New York Northern District Court
Case #: 5:19-cr-00253
Case Filed:Jul 11, 2019
Last checked: Friday Jul 12, 2019 3:13 AM EDT
Defendant
Mark Winn Sweeney, Jr. (1)
Represented By
Gabrielle DiBella
Office Of The Federal Public Defender - Syracuse Office
contact info
Plaintiff
USA
Represented By
Michael D. Gadarian
Office Of The United States Attorney - Syracuse
contact info


Docket last updated: 07/12/2019 4:53 AM EDT
Thursday, February 28, 2019
1 1 COMPLAINT as to Mark Winn Sweeney, Jr. (1). (sg) [5:19-mj-00107-TWD]
Related: [-]
3 3 Government Application to Seal by USA as to Mark Winn Sweeney, Jr. (sg) [5:19-mj-00107-TWD]
Related: [-]
4 4 ORDER granting3 Government Application to Seal as to Mark Winn Sweeney, Jr. Signed by Magistrate Judge Therese Wiley Dancks on 2/28/2019.(sg) [5:19-mj-00107-TWD]
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Public Sealing Order
Friday, March 01, 2019
Case unsealed as to Mark Winn Sweeney, Jr. (sg) [5:19-mj-00107-TWD]
Related: [-]
TEXT NOTICE OF DETENTION HEARING as to Mark Winn Sweeney, Jr.: Detention Hearing set for 3/6/2019 at 1:00 PM before Magistrate Judge Therese Wiley Dancks. (sg) [5:19-mj-00107-TWD]
Related: [-]
5 5 TEXT Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Therese Wiley Dancks:Initial Appearance as to Mark Winn Sweeney, Jr. held on 3/1/2019. Defendant appears with counsel, copy of the complaint and arrest warrant provided. Defendant is advised of rights, charges and maximum penalties if convicted. Financial Affidavit is submitted. Judge Dancks finds that defendant does qualify for court appointed counsel and assigns the Office of the FPD. Government moves for detention. Detention Hearing set for 3/6/2019 at 1:00PM before Judge Dancks. Preliminary Hearing will be addressed at that time. On Government motion, case is unsealed. Defendant is remanded to the custody of the U.S. Marshals pending the Detention Hearing. APPEARANCES: AUSA Michael Gadarian for Government; AFPD Gabriella DiBella for Defendant; USPO Karlie Hall. (Court Reporter: Hannah Cavanaugh) (sg) [5:19-mj-00107-TWD]
Related: [-]
6 6 TEXT ORDER APPOINTING OFFICE OF THE FEDERAL PUBLIC DEFENDER as to Mark Winn Sweeney, Jr. : The Court finds after reviewing the Financial Affidavit submitted to the Court that Defendant does qualify for appointment of counsel and assigns the Office of the Federal Public Defender to represent the Defendant in this matter. Counsel is directed to file a notice of attorney appearance, if they have not already done so. That written appearance shall certify that the attorney has either completed six credit hours in federal criminal defense continuing education within the past two years or, if not, that the attorney will complete the required continuing education within 30 days of filing the notice of appearance. An attorney who has appeared shall thereafter withdraw only upon notice to the defendant and all parties to the case, and an order of the Court finding that good cause exists and granting leave to withdraw. SO ORDERED by Magistrate Judge Therese Wiley Dancks on 3/1/2019. (sg) [5:19-mj-00107-TWD]
Related: [-]
7 7 Arrest Warrant returned executed on 3/1/2019, in case as to Mark Winn Sweeney, Jr. Signed by DUSM Bob Sweeney. (sg) [5:19-mj-00107-TWD]
Related: [-]
Monday, March 04, 2019
8 8 NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE: Gabrielle DiBella appearing for Mark Winn Sweeney, Jr. (DiBella, Gabrielle) [5:19-mj-00107-TWD]
Related: [-]
Wednesday, March 06, 2019
TEXT Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Therese Wiley Dancks:Detention Hearing as to Mark Winn Sweeney, Jr. held on 3/6/2019. Counsel provided with copy of Pretrial Services Report, no edits or changes by either party. Court acknowledges receipt of letter of support on behalf of Defendant. Government proceeds by proffer in support of its motion for detention. Court accepts additional report as part of the Government's proffer. Court hears from Defendant's counsel in favor of Defendant's release on conditions. After hearing from counsel, Court grants Government motion for Defendant's pretrial detention. A written order will be issued. Court addresses Preliminary Hearing. Defendant waives a Preliminary Hearing. Court accepts Defendant's waiver as knowing and voluntary. Defendant remanded to the custody of the U.S. Marshal. APPEARANCES: AUSA Michael Gadarian for the Government; AFPD Gabrielle DiBella for Defendant; USPO Karlie Hall. (Court Reporter: Eileen McDonough) (sg) [5:19-mj-00107-TWD]
Related: [-]
9 9 DEFT Mark Winn Sweeney, Jr.: CHARACTER LETTER(S) re: Detention Hearing. (DiBella, Gabrielle) Modified on 3/6/2019 (sg, ). [5:19-mj-00107-TWD]
Related: [-]
Friday, March 08, 2019
10 10 PRETRIAL DETENTION ORDER as to Mark Winn Sweeney, Jr. Signed by Magistrate Judge Therese Wiley Dancks on 3/8/2019. (sg) [5:19-mj-00107-TWD]
Related: [-]
Wednesday, March 20, 2019
11 11 STIPULATION by USA to 60 Day Extension of Time (Gadarian, Michael) [5:19-mj-00107-TWD]
Related: [-]
12 12 STIPULATION AND ORDER FOR ENLARGEMENT OF TIME as to Mark Winn Sweeney, Jr.: Time excluded 60 days from 3/20/2019 until 5/19/2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Therese Wiley Dancks on 3/20/2019. (sg) [5:19-mj-00107-TWD]
Related: [-]
Thursday, May 16, 2019
13 13 STIPULATION by USA to 30 Day Extension of Time (Gadarian, Michael) [5:19-mj-00107-TWD]
Related: [-]
14 14 STIPULATION AND ORDER for Enlargement of Time as to Mark Winn Sweeney, Jr. : Time excluded 30 days from 5/16/2019 until 6/15/2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Therese Wiley Dancks on 5/16/2019. (sg) [5:19-mj-00107-TWD]
Related: [-]
Thursday, June 13, 2019
15 15 STIPULATION by USA to 30 Day Extension of Time (Gadarian, Michael) [5:19-mj-00107-TWD]
Related: [-]
Friday, June 14, 2019
16 16 Stipulation and Order for Enlargement of Time as to Mark Winn Sweeney, Jr.: Time excluded 30 days from 6/13/2019 until 7/13/2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Therese Wiley Dancks on 6/13/2019. (sg) [5:19-mj-00107-TWD]
Related: [-]
Wednesday, June 26, 2019
17 17 OFFER OF PROOF filed by the Government as to Mark Winn Sweeney, Jr..(Gadarian, Michael) [5:19-mj-00107-TWD]
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Certificate of Service
Friday, June 28, 2019
TEXT NOTICE OF CHANGE OF PLEA HEARING: Set Hearing as toMark Winn Sweeney, Jr.: Change of Plea Hearing set for Wednesday, July 10, 2019 at 11:30AM in Utica, NY pursuant to request by Counsel and pursuant to verbal Order of Judge David N. Hurd. Appearances required in Court in Utica. Please adjust your calendars accordingly. (ptm) [5:19-mj-00107-TWD]
Related: [-]
Tuesday, July 09, 2019
TEXT RE-NOTICE OF CHANGE OF PLEA HEARING: Set Hearing as toMark Winn Sweeney, Jr.: Change of Plea Hearing is NOW set for THURSDAY, July 11, 2019 at 2:00PM in Utica, NY pursuant to request by Counsel and pursuant to verbal Order of Judge David N. Hurd. Appearances required in Court in Utica. Please adjust your calendars accordingly. (ptm) [5:19-mj-00107-TWD]
Related: [-]
Thursday, July 11, 2019
TEXT Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge David N. Hurd in Utica, NY. Change of Plea Hearing as to held on 7/11/2019. Plea Entered by Mark W. Sweeney (1) Guilty to Count 1. Defendant Mark W. Sweeney appears with Gabrielle DiBella, AFPD. Defendant advised of his rights. Geoffrey J.L. Brown, AUSA (on behalf of Michael D. Gadarian, AUSA) advises Court of charge, wavier of indictment, entry of plea to a one count Information without a plea agreement. Judge Hurd arraigns defendant and advises him of his of constitutional rights. Waiver of Indictment signed by the Defendant and Counsel. Defendant waives reading of Information, pleads guilty to Count 1 of Information 5:19-CR-253 and is sworn in. After extensive interrogation by the Court, Judge Hurd directs the entry of a plea of guilty to Count 1 of Information 5:19-CR-253, orders the Probation Office to complete a Presentence report and sets an sentencing date for Thursday November 7, 2019 in USDC / Utica, NY at 11:30am. Defendant remanded to the custody of the USMS pending sentencing. Appearances: Geoffrey J.L. Brown, AUSA (on behalf of Michael D. Gadarian, AUSA) for Government; Gabrielle DiBella, AFPD for Defendant Mark W. Sweeney. (2:00pm - 2:45pm) (Court Reporter Hannah Cavanaugh) (ptm)
Related: [-]
18 18 WAIVER OF INDICTMENT as to Mark Winn Sweeney, Jr.. (ptm)
Related: [-]
19 19 INFORMATION as to Mark Winn Sweeney, Jr. (1) count(s) 1. Arraignment Held on July 11, 2019 at 1:30PM in Utica, NY before Judge David N. Hurd. (ptm)
Related: [-]
20 20 GUIDELINE ORDER as to Mark Winn Sweeney, Jr. Sentencing set for 11/7/2019 at 11:30 AM in Utica, NY before Judge David N. Hurd. Government and Defendant Sentencing Memo Deadline 10/17/2019. Signed by Judge David N. Hurd on 7/11/2019. (ptm)
Related: [-]