UMB Bank N.A. v. Sun Capital Partners V, L.P. et al
Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 1:17-bk-10124
Lead BK case is: 1:17-bk-10124
Delaware Bankruptcy Court | |
Chapter 11 | |
Judge: | Karen B Owens |
Case #: | 1:19-ap-50272 |
Nature of Suit | 13 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §548 fraudulent transfer |
Case Filed: | Jun 12, 2019 |
Terminated: | Sep 02, 2021 |
Last checked: never |
Defendant
Sun Capital Partners V, L.P.
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Sun Mod Fashions IV, LLC
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Sun Mod Fashions V, LLC
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
H.I.G. Sun Partners, LLC
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
UMB Bank N.A., as Plan Trustee of the Limited Creditors' Liquidating Trust
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 04/26/2024 1:05 PM EDT |
Thursday, September 02, 2021 | ||
court
Close Adversary Case
Thu 09/02 9:18 AM
Adversary Case 1:19-ap-50272 Closed (MD) |
||
Wednesday, September 01, 2021 | ||
112 | 112
misc
Stipulation of Dismissal
Wed 09/01 2:57 PM
Stipulation of Dismissal of Adversary Proceeding with Prejudice Filed by UMB Bank N.A.. (O'Neill, James) |