City of Oviedo, Florida v. Purdue Pharma L.P., et al
Consolidated
Lead case: 1:17-md-02804
Lead case: 1:17-md-02804
Ohio Northern District Court | |
Judge: | Dan Aaron Polster |
Case #: | 1:19-op-45584 |
Nature of Suit | 470 Other Statutes - Racketeer Influenced and Corrupt Organizations |
Cause | 18:1961 Racketeering (RICO) Act |
Case Filed: | Jul 08, 2019 |
Case in other court: | Florida Middle, 6:19-cv-01095 |
Last checked: Friday Nov 08, 2019 8:02 PM EST |
Defendant
Mallinckrodt LLC
|
|
Defendant
Watson Laboratories Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Walmart Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Walgreens Boots Alliance Inc.
|
|
Defendant
The Purdue Frederick Company Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Teva Pharmaceutical Industries Ltd.
|
|
Defendant
SpecGX LLC
|
|
Defendant
Purdue Pharma L.P.
|
|
Defendant
Purdue Pharma Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Par Pharmaceutical, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Par Pharmaceutical Companies, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Ortho-Mcneil-Janssen Pharmaceuticals Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Noramco Inc
|
|
Defendant
McKesson Corporation
|
|
Defendant
Mallinckrodt PLC
|
|
Defendant
Johnson & Johnson
|
|
Defendant
Janssen Pharmaceuticals Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Janssen Pharmaceutica Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Insys Therapeutics Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Endo Pharmaceuticals Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Endo Health Solutions Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Cephalon Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Cardinal Health Inc.
|
|
Defendant
CVS Health Corp.
|
|
Defendant
AmerisourceBergen Corporation
|
|
Defendant
Allergan PLC
|
|
Defendant
Allergan Finance LLC
|
|
Defendant
Actavis Pharma, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Actavis LLC
|
|
Plaintiff
City of Oviedo, Florida
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 11/04/2019 4:27 PM EST |
Thursday, June 13, 2019 | ||
1 | 1 289 pgs COMPLAINT against All Defendants with Jury Demand (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 113A-15575443) filed by All Plaintiffs.(Romano, Eric) [Transferred from flmd on 7/8/2019.] | |
2 | 2 NOTICE of filing Civil Cover Sheet re1 Complaint by City of Oviedo, Florida (Romano, Eric) Modified on 6/14/2019 (LMM). [Transferred from flmd on 7/8/2019.] | |
3 | 3 NEW CASE ASSIGNED to Judge Roy B. Dalton, Jr. and Magistrate Judge Daniel C. Irick. New case number: 6:19-cv-1095-Orl-37DCI. (SJB) [Transferred from flmd on 7/8/2019.] | |
Friday, June 14, 2019 | ||
4 | 4 POSSIBLE MDL Tag Along case for MDL Case Number 2804, Information emailed to MDL Panel on 6/13/19, including cover letter, copy of complaint, and docket sheet. (MAA) [Transferred from flmd on 7/8/2019.] | |
Att: 3 6 19cv1094 DOCKET & #(4) 6:19cv1094 COMPLAINT; #(5) 6:19cv1095 DOCKET & #(6) 6:19cv1095 COMPLAINT; #(7) 6:19cv1098 DOCKET & #(8) 6:19cv1098 COMPLAINT; and #(9) 6:19cv1103 DOCKET & | ||
Att: 10 6 19cv1103 COMPLAINT | ||
Wednesday, June 19, 2019 | ||
5 | 5 RELATED CASE ORDER AND NOTICE of designation under Local Rule 3.05 - track 2. Signed by Deputy Clerk on 6/19/2019. (ctp)(JLC) [Transferred from flmd on 7/8/2019.] | |
6 | 6 INTERESTED PERSONS ORDER. Signed by Deputy Clerk on 6/19/2019. (ctp)(JLC) [Transferred from flmd on 7/8/2019.] | |
Monday, July 01, 2019 | ||
7 | 7 MULTIDISTRICT LITIGATION panel order transferring case to: Northern District of Ohio MDL case number: 2804. CTO-98. (LMM) [Transferred from flmd on 7/8/2019.] | |
Monday, July 08, 2019 | ||
8 | 8 CASE TRANSFERRED IN from District of Florida Middle. Case number 6:19-cv-01095. Original file, certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received. |