City of Cambridge, Maryland v. Purdue Pharma L.P. et al
Consolidated
Lead case: 1:17-md-02804
Lead case: 1:17-md-02804
Ohio Northern District Court | |
Judge: | Dan Aaron Polster |
Case #: | 1:19-op-45611 |
Nature of Suit | 470 Other Statutes - Racketeer Influenced and Corrupt Organizations |
Cause | 18:1964 Racketeering (RICO) Act |
Case Filed: | Jul 11, 2019 |
Case in other court: | Maryland, 8:19-cv-01737 |
Last checked: Friday Nov 08, 2019 8:05 PM EST |
Defendant
Rite Aid Corporation
|
|
Defendant
Kroger Company
|
|
Defendant
Mallinckrodt Brand Pharmaceuticals, Inc
|
|
Defendant
Mallinckrodt LLC
|
|
Defendant
Mallinckrodt PLC
|
|
Defendant
McKesson Corporation
|
|
Defendant
Ortho-Mcneil-Janssen Pharmaceuticals Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Purdue Pharma Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Purdue Pharma L.P.
|
|
Defendant
Johnson & Johnson
|
|
Defendant
Rite Aid of Maryland
|
|
Defendant
SpecGX LLC
|
|
Defendant
Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
The Purdue Frederick Company
|
|
Defendant
Walgreens Boots Alliance Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Walmart Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Watson Laboratories Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Janssen Pharmaceuticals Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Janssen Pharmaceutica Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Endo Pharmaceuticals Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Endo Health Solutions Inc.
|
|
Defendant
DOES 1 - 100, Inclusive
|
|
Defendant
Cephalon Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Cardinal Health Inc.
|
|
Defendant
CVS Health
|
|
Defendant
AmerisourceBergen Drug Corporation
|
|
Defendant
Allergan PLC
|
|
Defendant
Allergan Finance LLC
|
|
Defendant
Actavis Pharma, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Actavis LLC
|
|
Plaintiff
City of Cambridge, Maryland
|
Represented By
|
TERMINATED PARTIES | |
Defendant
Insys Therapeutics, Inc.
Terminated: 06/20/2019
|
Docket last updated: 11/08/2019 3:13 PM EST |
Thursday, June 13, 2019 | ||
1 | 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0416-8070780.), filed by City of Cambridge, Maryland.(Novak, Jonathan) [Transferred from mdd on 7/11/2019.] | |
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet | ||
Friday, June 14, 2019 | ||
2 | 2 QC NOTICE:1 Complaint filed by City of Cambridge, Maryland was filed incorrectly. **The following attachment is missing - Summons. To correct this problem, file Summons using the event Notice (Other) and link Summons to 1 . (km4s, Deputy Clerk) [Transferred from mdd on 7/11/2019.] | |
Saturday, June 15, 2019 | ||
3 | 3 NOTICE by City of Cambridge, Maryland re1 Complaint & SUMMONS (cured)(Novak, Jonathan) [Transferred from mdd on 7/11/2019.] | |
Att: 1 Summons | ||
4 | 4 NOTICE by City of Cambridge, Maryland re1 Complaint & SUMMONS (cured)(Novak, Jonathan) [Transferred from mdd on 7/11/2019.] | |
Att: 1 Summons | ||
Monday, June 17, 2019 | ||
Case re to Judge Deborah K. Chasanow. Judge Paula Xinis no longer assigned to the case. (jf3s, Deputy Clerk) [Transferred from mdd on 7/11/2019.] | ||
Tuesday, June 18, 2019 | ||
5 | 5 QC NOTICE:3 Notice and4 Notice filed by City of Cambridge, Maryland was filed incorrectly. ** Pursuant to Local Rule 103.2(a) In Cases subject to electronic filing, counsel shall submit to the Clerk the following number of copies when process is to be served; (a) One(1) copy of any summons for EACH party to be served. (km4s, Deputy Clerk) [Transferred from mdd on 7/11/2019.] | |
6 | 6 AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by City of Cambridge, Maryland.(Novak, Jonathan) [Transferred from mdd on 7/11/2019.] | |
Att: 1 Summons | ||
Wednesday, June 19, 2019 | ||
7 | 7 QC NOTICE:6 Amended Complaint filed by City of Cambridge, Maryland needs to be corrected. The following corrective actions are needed regarding missing or incomplete information: **Redline copy has not been filed. Please file the redline version using Notice (Other) and link to 6 Amended Complaint (km4s, Deputy Clerk) [Transferred from mdd on 7/11/2019.] | |
8 | 8 NOTICE by City of Cambridge, Maryland re6 Amended Complaint Redline version (Novak, Jonathan) [Transferred from mdd on 7/11/2019.] | |
9 | 9 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice for MATTHEW R MCCARLEY (Filing fee $100, receipt number 0416-8081119.) by City of Cambridge, Maryland(Novak, Jonathan) [Transferred from mdd on 7/11/2019.] | |
Thursday, June 20, 2019 | ||
10 | 10 Summons Issued 21 days as to Actavis LLC, Actavis Pharma, Inc., Allergan Finance, LLC, Allergan PLC, Amerisourcebergen Drug Corporation, CVS Health, Cardinal Health, Inc., Cephalon, Inc., Does 1 - 100 inclusive, Endo Health Solutions Inc., Endo Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Janssen Pharmaceutica, Inc., Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Johnson & Johnson, Kroger Company, Mallinckrodt Brand Pharmaceuticals, Mallinckrodt LLC, Mallinckrodt PLC, McKesson Corporation, Ortho-McNeil-Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Purdue Pharma Inc., Purdue Pharma L.P., Rite Aid Corporation, Rite Aid of Maryland, Inc., SpecGx LLC, Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc., The Purdue Frederick Company, Walgreens Boots Alliance, Inc., Walmart Inc., and Watson Laboratories, Inc. (km4s, Deputy Clerk) [Transferred from mdd on 7/11/2019.] | |
Wednesday, June 26, 2019 | ||
11 | 11 QC NOTICE:9 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice filed by City of Cambridge, Maryland needs to be modified. See attachment for details and corrective actions needed regarding the signature(s) on the motion. (srd, Deputy Clerk) [Transferred from mdd on 7/11/2019.] | |
12 | 12 CORRECTED MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice for MATTHEW R MCCARLEY by City of Cambridge, Maryland. The fee has already been paid.(Novak, Jonathan) [Transferred from mdd on 7/11/2019.] | |
Att: 1 Attachment hand-written signature | ||
Monday, July 01, 2019 | ||
13 | 13 PAPERLESS ORDER granting12 Corrected Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Matthew R McCarley. Directing attorney Matthew R McCarley to register online for CM/ECF at http://www.mdd.uscourts.gov/electronic-case-filing-registration. Signed by Clerk on 7/1/2019. (srd, Deputy Clerk) [Transferred from mdd on 7/11/2019.] | |
Wednesday, July 03, 2019 | ||
14 | 14 MDL Certified Transfer ORDER. Signed by Clerk of the Panel John W. Nichols on 7/3/2019. (km4s, Deputy Clerk) [Transferred from mdd on 7/11/2019.] | |
Thursday, July 11, 2019 | ||
15 | 15 CASE TRANSFERRED IN from District of Maryland. Case number 8:19-cv-01737. Original file, certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received. |