Massachusetts District Court
Judge:Nathaniel M Gorton
Case #: 1:19-cv-11490
Nature of Suit190 Contract - Other Contract
Cause28:1332 Diversity-Breach of Contract
Case Filed:Jul 09, 2019
Terminated:Nov 05, 2019
Last checked: Sunday Jan 05, 2020 4:45 AM EST
Defendant
James M. Henebury
13 Oriole Dr.
Milford, MA 01757
Represented By
Carl S. Levin
Armstrong, Gibbons & Gnys, LLP
contact info
Defendant
MFR Developing LLC
200 Main Street Unit #3
Pawtucket, RI 02860
Defendant
Michael F. Rose Jr.
28 Tanglewood Dr.
Attleboro, MA 02703
Defendant
Michelle Henebury
13 Oriole Dr.
Milford, MA 01757
Represented By
Carl S. Levin
Armstrong, Gibbons & Gnys, LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
Allied World Insurance Company
30 S. 17th Street 16th Floor
Philadelphia, PA 19103
Represented By
Robert M. Dunn
Devlieger Hilser, P.C.
contact info
Paul T. Devlieger
Devlieger Hilser, P.C.
contact info
Robert E. Riley
Law Offices Of Robert E. Riley
contact info


Docket last updated: 1 hours ago
Monday, November 04, 2019
21 21 notice Notice of Voluntary Dismissal Mon 11/04 4:41 PM
NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Allied World Insurance Company (Devlieger, Paul)
Related: [-]
Friday, October 04, 2019
20 20 order Order on Motion for Leave to Appear Fri 10/04 10:11 AM
Judge Nathaniel M. Gorton: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered ALLOWING 17 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Added Paul T. DeVlieger. Attorneys admitted Pro Hac Vice must register for electronic filing if the attorney does not already have an ECF account in this district. To register go to the Court website at www.mad.uscourts.gov. Select Case Information, then Electronic Filing (CM/ECF) and go to the CM/ECF Registration Form. ; ALLOWING 18 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Added Robert M. Dunn. Attorneys admitted Pro Hac Vice must register for electronic filing if the attorney does not already have an ECF account in this district. To register go to the Court website at www.mad.uscourts.gov. Select Case Information, then Electronic Filing (CM/ECF) and go to the CM/ECF Registration Form. (Vieira, Leonardo)
Related: [-]
Thursday, October 03, 2019
19 19 notice Notice - Other Thu 10/03 3:40 PM
NOTICE re15 Stipulation,16 Stipulation. Any further requests for an extension of time to answer the Complaint must be filed by way of motion. (Lima, Christine)
Related: [-]
18 18 motion Appear Pro Hac Vice Thu 10/03 10:16 AM
MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for admission of Robert M. Dunn Filing fee: $ 100, receipt number 0101-7907270 by Allied World Insurance Company.(Riley, Robert)
Related: [-]
17 17 motion Appear Pro Hac Vice Thu 10/03 10:14 AM
MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for admission of Paul T. DeVlieger Filing fee: $ 100, receipt number 0101-7907258 by Allied World Insurance Company.(Riley, Robert)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, October 01, 2019
16 16 misc Stipulation Tue 10/01 1:38 PM
STIPULATION To Extend Time To Answer by Michelle Henebury. (Levin, Carl)
Related: [-]
15 15 misc Stipulation Tue 10/01 1:37 PM
STIPULATION To Extend Time To Answer by James M. Henebury. (Levin, Carl)
Related: [-]
14 14 service Summons Returned Executed Tue 10/01 9:30 AM
SUMMONS Returned Executed Michael F. Rose Jr. served on 9/27/2019, answer due 10/18/2019. (Riley, Robert)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, September 03, 2019
13 13 misc Stipulation Tue 09/03 9:39 AM
STIPULATION Extend Time to File Answer by Michelle Henebury. (Levin, Carl)
Related: [-]
12 12 misc Stipulation Tue 09/03 9:39 AM
STIPULATION Extend Time to File Answer by James M. Henebury. (Levin, Carl)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, August 06, 2019
11 11 notice Notice of Appearance Tue 08/06 1:14 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Carl S. Levin on behalf of Michelle Henebury (Levin, Carl)
Related: [-]
Friday, August 02, 2019
10 10 misc Stipulation Fri 08/02 9:40 AM
STIPULATION by James M. Henebury. (Levin, Carl)
Related: [-]
9 9 notice Notice of Appearance Fri 08/02 9:39 AM
NOTICE of Appearance by Carl S. Levin on behalf of James M. Henebury (Levin, Carl)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, July 31, 2019
8 8 misc Corporate Disclosure Statement Wed 07/31 11:50 AM
CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Allied World Insurance Company. (Riley, Robert)
Related: [-]
7 7 service Summons Returned Executed Wed 07/31 11:45 AM
SUMMONS Returned Executed Michael F. Rose Jr. served on 7/16/2019, answer due 8/6/2019. (Riley, Robert)
Related: [-]
6 6 service Summons Returned Executed Wed 07/31 11:44 AM
SUMMONS Returned Executed MFR Developing LLC served on 7/16/2019, answer due 8/6/2019. (Riley, Robert)
Related: [-]
5 5 service Summons Returned Executed Wed 07/31 11:43 AM
SUMMONS Returned Executed Michelle Henebury served on 7/16/2019, answer due 8/6/2019. (Riley, Robert)
Related: [-]
4 4 service Summons Returned Executed Wed 07/31 11:42 AM
SUMMONS Returned Executed James M. Henebury served on 7/16/2009, answer due 8/6/2009. (Riley, Robert)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, July 09, 2019
3 3 service Summons Issued Tue 07/09 1:14 PM
Summons Issued as to All Defendants. Counsel receiving this notice electronically should download this summons, complete one for each defendant and serve it in accordance with Fed.R.Civ.P. 4 and LR 4.1. Summons will be mailed to plaintiff(s) not receiving notice electronically for completion of service. (Warnock, Douglas)
Related: [-]
2 2 notice Notice of Case Assignment Tue 07/09 1:07 PM
ELECTRONIC NOTICE of Case Assignment. Judge Nathaniel M. Gorton assigned to case. If the trial Judge issues an Order of Reference of any matter in this case to a Magistrate Judge, the matter will be transmitted to Magistrate Judge Jennifer C. Boal. (Finn, Mary)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint Tue 07/09 9:27 AM
COMPLAINT against All Defendants Filing fee: $ 400, receipt number 0101-7769533 (Fee Status: Filing Fee paid), filed by Allied World Insurance Company.(Riley, Robert)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A,
Att: 2 Exhibit B,
Att: 3 Civil Cover Sheet,
Att: 4 Category Sheet