Mississippi Southern District Court
Judge:Carlton W Reeves
Referred: F Keith Ball
Case #: 3:19-cv-00485
Nature of Suit440 Civil Rights - Other Civil Rights
Cause42:1983 Civil Rights Act
Case Filed:Jul 10, 2019
Terminated:Feb 03, 2021
Last checked: Monday Jan 06, 2020 2:44 AM CST
Defendant
John and Jane Does 1-100
Defendant
Hinds County, Mississippi
Represented By
William Robert Allen
Allen, Allen, Breeland & Allen, PLLC
contact info
Jessica S. Malone
Allen, Allen, Breeland & Allen, PLLC
contact info
Defendant
Sheriff Victor Mason
Represented By
William Robert Allen
Allen, Allen, Breeland & Allen, PLLC
contact info
Jessica S. Malone
Allen, Allen, Breeland & Allen, PLLC
contact info
Plaintiff
Landon James Veal
Represented By
Charles Richard Mullins
Coxwell & Associates, PLLC
contact info


Docket last updated: 44 minutes ago
Wednesday, February 03, 2021
41 41 1 pgs order Order Dismissing Case Wed 02/03 5:08 PM
ORDER DISMISSING CASE with Prejudice Signed by District Judge Carlton W. Reeves on 2/3/21 (MGB)
Related: [-]
Friday, December 18, 2020
minutes Settlement Conference Mon 12/21 9:52 AM
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge F. Keith Ball: Settlement Conference held on 12/18/2020 in Jackson, MS. Appearing: Chuck Mullins, JoAnne Palmer, Landon Veal, Lawson Veal, Will Allen, Jessica Malone, Ray Chambers, Claire Barker, Dorsey Carson, Mike Tupman and Eric Hatten. (JEJ)
Related: [-]
Monday, December 14, 2020
40 40 notice Notice of Appearance Mon 12/14 10:01 AM
NOTICE of Appearance by Dorsey R. Carson, Jr on behalf of Victor Mason (Carson, Dorsey)
Related: [-]
utility Set/Reset Hearings Mon 12/14 4:27 PM
Reset Hearing: Settlement Conference reset for 12/18/2020 09:00 AM before Magistrate Judge F. Keith Ball. (JEJ)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, December 02, 2020
39 39 discov Notice of Service of Designation of Experts Wed 12/02 3:37 PM
NOTICE of Service of Second Supplemental Designation of Experts by Landon James Veal (Mullins, Charles)
Related: [-]
Thursday, November 19, 2020
38 38 discov Notice of Service of Designation of Experts Thu 11/19 3:06 PM
NOTICE of Service of Supplemental Designation of Experts by Landon James Veal (Mullins, Charles)
Related: [-]
minutes Status Conference Thu 11/19 2:03 PM
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge F. Keith Ball: Telephonic Status Conference held on 11/19/2020 in Jackson, MS. (JEJ)
Related: [-]
order Order Thu 11/19 2:06 PM
TEXT-ONLY ORDER. This case came before the undersigned for a telephonic status conference on 11/19/2020. Appearing: Chuck Mullins, Will Allen, Claire Barker, Dorsey Carson, and Ray Chambers. Having conferred with counsel, the undersigned finds that all unexpired deadlines in this case should be stayed, while the parties engage in settlement negotiations. Accordingly, all unexpired deadlines are hereby stayed and, if necessary, will be reset by further order, and this case is hereby set for a settlement conference before the undersigned on 12/14/2020 at 9:00 a.m. No further written order shall issue from the Court. Signed by Magistrate Judge F. Keith Ball on 11/19/2020. (JEJ)
Related: [-]
utility Set/Reset Hearings Thu 11/19 2:08 PM
RESET Hearing: Settlement Conference reset for 12/14/2020 09:00 AM before Magistrate Judge F. Keith Ball. Seven (7) days before the settlement conference, the parties must submit via e-mail to ball_chambers@mssd.uscourts.gov an updated CONFIDENTIAL SETTLEMENT MEMORANDUM. All parties are required to be present at the conference unless excused by the Court. (JEJ)
Related: [-]
Friday, November 13, 2020
37 37 discov Notice of Service of Response to Request for Production Fri 11/13 3:06 PM
NOTICE of Service of Response to Request for Production by Hinds County, Mississippi (Allen, William)
Related: [-]
36 36 discov Notice of Service of Response to Interrogatories Fri 11/13 3:06 PM
NOTICE of Service of Response to Interrogatories by Hinds County, Mississippi (Allen, William)
Related: [-]
utility Set/Reset Hearings Fri 11/13 3:49 PM
Set Hearing: Telephonic Status Conference set for 11/19/2020 01:30 PM before Magistrate Judge F. Keith Ball. The parties will be provided a call-in number by the Court. (JEJ)
Related: [-]
Monday, November 09, 2020
35 35 notice Notice of Appearance Mon 11/09 10:41 AM
NOTICE of Appearance by Rayford G. Chambers on behalf of Hinds County, Mississippi (Chambers, Rayford)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, October 20, 2020
order Order on Motion to Extend Deadline Tue 10/20 8:49 AM
TEXT-ONLY ORDER granting in part and denying in part34 Joint Motion to Extend Deadlines. Discovery due by 12/4/2020; Motions due by 12/18/2020. NO FURTHER WRITTEN ORDER SHALL ISSUE. Signed by Magistrate Judge F. Keith Ball on 10/20/2020. (dcw)
Related: [-]
Monday, October 19, 2020
34 34 motion Extend Deadline Mon 10/19 3:03 PM
Joint MOTION to Extend Discovery Deadline by Hinds County, Mississippi, Victor Mason (Malone, Jessica)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, October 13, 2020
misc Docket Annotation Tue 10/13 10:12 AM
DOCKET ANNOTATION as to #32 : Modified docket text to reflect deponent's name as Mississippi Association of Supervisors Insurance Trust. (cwl)
Related: [-]
Monday, October 12, 2020
33 33 service Subpoena Returned Mon 10/12 9:37 AM
Subpoena Returned Executed as to Hinds County, Mississippi. (Mullins, Charles)
Related: [-]
Friday, October 09, 2020
32 32 notice Notice of Intent to Serve Subpoena Fri 10/09 11:14 AM
NOTICE OF INTENT TO SERVE SUBPOENA by Landon James Veal(Mullins, Charles)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A- Subpoena
Wednesday, October 07, 2020
31 31 discov Notice of Service of Request for Production Wed 10/07 3:38 PM
NOTICE of Service of Plaintiff's Third Request for Production by Landon James Veal (Mullins, Charles)
Related: [-]
30 30 discov Notice of Service of Interrogatories Wed 10/07 3:37 PM
NOTICE of Service of Plaintiff's Second Set of Interrogatories by Landon James Veal (Mullins, Charles)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, September 29, 2020
29 29 discov Notice of Service of Designation of Experts Tue 09/29 4:56 PM
NOTICE of Service of Designation of Experts by Hinds County, Mississippi, Victor Mason (Malone, Jessica)
Related: [-]
Thursday, September 24, 2020
28 28 discov Notice to Take Deposition Thu 09/24 2:46 PM
NOTICE to Take Deposition of Kinyeltha McBride by Landon James Veal (Mullins, Charles)
Related: [-]
27 27 discov Notice to Take Deposition Thu 09/24 2:45 PM
NOTICE to Take Deposition of Dick Brooks by Landon James Veal (Mullins, Charles)
Related: [-]
Friday, September 18, 2020
26 26 discov Notice of Service of Response to Request for Production Fri 09/18 1:53 PM
NOTICE of Service of Response to Request for Production by Hinds County, Mississippi (Malone, Jessica)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, September 16, 2020
order Order on Motion to Extend Deadline Wed 09/16 7:44 AM
TEXT-ONLY ORDER granting25 Unopposed Motion to Extend Defendants' Expert Designation Deadline. Designate Experts for Defendant Deadline due by 9/29/2020. NO FURTHER WRITTEN ORDER SHALL ISSUE. Signed by Magistrate Judge F. Keith Ball on 9/16/2020. (dcw)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, September 15, 2020
25 25 motion Extend Deadline Tue 09/15 4:20 PM
Second MOTION to Extend Designation of Expert Witness Deadline by Hinds County, Mississippi, Victor Mason (Malone, Jessica)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, September 09, 2020
order Order on Motion to Extend Deadline Wed 09/09 8:48 AM
TEXT-ONLY ORDER granting unopposed24 Motion to Extend Defendants' Expert Designation Deadline. Designate Experts for Defendant Deadline due by 9/15/2020. NO FURTHER WRITTEN ORDER SHALL ISSUE. Signed by Magistrate Judge F. Keith Ball on 9/9/2020. (dcw)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, September 08, 2020
24 24 motion Extend Deadline Tue 09/08 5:01 PM
MOTION to Extend Defendants' Expert Designation Deadline by Hinds County, Mississippi, Victor Mason (Malone, Jessica)
Related: [-]
Friday, August 28, 2020
23 23 discov Notice to Take Deposition Fri 08/28 10:57 AM
NOTICE to Take Deposition of Terry Miler by Landon James Veal (Mullins, Charles)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, August 25, 2020
22 22 discov Notice to Take Deposition Tue 08/25 10:56 AM
NOTICE to Take Deposition of Mary Rushing by Landon James Veal (Mullins, Charles)
Related: [-]
21 21 discov Notice to Take Deposition Tue 08/25 10:53 AM
NOTICE to Take Deposition of Victor Mason by Landon James Veal (Mullins, Charles)
Related: [-]
Monday, August 17, 2020
utility Set/Reset Hearings Mon 08/17 10:58 AM
RESET Hearing: Settlement Conference reset for 11/20/2020 09:00 AM in Chambers 5.150 (Jackson) Ball before Magistrate Judge F. Keith Ball. Seven (7) days before the settlement conference, the parties must submit via e-mail to ball_chambers@mssd.uscourts.gov an updated CONFIDENTIAL SETTLEMENT MEMORANDUM. All parties are required to be present at the conference unless excused by the Court. If a party believes the scheduled settlement conference would not be productive and should be cancelled, the party is directed to inform the Court via e-mail of the grounds for their belief at least seven (7) days prior to the conference. (JEJ)
Related: [-]
Friday, August 14, 2020
20 20 discov Notice of Service of Designation of Experts Fri 08/14 3:36 PM
NOTICE of Service of Plaintiff's Designation of Experts by Landon James Veal (Mullins, Charles)
Related: [-]
Monday, August 10, 2020
19 19 discov Notice of Service of Response to Interrogatories Mon 08/10 4:12 PM
NOTICE of Service of Response to Interrogatories by Hinds County, Mississippi (Malone, Jessica)
Related: [-]
18 18 discov Notice of Service of Request for Production Mon 08/10 3:39 PM
NOTICE of Service of Plaintiff's Second Request for Production by Landon James Veal (Mullins, Charles)
Related: [-]
Friday, July 10, 2020
17 17 discov Notice of Service of Interrogatories Fri 07/10 2:09 PM
NOTICE of Service of Plaintiff's First Set of Interrogatories by Landon James Veal (Mullins, Charles)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, June 03, 2020
order Order on Motion to Continue Wed 06/03 8:59 AM
TEXT-ONLY ORDER granting16 Joint Motion to Continue Deadlines. Jury Trial set for a two-week term of Court commencing 4/19/2021 at 09:00 AM in Courtroom 5B (Jackson) before District Judge Carlton W. Reeves; Pretrial Conference set for 3/5/2021, time to be determined, in Chambers 5.550 (Jackson) before District Judge Carlton W. Reeves; Discovery due by 11/5/2020; Experts Plaintiff Deadline due by 8/7/2020; Designate Experts for Defendant Deadline due by 9/8/2020; Motions due by 11/19/2020; ADR Report due 2/26/2021; Settlement Conference remains set for 8/20/2020, however, the parties may contact the chambers of Magistrate Judge F. Keith Ball to discuss potential options for rescheduling the settlement conference. NO FURTHER WRITTEN ORDER SHALL ISSUE. Signed by Magistrate Judge F. Keith Ball on 6/3/2020. (dcw)
Related: [-]
utility Set/Reset Scheduling Order Deadlines/Hearings Wed 06/03 9:02 AM
Set/Reset Scheduling Order Deadlines/Hearings: Jury Trial set for a two-week term commencing 4/19/2021 at 09:00 AM in Courtroom 5B (Jackson) before District Judge Carlton W. Reeves; Pretrial Conference set for 3/5/2021, time to be determined, in Chambers 5.550 (Jackson) before District Judge Carlton W. Reeves; Discovery due by 11/5/2020; Designate Experts Plaintiff Deadline due by 8/7/2020; Designate Experts for Defendant Deadline due by 9/8/2020; Motions due by 11/19/2020; ADR Report due by 2/26/2021. (dcw)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, June 02, 2020
16 16 motion Continue Tue 06/02 9:54 AM
Joint MOTION to Continue Trial Setting by Hinds County, Mississippi, Victor Mason (Malone, Jessica)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, April 08, 2020
15 15 discov Notice of Service of Response to Request for Production Wed 04/08 11:00 AM
NOTICE of Service of Response to Request for Production by Victor Mason (Malone, Jessica)
Related: [-]
14 14 discov Notice of Service of Response to Request for Production Wed 04/08 10:59 AM
NOTICE of Service of Response to Request for Production by Hinds County, Mississippi (Malone, Jessica)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, February 12, 2020
13 13 discov Notice of Service of Disclosure Wed 02/12 4:08 PM
NOTICE of Service of Plaintiff's Second Supplemental Pre-Discovery Disclosure by Landon James Veal (Mullins, Charles)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, January 29, 2020
12 12 discov Notice of Service of Disclosure Wed 01/29 12:54 PM
NOTICE of Service of Plaintiff's First Supplemental Pre-Discovery Disclosure by Landon James Veal (Mullins, Charles)
Related: [-]
Thursday, December 05, 2019
11 11 order Case Management Order Thu 12/05 4:39 PM
CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER. Disclosure due by 12/5/2019. Jury Trial set for a two-week term of court commencing 2/16/2021 09:00 AM in Courtroom 5B (Jackson) Reeves before District Judge Carlton W. Reeves; Pretrial Conference set for 1/8/2021, time to be determined, in Chambers 5.550 (Jackson) Reeves before District Judge Carlton W. Reeves; Discovery due by 9/2/2020; Motions for Amended Pleadings due by 12/23/2019; Motions for Joinder of Parties due by 12/23/2019; Designate Experts Plaintiff Deadline due by 6/2/2020; Designate Experts for Defendant Deadline due by 7/2/2020; Motions due by 9/16/2020; Settlement Conference set for 8/20/2020 09:00 AM in Chambers 5.150 (Jackson) Ball before Magistrate Judge F. Keith Ball. Seven (7) days before the settlement conference, the parties must submit via e-mail to ball_chambers@mssd.uscourts.gov an updated CONFIDENTIAL SETTLEMENT MEMORANDUM. All parties, including a person with full settlement authority, are required to be present at the conference unless excused by the Court. If a party believes the scheduled settlement conference would not be productive and should be cancelled, the party is directed to inform the Court via e-mail of the grounds for their belief at least seven (7) days prior to the conference. ADR Report due by 1/4/2021. Signed by Magistrate Judge F. Keith Ball on 12/5/2019 (KNS)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, December 03, 2019
10 10 discov Notice of Service of Request for Production Tue 12/03 10:21 AM
NOTICE of Service of Plaintiff's Request for Production by Landon James Veal (Mullins, Charles)
Related: [-]
9 9 discov Notice of Service of Disclosure Tue 12/03 10:19 AM
NOTICE of Service of Plaintiff's Pre-Discovery Disclosure by Landon James Veal (Mullins, Charles)
Related: [-]
Thursday, November 21, 2019
minutes Telephonic Case Management Conference Thu 12/05 4:29 PM
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge F. Keith Ball in Jackson, MS: Telephonic Case Management Conference held on 11/21/2019. Appearances: Charles Mullins and Jessica Malone. (KNS)
Related: [-]
Monday, November 18, 2019
8 8 discov Notice of Service of Disclosure Mon 11/18 4:44 PM
NOTICE of Service of Initial Disclosure by Hinds County, Mississippi, Victor Mason (Malone, Jessica)
Related: [-]
7 7 notice Notice of Appearance Mon 11/18 4:39 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Jessica S. Malone on behalf of Hinds County, Mississippi, Victor Mason (Malone, Jessica)
Related: [-]
Friday, November 01, 2019
6 6 notice Rule 16(a) Initial Order Fri 11/01 2:30 PM
Rule 16(a) Initial Order Telephonic Case Management Conference set for 11/1/2019 09:30 AM before Magistrate Judge F. Keith Ball. No later than seven (7) days prior to the TCMC, a confidential memorandum AND a proposed Case Management Order shall be submitted via e mail to ball_chambers@mssd.uscourts.gov. Counsel for Plaintiff shall set up the conference and, once all the parties are on the line, contact the Court at 601-608-4460. (JEJ)
Related: [-]
utility Set/Reset Hearings Fri 11/01 2:31 PM
RESET Hearing: Telephonic Case Management Conference reset for 11/21/2019 09:30 AM before Magistrate Judge F. Keith Ball. No later than seven (7) days prior to the TCMC, a confidential memorandum AND a proposed Case Management Order shall be submitted via e mail to ball_chambers@mssd.uscourts.gov. Counsel for Plaintiff shall set up the conference and, once all the parties are on the line, contact the Court at 601-608-4460. (JEJ)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, September 10, 2019
5 5 answer Answer to Complaint Tue 09/10 5:00 PM
ANSWER to1 Complaint,, by Hinds County, Mississippi, Victor Mason.(Allen, William)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, July 17, 2019
4 4 service Waiver of Service Executed Wed 07/17 10:12 AM
WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Landon James Veal. Victor Mason waiver sent on 7/12/2019, answer due 9/10/2019. (Mullins, Charles)
Related: [-]
3 3 service Waiver of Service Executed Wed 07/17 10:10 AM
WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Landon James Veal. Hinds County, Mississippi waiver sent on 7/12/2019, answer due 9/10/2019. (Mullins, Charles)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, July 10, 2019
2 2 service Summons Issued Wed 07/10 3:59 PM
Summons Issued as to Hinds County, Mississippi, Victor Mason. (LAT)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint Wed 07/10 3:53 PM
COMPLAINT with JURY DEMAND against John and Jane Does 1-100, Hinds County, Mississippi, Victor Mason ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0538-4032468), filed by Landon James Veal.(LAT)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A- Guardianship Doc,
Att: 2 Exhibit B- 10-14-15 Grand Jury,
Att: 3 Exhibit C- 5-21-15 Report,
Att: 4 Exhibit D- Settlement Agreement,
Att: 5 Exhibit E- 11-15-18 Monitor Report,
Att: 6 Exhibit F- 3-5-19 Monitor Report,
Att: 7 Exhibit G- 6-27-19 Monitor Report,
Att: 8 Exhibit H- DOJ Motion,
Att: 9 Civil Cover Sheet