July Debtors in Subsequently Filed Cases Filed by Debtor Payless Sourcing, LLC Hearing scheduled 7/17/2019 at 10:00 AM at Bankruptcy Courtroom 7 North.,6 Motion to / for an Order Establishing Bar Dates for Filing Proofs of Claim and Approving Form and Manner of Notice Thereof Solely with Respect to the July Debtors Filed by Debtor Payless Sourcing, LLC Hearing scheduled 7/17/2019 at 10:00 AM at Bankruptcy Courtroom 7 North.,7 Motion to Expedite Hearing (related documents3 Motion for Joint Administration,5 Generic Motion,6 Generic Motion) Filed by Debtor Payless Sourcing, LLC Hearing scheduled 7/17/2019 at 10:00 AM at Bankruptcy Courtroom 7 North.
7 7 motion Expediting Hearing Sun 07/07 4:36 PM
Motion to Expedite Hearing Related [+] Filed by Debtor Payless Sourcing, LLC Hearing scheduled 7/17/2019 at 10:00 AM at Bankruptcy Courtroom 7 North. (Engel, Richard)
Related: [-] 3 Motion for Joint Administration,5 Generic Motion,6 Generic Motion
6 6 motion Generic Motion Sun 07/07 4:27 PM
Motion to / for an Order Establishing Bar Dates for Filing Proofs of Claim and Approving Form and Manner of Notice Thereof Solely with Respect to the July Debtors Filed by Debtor Payless Sourcing, LLC Hearing scheduled 7/17/2019 at 10:00 AM at Bankruptcy Courtroom 7 North. (Engel, Richard)
Related: [-]
5 5 motion Generic Motion Sun 07/07 4:18 PM
Motion to / for an Order Directing that Certain Orders in the Chapter 11 Cases of Payless Holdings LLC, et al be made Applicable to the July Debtors in Subsequently Filed Cases Filed by Debtor Payless Sourcing, LLC Hearing scheduled 7/17/2019 at 10:00 AM at Bankruptcy Courtroom 7 North. (Engel, Richard)
Related: [-]
4 4 misc Support/Supplement Sun 07/07 4:11 PM
Support/Supplement Re: Declaration of Stephen Marotta In Support of Chapter 11 Petitions of the July Debtors Filed by Debtor Payless Sourcing, LLC Related [+]. (Engel, Richard)
Related: [-] 1 Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11)
3 3 9 pgs motion Joint Administration Sun 07/07 4:03 PM
Motion for Joint Administration Filed by Debtor Payless Sourcing, LLC Hearing scheduled 7/17/2019 at 10:00 AM at Bankruptcy Courtroom 7 North. (Engel, Richard)
Related: [-]
2 2 crditcrd none Sun 07/07 2:54 PM
Receipt of filing fee for Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11) 19-44210 [misc,volp11a] (1717.00). Receipt number 16255390, amount $1717.00. Related [+] (U.S. Treasury)
Related: [-] Doc#1
1 1 16 pgs misc Voluntary Petition - Attorney (Chapter 11) Sun 07/07 2:52 PM
Chapter 11 Voluntary Petition Non-Individual, Schedules and Statements. Fee Amount $1717 Filed by Payless Sourcing, LLC (Engel, Richard)
Related: [-]