Alamance County v. AmerisourceBergen Drug Corporation et al
Consolidated
Lead case: 1:17-md-02804
Lead case: 1:17-md-02804
Ohio Northern District Court | |
Judge: | Dan Aaron Polster |
Case #: | 1:19-op-45615 |
Nature of Suit | 470 Other Statutes - Racketeer Influenced and Corrupt Organizations |
Cause | 18:1961 Racketeering (RICO) Act |
Case Filed: | Jul 11, 2019 |
Case in other court: | North Carolina Middle, 1:19-cv-00594 |
Last checked: Friday Nov 08, 2019 8:05 PM EST |
Defendant
Par Pharmaceutical Companies, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Watson Laboratories Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Watson Pharmaceuticals, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Amneal Pharmaceuticals, LLC
|
|
Defendant
CVS Health Corporation
|
|
Defendant
Eckerd Corporation
|
|
Defendant
J.M. Smith Corporation
|
|
Defendant
KVK-Tech, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Mylan Pharmaceuticals, Inc.
781 Chestnut Ridge Road
Morgantown, WV 26505 |
|
Defendant
North Carolina Mutual Wholesale Drug Company
|
|
Defendant
Teva Pharmaceutical Industries Ltd.
|
|
Defendant
Par Pharmaceutical, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Rite Aid Corporation
|
|
Defendant
Rite Aid Dayville Distribution Center
|
|
Defendant
Rite Aid of Maryland, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Sandoz Inc.
|
|
Defendant
SpecGX LLC
|
|
Defendant
Walgreens Boots Alliance, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Walmart, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
West-Ward Pharmaceuticals Corporation
|
|
Defendant
Janssen Pharmaceuticals Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Actavis LLC
|
|
Defendant
Actavis Pharma, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Allergan PLC
|
|
Defendant
AmerisourceBergen Drug Corporation
|
|
Defendant
Cardinal Health Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Cephalon Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Endo Health Solutions Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Endo Pharmaceuticals Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Janssen Pharmaceutica Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Johnson
|
|
Defendant
Mallinckrodt LLC
|
|
Defendant
Mallinckrodt PLC
|
|
Defendant
McKesson Corporation
|
|
Defendant
Noramco Inc
|
|
Defendant
Ortho-Mcneil-Janssen Pharmaceuticals Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Purdue Frederick Company, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Purdue Pharma Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Purdue Pharma L.P.
|
|
Plaintiff
Alamance County
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 09/11/2019 11:02 AM EDT |
Thursday, June 13, 2019 | ||
1 | 1 166 pgs COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0418-2589563.), filed by ALAMANCE COUNTY.(COATES, PAUL) [Transferred from ncmd on 7/11/2019.] | |
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit CIVIL COVERSHEET ADDENDUM | ||
Friday, June 14, 2019 | ||
Case ASSIGNED to CHIEF JUDGE THOMAS D. SCHROEDER and MAG/JUDGE L. PATRICK AULD. (Garland, Leah) [Transferred from ncmd on 7/11/2019.] | ||
Wednesday, July 03, 2019 | ||
3 | 3 CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER (CTO-99) by MDL Panel re: MDL 2804 transferring this action to the Northern District of Ohio for the reasons stated in the order of December 5, 2017. Received and filed on 7/3/2019. (Daniel, J) [Transferred from ncmd on 7/11/2019.] | |
Friday, July 05, 2019 | ||
4 | 4 MDL TRANFER LETTER to individual courts and counsel of record re: Conditional Transfer Order (CTO-99) transferring this action to the Northern District of Ohio. (Daniel, J) [Transferred from ncmd on 7/11/2019.] | |
Thursday, July 11, 2019 | ||
5 | 5 CASE TRANSFERRED IN from District of North Carolina Middle. Case number 1:19-cv-00594. Original file, certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received. |