Member Case
Lead case is: 4:19-bk-40883

Missouri Eastern Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 11
Judge:Kathy A Surratt-States
Case #: 4:19-bk-44211
Case Filed:Jul 07, 2019
Terminated:Sep 11, 2023

TypeCorporation
Tax IDsubscribers only
# of Creditors50-99
Est. Assets$100,000,001 to $500 million
Est. Liabilities $50,000,001 to $100 million
Nature of Business Other
Nature of Debts Primarily Business

Debtor
Collective Brands Logistics Limited, Debtor

,
Represented By
Richard W. Engel, Jr.
Armstrong Teasdale LLP
contact info
Last checked: never
U.S. Trustee
Office of US Trustee
111 S Tenth St, Ste 6.353
St. Louis, MO 63102


Docket last updated: 40 minutes ago
Monday, September 11, 2023
15 15 order Final Decree Mon 09/11 9:55 AM
Final Decree . (Cow, J)
Related: [-]
court Close Bankruptcy Case Mon 09/11 10:02 AM
Bankruptcy Case Closed (Cow, J)
Related: [-]
Friday, July 19, 2019
14 14 order Joint Administration Fri 07/19 3:08 PM
Order Granting Motion For Joint Administration Related [+] (jer, j)
Related: [-] 3
Monday, July 15, 2019
13 13 misc Declaration Concerning Debtor's Schedules Mon 07/15 3:22 PM
Declaration Concerning Debtor's Schedules , Schedule A/B: Property Non-Individual , Schedule D: Non-Individual , Schedule E/F: Creditors Who Have Unsecured Claims Non-Individual , Schedule G: Non-Individual , Schedule H: Non-Individual , Statement of Financial Affairs for Non-Individual , Summary of Assets and Liabilities Schedules for Non-Individual Filed by Debtor Collective Brands Logistics Limited Related [+]. (Engel, Richard)
Related: [-] 9 14-Day Order and Notice of Missing Documents
Wednesday, July 10, 2019
12 12 court BNC Certificate of Mailing Wed 07/10 11:48 PM
BNC Certificate of Mailing Notice Date 07/10/2019. Related [+] (Admin.)
Related: [-] 9
11 11 misc Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice Wed 07/10 2:17 PM
Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice Filed by U.S. Trustee Office of US Trustee. (Ryczek, Carole)
Related: [-]
10 10 misc Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice Wed 07/10 12:10 PM
Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice Filed by U.S. Trustee Office of US Trustee. (Randolph, Paul)
Related: [-]
Monday, July 08, 2019
court Case Assigned Mon 07/08 9:04 AM
Judge Kathy A. Surratt-States added to case (ahl, s)
Related: [-]
Sunday, July 07, 2019
9 9 court 14-Day Order and Notice of Missing Documents Mon 07/08 10:54 AM
Order and Notice of Missing Documents Summary of Assets and Liabilities due 7/22/2019.Schedule A/B due 7/22/2019. Schedule D due 7/22/2019.Schedule E/F due 7/22/2019. Schedule G due 7/22/2019. Schedule H due 7/22/2019. Declaration Concerning Debtors Schedules due 7/22/2019. Statement of Financial Affairs due 7/22/2019. Chapter 11 Income Form 122B due 7/22/2019. (bai, j)
Related: [-]
8 8 notice Notice of Hearing Sun 07/07 4:42 PM
Notice of Hearing Filed by Debtor Collective Brands Logistics Limited Related [+]. Hearing to be held on 7/17/2019 at 10:00 AM Bankruptcy Courtroom 7 North for5 and for3 and for6 and for7 , (Engel, Richard)
Related: [-] 3 Motion for Joint Administration Filed by Debtor Collective Brands Logistics Limited Hearing scheduled 7/17/2019 at 10:00 AM at Bankruptcy Courtroom 7 North.,5 Motion to / for an Order Directing that Certain Orders in the Chapter 11 Cases of Payless Holdings LLC et al be made Applicable to the July Debtors in Subsequently Filed Cases Filed by Debtor Collective Brands Logistics Limited Hearing scheduled 7/17/2019 at 10:00 AM at Bankruptcy Courtroom 7 North.,6 Motion to / for an Order Establishing Bar Dates for Filing Proofs of Claim and Approving Form and Manner of Notice Thereof Solely with Respect to the July Debtors Filed by Debtor Collective Brands Logistics Limited Hearing scheduled 7/17/2019 at 10:00 AM at Bankruptcy Courtroom 7 North.,7 Motion to Expedite Hearing (related documents3 Motion for Joint Administration,5 Generic Motion,6 Generic Motion) Filed by Debtor Collective Brands Logistics Limited Hearing scheduled 7/17/2019 at 10:00 AM at Bankruptcy Courtroom 7 North.
7 7 motion Expediting Hearing Sun 07/07 4:35 PM
Motion to Expedite Hearing Related [+] Filed by Debtor Collective Brands Logistics Limited Hearing scheduled 7/17/2019 at 10:00 AM at Bankruptcy Courtroom 7 North. (Engel, Richard)
Related: [-] 3 Motion for Joint Administration,5 Generic Motion,6 Generic Motion
6 6 motion Generic Motion Sun 07/07 4:28 PM
Motion to / for an Order Establishing Bar Dates for Filing Proofs of Claim and Approving Form and Manner of Notice Thereof Solely with Respect to the July Debtors Filed by Debtor Collective Brands Logistics Limited Hearing scheduled 7/17/2019 at 10:00 AM at Bankruptcy Courtroom 7 North. (Engel, Richard)
Related: [-]
5 5 motion Generic Motion Sun 07/07 4:16 PM
Motion to / for an Order Directing that Certain Orders in the Chapter 11 Cases of Payless Holdings LLC et al be made Applicable to the July Debtors in Subsequently Filed Cases Filed by Debtor Collective Brands Logistics Limited Hearing scheduled 7/17/2019 at 10:00 AM at Bankruptcy Courtroom 7 North. (Engel, Richard)
Related: [-]
4 4 misc Support/Supplement Sun 07/07 4:12 PM
Support/Supplement Re: Declaration of Stephen Marotta In Support of Chapter 11 Petitions of the July Debtors Filed by Debtor Collective Brands Logistics Limited Related [+]. (Engel, Richard)
Related: [-] 1 Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11)
3 3 9 pgs motion Joint Administration Sun 07/07 4:05 PM
Motion for Joint Administration Filed by Debtor Collective Brands Logistics Limited Hearing scheduled 7/17/2019 at 10:00 AM at Bankruptcy Courtroom 7 North. (Engel, Richard)
Related: [-]
2 2 crditcrd none Sun 07/07 3:03 PM
Receipt of filing fee for Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11) 19-44211 [misc,volp11a] (1717.00). Receipt number 16255394, amount $1717.00. Related [+] (U.S. Treasury)
Related: [-] Doc#1
1 1 19 pgs misc Voluntary Petition - Attorney (Chapter 11) Sun 07/07 3:02 PM
Chapter 11 Voluntary Petition Non-Individual, Schedules and Statements. Fee Amount $1717 Filed by Collective Brands Logistics Limited Summary of Assets and Liabilities due 7/22/2019.Schedule A/B due 7/22/2019. Schedule C due 7/22/2019. Schedule D due 7/22/2019.Schedule E/F due 7/22/2019. Schedule G due 7/22/2019. Schedule H due 7/22/2019. Schedule I due 7/22/2019. Schedule J due 7/22/2019. Declaration Concerning Debtors Schedules due 7/22/2019. Statement of Financial Affairs due 7/22/2019. Chapter 11 Income Form 122B due 7/22/2019. Credit Counseling Date: 7/22/2019. (Engel, Richard)
Related: [-]