Board of Commissioners of Leavenworth County, Kansas v. AmerisourceBergen Drug Corporation et al
Consolidated
Lead case: 1:17-md-02804
Lead case: 1:17-md-02804
Ohio Northern District Court | |
Judge: | Dan Aaron Polster |
Case #: | 1:19-op-45602 |
Nature of Suit | 470 Other Statutes - Racketeer Influenced and Corrupt Organizations |
Cause | 18:1961 Racketeering (RICO) Act |
Case Filed: | Jul 11, 2019 |
Case in other court: | Kansas, 2:19-cv-02316 |
Last checked: Friday Nov 08, 2019 8:03 PM EST |
Defendant
Watson Pharmaceuticals, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Ortho-Mcneil-Janssen Pharmaceuticals Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Purdue Frederick Company, Inc., The
|
|
Defendant
Purdue Pharma Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Purdue Pharma L.P.
|
|
Defendant
Teva Pharmaceutical Industries Ltd.
|
|
Defendant
Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Walgreens Boots Alliance Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Walmart Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Watson Laboratories Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Noramco Inc
|
|
Defendant
McQueary Brothers Drug Company, LLC
|
|
Defendant
Morris & Dickson Co., LLC.
|
|
Defendant
Mylan Pharmaceuticals, Inc.
781 Chestnut Ridge Road
Morgantown, WV 26505 |
|
Defendant
Par Pharmaceutical Companies, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Par Pharmaceutical, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Sandoz Inc.
|
|
Defendant
SpecGX LLC
|
|
Defendant
West-Ward Pharmaceuticals Corporation
|
|
Defendant
Endo Pharmaceuticals Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Actavis LLC
|
|
Defendant
Actavis Pharma, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Allergan PLC
|
|
Defendant
AmerisourceBergen Drug Corporation
|
|
Defendant
CVS Health Corporation
|
|
Defendant
Cardinal Health Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Cephalon Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Endo Health Solutions Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Insys Therapeutics Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Janssen Pharmaceutica Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Janssen Pharmaceuticals Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Johnson & Johnson
|
|
Defendant
Kroger Co., The
|
|
Defendant
Mallinckrodt LLC
|
|
Defendant
Mallinckrodt PLC
|
|
Defendant
McKesson Corporation
|
|
Plaintiff
Board of Commissioners of Leavenworth County, Kansas
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 11/08/2019 3:16 PM EST |
Friday, June 14, 2019 | ||
NOTICE OF JUDGE ASSIGNMENT: Case assigned to District Judge Carlos Murguia and Magistrate Judge Teresa J. James for all proceedings. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (ca) [Transferred from ksd on 7/11/2019.] | ||
NOTICE OF DEFICIENCY - Designation of place of trial is missing. The filing party/attorney is directed to correct the deficiency immediately.(This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (ca) [Transferred from ksd on 7/11/2019.] | ||
1 | 1 COMPLAINT with trial location of Kansas City ( Filing fee $400, Internet Payment Receipt Number AKSDC-4838125.), filed by Board of Commissioners of Leavenworth County, Kansas.(Speer, Charles) [Transferred from ksd on 7/11/2019.] | |
2 | 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET by Plaintiff Board of Commissioners of Leavenworth County, Kansas. (Speer, Charles) [Transferred from ksd on 7/11/2019.] | |
3 | 3 DESIGNATION OF PLACE OF TRIAL filed by Plaintiff Board of Commissioners of Leavenworth County, Kansas - trial to be held in Kansas City. (Speer, Charles) [Transferred from ksd on 7/11/2019.] | |
Wednesday, July 03, 2019 | ||
4 | 4 CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER (CTO-99) - Case transferred to Northern District of Ohio. Signed by MDL Panel clerk John W. Nichols on 7/3/19. (kao) [Transferred from ksd on 7/11/2019.] | |
Thursday, July 11, 2019 | ||
5 | 5 CASE TRANSFERRED IN from District of Kansas. Case number 2:19-cv-02316. Original file, certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received. |