Alaska District Court
Judge:Sharon L Gleason
Case #: 1:19-cv-00009
Nature of Suit340 Torts - Personal Injury - Marine
CauseNo cause code entered
Case Filed:Jun 26, 2019
Last checked: Monday Dec 23, 2019 12:26 AM AKST
Defendant
The Boat Company
Represented By
Chris P. Reilly
Nicoll Black & Feig
contact info
Plaintiff
George L Maxwell
85 River Road, Unit A5 C/O P.O. Box 38
Essex, CT 06426


Docket last updated: 2 hours ago
Tuesday, October 27, 2020
22 22 order Order Tue 10/27 1:08 PM
SLG TEXT ORDER : The Court has reviewed and APPROVES the parties Stipulation of Dismissal with Prejudice Pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 41(a)(1)(A)(ii) 21 . This action is DISMISSED with prejudice and without costs to any party. (CFR, CHAMBERS STAFF) Modified on 10/27/2020 to add the docket number (JLH, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
Monday, October 26, 2020
21 21 motion Stipulation Mon 10/26 2:27 PM
STIPULATION of Dismissal - Unopposed by The Boat Company. Related [+]
Related: [-] illy, Chris
Att: 1 Proposed Order
Friday, September 18, 2020
20 20 respm Reply to Response to Motion Fri 09/18 1:07 PM
REPLY to Response to Motion re16 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by The Boat Company. Related [+]
Related: [-] illy, Chris
Thursday, August 20, 2020
19 19 misc Declaration Thu 08/20 11:35 AM
DECLARATION of Dr. Sherman M. Bull re16 MOTION for Summary Judgment by The Boat Company. Related [+]
Related: [-] illy, Chris
18 18 misc Declaration Thu 08/20 11:34 AM
DECLARATION of Peggy Bull re16 MOTION for Summary Judgment by The Boat Company. Related [+]
Related: [-] illy, Chris
17 17 misc Declaration Thu 08/20 11:31 AM
DECLARATION of Ken Gerken re16 MOTION for Summary Judgment by The Boat Company. Related [+]
Related: [-] illy, Chris
Att: 1 Exhibit 1,
Att: 2 Exhibit 2,
Att: 3 Exhibit 3,
Att: 4 Exhibit 4,
Att: 5 Exhibit 5
16 16 motion Summary Judgment Thu 08/20 11:20 AM
MOTION for Summary Judgment by The Boat Company Related [+]
Related: [-] illy, Chris
Friday, May 22, 2020
15 15 1 pgs order Order Fri 05/22 1:54 PM
NOTICE OF DISCONTINUATION OF COPIES Signed by Judge Sharon L. Gleason on 5/22/20. (JLH, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
Friday, April 24, 2020
14 14 2 pgs order Order Staying Case Fri 04/24 9:12 PM
ORDER STAYING CASE: Pursuant to Miscellaneous General Order 20-11 and 20-13, the case is STAYED until June 1, 2020 , unless the Court orders the stay end on a different date. Signed by Judge Matthew McCrary Scoble on 4/24/2020. (JBO, CHAMBERS STAFF)
Related: [-]
Friday, February 14, 2020
13 13 order Scheduling Order ~Util - Set Deadlines Tue 02/18 10:00 AM
SCHEDULING ORDER: Amended Pleadings due by 5/22/2020 . Pretrial Motions due by 2/26/2021 . Dispositive Motions due by 3/26/2021 . Discovery due by 2/12/2021 . Expert Witness List due by 11/13/2020 . Final Discovery Witness List due by 12/30/2020 . See Order for further details and deadlines . Signed by Judge Matthew McCrary Scoble on 2/14/2020. (JBO, CHAMBERS STAFF)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, February 12, 2020
12 12 misc Corporate Disclosure Statement Wed 02/12 1:10 PM
Corporate Disclosure Statement by The Boat Company. Related [+]
Related: [-] illy, Chris
Friday, February 07, 2020
11 11 misc Report of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting Fri 02/07 1:43 PM
REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. Related [+]
Related: [-] illy, Chris
Friday, January 10, 2020
10 10 order Initial Case Status Report Order Fri 01/10 7:51 AM
INITIAL CASE STATUS REPORT/CASE SCHEDULING AND PLANNING ORDER: Counsel for plaintiff shall serve and file the Rule 26 Meeting Report within 28 days of service of this order. (BJK, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, December 17, 2019
9 9 answer Answer to Complaint Tue 12/17 1:55 PM
ANSWER to1 Complaint by The Boat Company Related [+]
Related: [-] illy, Chris
Friday, December 13, 2019
8 8 service Summons Returned Executed Fri 12/13 12:04 PM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by George L Maxwell. The Boat Company served on 11/27/2019, answer due 12/18/2019. (PXS, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, December 10, 2019
7 7 notice Notice of Appearance Tue 12/10 9:33 AM
NOTICE of Appearance by Chris P. Reilly on behalf of The Boat Company Related [+]
Related: [-] illy, Chris
Tuesday, November 26, 2019
6 6 1 pgs order Order ~Util - Set Deadlines ~Util - Terminate Motions Tue 11/26 9:43 AM
MMS ORDER: MOTION for Extension of Time to File Proof of Service re5 is GRANTED . See Order for details and deadlines . Signed by Judge Matthew McCrary Scoble on 11/26/2019. (JBO, CHAMBERS STAFF)
Related: [-]
Friday, November 15, 2019
5 5 4 pgs motion Extension of Time to File Document Fri 11/15 2:35 PM
MOTION for Extension of Time to Make Service of Summons and Complaint, Rule 4 (m) by George L. Maxwell.(PXS, COURT STAFF) Modified on 11/15/2019 to correct filers (PXS, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
Thursday, October 31, 2019
4 4 order Order ~Util - Set Deadlines Thu 10/31 4:14 PM
Dismissal for Failure to Serve (Warning!). Proof of service is lacking as to defendant named below. Any defendant as to whom a proof of service is not on file by 90 days from the filing of the complaint will be dismissed. Rule 4(m). Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. Defendant: The Boat Company a/k/a The Boat Company, LTD (CME, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, September 11, 2019
misc Docket Annotation Wed 09/11 11:17 AM
This matter is hereby reassigned to District Judge Gleason. The Magistrate Judge previously assigned in the matter will remain on the case as referral only. Parties are advised to use the case number 1:19-cv-00009-SLG-MMS on all future filings. (BJK, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
Monday, July 08, 2019
service 1 - Summons Issued Mon 07/08 11:32 AM
Summons Issued as to The Boat Company. (KXC, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
misc Declination of Consent Mon 07/08 12:01 PM
Notice of Assignment to a US Magistrate Judge and Declination of Consent form. Please Note: Forms must NOT be electronically filed with the Court. Each party will be deemed to have knowingly and voluntarily consented to proceed before the assigned Magistrate Judge if this form is not returned by 7/29/2019. (KXC, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, June 26, 2019
3 3 2 pgs service Unissued Summons Mon 07/08 11:16 AM
Unissued summons re Defendant The Boat Company, (KXC, COURT STAFF) Modified on 7/8/2019 to reflect date filed. (KXC, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
2 2 misc Civil Cover Sheet Mon 07/08 11:14 AM
Civil Cover Sheet (KXC, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
1 1 3 pgs cmp Complaint Mon 07/08 11:13 AM
COMPLAINT against The Boat Company (Filing fee $ 400. Receipt #098468), filed by George L Maxwell.(KXC, COURT STAFF) Modified on 7/8/2019 to reflect date filed and add receipt number (KXC, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]