Texas Western District Court
Judge:Fred Biery
Referred: Henry J Bemporad
Case #: 5:19-cv-00810
Nature of Suit710 Labor - Fair Labor Standards Act
Cause29:201 Fair Labor Standards Act
Case Filed:Jul 11, 2019
Terminated:Nov 01, 2019
Last checked: Tuesday Jan 07, 2020 3:11 AM CST
Defendant
David Brambila
Represented By
Robert A. Rapp
The Rapp Law Firm
contact info
Defendant
Jill Oxford
Represented By
Robert A. Rapp
The Rapp Law Firm
contact info
Defendant
Powerhouse TNT Gymnastics, Inc
Represented By
Robert A. Rapp
The Rapp Law Firm
contact info
Plaintiff
Nicole Conrad
Represented By
Robert Wayne Cowan
Bailey Cowan Heckaman PLLC
contact info
Katie R. McGregor
Bailey Peavy Bailey Cowan Heckaman PLLC
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/04/2025 11:59 PM CDT
Friday, November 01, 2019
19 19 2 pgs order Order ~Util - Terminate Motions Fri 11/01 1:53 PM
ORDER OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE AND JUDGMENT re18 Agreed MOTION to Dismiss With Prejudice filed by Powerhouse TNT Gymnastics, Inc, Nicole Conrad, Jill Oxford, David Brambila,IT IS FURTHER ORDERED, ADJUDGED and DECREED that the parties are denied all relief not expressly granted by this Order of Dismissal With Prejudice and Judgment, whether the relief was requested or whether it could have been requested in this case. IT IS FINALLY ORDERED, ADJUDGED and DECREED that motions pending with the Court, if any, are Dismissed as Moot and this case is CLOSED. Signed by Judge Fred Biery. (wg)
Related: [-]
Thursday, October 31, 2019
18 18 motion Dismiss Thu 10/31 3:01 PM
Agreed MOTION to Dismiss With Prejudice by David Brambila, Jill Oxford, Powerhouse TNT Gymnastics, Inc., and Nicole Conrad.(Rapp, Robert) Modified on 10/31/2019 To edit text (bc)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order Agreed Judgment
utility Notice of Correction Thu 10/31 3:20 PM
Notice of Correction:***NOTIFIED ALL PARTIES THAT THE ENTRY WAS MODIFIED TO ADD THE JOINT FILER*** re18 Agreed MOTION to Dismiss With Prejudice . (bc)
Related: [-]
Friday, October 18, 2019
17 17 1 pgs order Order ~Util - Terminate Motions ~Util - Terminate Hearings Fri 10/18 10:05 AM
ORDER The parties shall submit their stipulation of dismissal and any appropriate supportingdocuments on or before October 31, 2019. re15 Advisory to the Court filed by Powerhouse TNT Gymnastics, Inc, Jill Oxford, David Brambila. Signed by Judge Fred Biery. (rf)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, October 16, 2019
16 16 1 pgs order Order ~Util - Case No Longer Referred to Magistrate Judge ~Util - Terminate Hearings Thu 10/17 12:18 PM
ORDER, CASE NO LONGER REFERRED to Magistrate Judge Henry J. Bemporad. Signed by Judge Henry J. Bemporad. (bc)
Related: [-]
15 15 misc Advisory to the Court Wed 10/16 11:50 AM
ADVISORY TO THE COURT by David Brambila, Jill Oxford, Powerhouse TNT Gymnastics, Inc. (Rapp, Robert)
Related: [-]
Friday, September 20, 2019
14 14 1 pgs order Order ~Util - Set Hearings ~Util - Terminate Motions Mon 09/23 9:49 AM
ORDER, ( Scheduling Conference reset for 10/29/2019 2:00 PM before Judge Henry J. Bemporad). Signed by Judge Henry J. Bemporad. (aej)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, August 27, 2019
13 13 1 pgs order Order ~Util - Set Hearings Tue 08/27 11:19 AM
ORDER, ( Scheduling Conference set for 9/27/2019 2:00 PM before Judge Henry J. Bemporad). Signed by Judge Henry J. Bemporad. (aej)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, August 20, 2019
12 12 2 pgs order Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge Tue 08/20 10:52 AM
ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Henry J. Bemporad for pretrial proceedings including any requests for injunctive relief. Signed by Judge Fred Biery. (rg)
Related: [-]
11 11 1 pgs order Order Tue 08/20 10:50 AM
ORDER Court Advisory Concerning Discovery. Signed by Judge Fred Biery. (rg)
Related: [-]
10 10 7 pgs order Order Tue 08/20 10:50 AM
ORDER FOR SCHEDULING RECOMMENDATIONS AND ADVISORY CONCERNING ASSIGNMENT OF MFAGISTRATE JUDGE - the parties shall submit a proposed scheduling order to theCourt within sixty days of the date of this Order. Signed by Judge Fred Biery. (rg)
Related: [-]
Friday, August 16, 2019
9 9 answer Answer to Complaint Fri 08/16 4:03 PM
Defendants ANSWER to1 Complaint . Attorney Robert A. Rapp added to party David Brambila(pty:dft), Attorney Robert A. Rapp added to party Jill Oxford(pty:dft), Attorney Robert A. Rapp added to party Powerhouse TNT Gymnastics, Inc(pty:dft) by David Brambila, Jill Oxford, Powerhouse TNT Gymnastics, Inc.(Rapp, Robert)
Related: [-]
Thursday, August 01, 2019
8 8 service Summons Returned Executed Thu 08/01 12:00 PM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by Nicole Conrad. Powerhouse TNT Gymnastics, Inc served on 7/20/2019, answer due 8/12/2019. (Cowan, Robert)
Related: [-]
7 7 service Summons Returned Executed Thu 08/01 11:59 AM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by Nicole Conrad. Jill Oxford served on 7/23/2019, answer due 8/13/2019. (Cowan, Robert)
Related: [-]
6 6 service Summons Returned Executed Thu 08/01 11:58 AM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by Nicole Conrad. David Brambila served on 7/20/2019, answer due 8/12/2019. (Cowan, Robert)
Related: [-]
Thursday, July 11, 2019
5 5 service Summons Issued Thu 07/11 4:10 PM
Summons Issued as to Jill Oxford. (aej)
Related: [-]
4 4 service Summons Issued Thu 07/11 4:08 PM
Summons Issued as to David Brambila. (aej)
Related: [-]
3 3 service Summons Issued Thu 07/11 4:07 PM
Summons Issued as to Powerhouse TNT Gymnastics, Inc. (aej)
Related: [-]
2 2 service Request for Issuance of Summons Thu 07/11 3:12 PM
REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS by NICOLE CONRAD. (Cowan, Robert)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint Thu 07/11 3:10 PM
COMPLAINT ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0542-12337220), filed by NICOLE CONRAD.(Cowan, Robert)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A - Notice of Consent,
Att: 2 Civil Cover Sheet
utility Case Assigned/Reassigned Thu 07/11 3:40 PM
Case assigned to Judge Fred Biery. CM WILL NOW REFLECT THE JUDGE INITIALS AS PART OF THE CASE NUMBER. PLEASE APPEND THESE JUDGE INITIALS TO THE CASE NUMBER ON EACH DOCUMENT THAT YOU FILE IN THIS CASE. (aej)
Related: [-]
misc To be Referred to SA Mag Judge Thu 07/11 3:41 PM
If ordered by the court, all referrals will be assigned to Magistrate Judge Bemporad (aej)
Related: [-]