Union County, Florida v. Purdue Pharma L.P., et al
Consolidated
Lead case: 1:17-md-02804
Lead case: 1:17-md-02804
Ohio Northern District Court | |
Judge: | Dan Aaron Polster |
Case #: | 1:19-op-45603 |
Nature of Suit | 470 Other Statutes - Racketeer Influenced and Corrupt Organizations |
Cause | 18:1961 Racketeering (RICO) Act |
Case Filed: | Jul 11, 2019 |
Case in other court: | Florida Middle, 3:19-cv-00716 |
Last checked: Friday Nov 08, 2019 8:04 PM EST |
Defendant
Mallinckrodt PLC
|
|
Defendant
Watson Laboratories Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Walmart Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Walgreens Boots Alliance Inc.
|
|
Defendant
The Purdue Frederick Company Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Teva Pharmaceutical Industries Ltd.
|
|
Defendant
SpecGX LLC
|
|
Defendant
Purdue Pharma L.P.
|
|
Defendant
Purdue Pharma Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Par Pharmaceutical, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Par Pharmaceutical Companies, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Ortho-McNeil-Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Noramco Inc
|
|
Defendant
McKesson Corporation
|
|
Defendant
Cephalon Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Actavis LLC
|
|
Defendant
Actavis Pharma, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Allergan Finance LLC
|
|
Defendant
Allergan PLC
|
|
Defendant
AmerisourceBergen Corporation
|
|
Defendant
CVS Health Corp.
|
|
Defendant
Cardinal Health Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Mallinckrodt LLC
|
|
Defendant
Endo Health Solutions Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Endo Pharmaceuticals Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Insys Therapeutics Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Janssen Pharmaceutica Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Janssen Pharmaceuticals Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Johnson & Johnson
|
|
Plaintiff
Union County, Florida
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 11/04/2019 4:43 PM EST |
Friday, June 14, 2019 | ||
1 | 1 294 pgs COMPLAINT against All Plaintiffs with Jury Demand (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 113A-15579412) filed by All Plaintiffs.(Romano, Eric) [Transferred from flmd on 7/11/2019.] | |
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet | ||
2 | 2 NEW CASE ASSIGNED to Judge Timothy J. Corrigan and Magistrate Judge Monte C. Richardson. New case number: 3:19-cv-716-J-32MCR. (SJB) [Transferred from flmd on 7/11/2019.] | |
Thursday, July 11, 2019 | ||
3 | 3 CASE TRANSFERRED IN from District of Florida Middle. Case number 3:19-cv-00716. Original file, certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received. |