Dixie County Florida v. Purdue Pharma LP et al
Consolidated
Lead case: 1:17-md-02804
Lead case: 1:17-md-02804
Ohio Northern District Court | |
Judge: | Dan Aaron Polster |
Case #: | 1:19-op-45604 |
Nature of Suit | 470 Other Statutes - Racketeer Influenced and Corrupt Organizations |
Cause | 18:1961 Racketeering (RICO) Act |
Case Filed: | Jul 11, 2019 |
Case in other court: | Florida Northern, 1:19-cv-00107 |
Last checked: Friday Nov 08, 2019 8:04 PM EST |
Defendant
SpecGX LLC
|
|
Defendant
Mallinckrodt PLC
|
|
Defendant
McKesson Corporation
|
|
Defendant
Noramco Inc
|
|
Defendant
Ortho-McNeil-Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc. n/k/a Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Par Pharmaceutical Companies Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Par Pharmaceutical Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Purdue Pharma Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Purdue Pharma L.P.
|
|
Defendant
Mallinckrodt LLC
|
|
Defendant
Teva Pharmaceutical Industries Ltd.
|
|
Defendant
Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
The Purdue Frederick Company Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Walgreens Boots Alliance Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Walmart Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Watson Laboratories Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Endo Pharmaceuticals Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Johnson & Johnson
|
|
Defendant
Janssen Pharmaceuticals Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Janssen Pharmaceutica Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Insys Therapeutics Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Endo Pharmaceuticals Holdings, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Endo Health Solutions Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Cephalon Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Cardinal Health Inc.
|
|
Defendant
CVS Health Corp.
|
|
Defendant
AmerisourceBergen Corporation
|
|
Defendant
Allergan PLC f/k/a Actavis PLC
|
|
Defendant
Allergan Finance LLC f/k/a Actavis Inc, f/k/a Watson Pharmaceuticals, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Actavis Pharma, Inc f/k/a Watson Pharma, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Actavis LLC
|
|
Plaintiff
Dixie County Florida
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 11/04/2019 4:43 PM EST |
Friday, June 14, 2019 | ||
1 | 1 294 pgs COMPLAINT against All Plaintiffs ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number AFLNDC-4521538.), filed by Dixie County, Florida. (ROMANO, JOHN) [Transferred from flnd on 7/11/2019.] | |
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet | ||
Monday, June 17, 2019 | ||
2 | 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET. (kdm) [Transferred from flnd on 7/11/2019.] | |
Wednesday, June 26, 2019 | ||
3 | 3 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to JUDGE ALLEN C WINSOR for all further proceedings. CHIEF JUDGE MARK E WALKER no longer assigned to case. Signed by CHIEF JUDGE MARK E WALKER on 6/26/2019. (erl) **Please use the new judge's initials for all future filings: 1:19cv107 AW/GRJ. [Transferred from flnd on 7/11/2019.] | |
Wednesday, July 03, 2019 | ||
4 | 4 CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER (CTO 99) -MDL No. 2804 re1 Complaint as to DIXIE COUNTY FLORIDA. (Certified copy attached, will transfer case to Northern District of Ohio.) (kdm) [Transferred from flnd on 7/11/2019.] | |
5 | 5 Interdistrict Transfer to the Northern District of Ohio, Cleveland Division, located at Carl B. Stokes U.S. Court House, 801 West Superior Avenue Cleveland, Ohio 44113. (kdm) [Transferred from flnd on 7/11/2019.] | |
Thursday, July 11, 2019 | ||
6 | 6 CASE TRANSFERRED IN from District of Florida Northern. Case number 1:19-cv-00107. Original file, certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received. |