Texas Northern District Court
Case #: 3:12-cr-00317
Case Filed:Oct 03, 2012
Terminated:Jan 28, 2015
Last checked: Thursday Jan 22, 2015 1:35 PM CST
Defendant
Barrett Lancaster Brown (1)
Represented By
Ahmed Ghappour
Civil Rights Clinic
contact info
Federal Public Defender
Federal Public Defender - Dallas
contact info
Marlo P Cadeddu
Law Office Of Marlo P Cadeddu
contact info
Charles Swift
Swift & Mcdonald PC
contact info
Douglas A Morris-FPD
Federal Public Defender - Dallas
contact info
Movant
Sebastiaan Provost
Represented By
Jason Drake Flores-Williams
Law Firm Of Jason Flores-Williams
contact info
Plaintiff
USA
Represented By
Candina S Heath-DOJ
Us Attorney'S Office
contact info

GPO Apr 29 2014
Report and Recommendation on Guilty Plea as to Barrett Lancaster Brown. re: 114 Consent Regarding Entry of a Plea of Guilty. (Ordered by Magistrate Judge Paul D Stickney on 4/29/2014) (twd)
GPO May 14 2014
Order Accepting 115 Report and Recommendation on Guilty Plea re: 115 Report and Recommendation on Guilty Plea as to Barrett Lancaster Brown. (Ordered by Judge Sam A Lindsay on 5/14/2014) (chmb)
Docket last updated: 10/04/2017 5:04 AM CDT
Wednesday, September 12, 2012
1 1 COMPLAINT as to Barrett Lancaster Brown (1). (mcrd) [3:12-mj-00405-BF *SEALED*]
Related: [-]
3 3 MOTION to seal filed by USA as to Barrett Lancaster Brown (mcrd) [3:12-mj-00405-BF *SEALED*]
Related: [-]
4 4 ORDER granting3 Motion to seal as to Barrett Lancaster Brown (1) (Ordered by Magistrate Judge Paul D Stickney on 9/12/2012) (mcrd) (mcrd). [3:12-mj-00405-BF *SEALED*]
Related: [-]
Thursday, September 13, 2012
Arrest of Barrett Lancaster Brown. (mcrd) [3:12-mj-00405-BF *SEALED*]
Related: [-]
6 6 (Document Restricted) CJA 23 Financial Affidavit by Barrett Lancaster Brown (mcrd)[3:12-mj-00405-BF *SEALED*]
Related: [-]
7 7 MOTION for Pretrial Detention filed by USA as to Barrett Lancaster Brown. (mcrd) [3:12-mj-00405-BF *SEALED*]
Related: [-]
10 10 ORDER APPOINTING FEDERAL PUBLIC DEFENDER as to Barrett Lancaster Brown. (Ordered by Magistrate Judge Paul D Stickney on 9/13/2012) (mcrd) [3:12-mj-00405-BF *SEALED*]
Related: [-]
Monday, September 17, 2012
13 13 ORDER OF DETENTION as to Barrett Lancaster Brown. (see order) (Ordered by Magistrate Judge Paul D Stickney on 9/17/2012) (mcrd) [3:12-mj-00405-BF *SEALED*]
Related: [-]
Tuesday, September 18, 2012
14 14 NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by Douglas A Morris appearing for Barrett Lancaster Brown (mcrd) [3:12-mj-00405-BF *SEALED*]
Related: [-]
15 15 Arrest Warrant Returned Executed on 09/13/12 as to Barrett Lancaster Brown. (mcrd) [3:12-mj-00405-BF *SEALED*]
Related: [-]
16 16 Unopposed MOTION to Determine Competency filed by Barrett Lancaster Brown (mcrd) [3:12-mj-00405-BF *SEALED*]
Related: [-]
Wednesday, September 19, 2012
17 17 ORDER as to Barrett Lancaster Brown: Defendant, BARRETT LANCASTER BROWN, has filed a Request for a Hearing to Determine Competency. Said request, pursuant to 18 U.S.c. §§ 4241 (a) and 4241 (e), and 18 U.S.C. §§ 4247(d) and 4247(h) is this 19th day of September, 2012, GRANTED. A hearing will be scheduled for October 18, 2012, at 2:00p.m. (Ordered by Magistrate Judge Paul D Stickney on 9/19/2012) (mcrd) [3:12-mj-00405-BF *SEALED*]
Related: [-]
Wednesday, September 26, 2012
18 18 ORDER granting16 Motion for Psychiatric Exam as to Barrett Lancaster Brown (1). It is hereby ORDERED that Defendant Barrett Lancaster Brown be remanded to the custody of the United States Attorney General for placement in a suitable facility where he may be evaluated pursuant to §§ 4241(a) and (b) and §§ 4247(b) and (c) for purposes of preparing a report and that such a report be written regarding his mental competency to stand trial. Custody shall not exceed sixty (60) days for evaluation of this matter. (see order) (Ordered by Magistrate Judge Paul D Stickney on 9/26/2012) (mcrd) Modified on 9/26/2012 (mcrd). (dist) [3:12-mj-00405-BF *SEALED*]
Related: [-]
Wednesday, October 03, 2012
19 19 INDICTMENT as to Barrett Lancaster Brown (1) count(s) 1, 2, 3. (twd) (Main Document 19 replaced on 10/5/2012) (skt).
Related: [-]