Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 1:19-bk-11711

California Central Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 7
Judge:Maureen Tighe
Case #: 1:19-ap-01079
Nature of Suit1 null
Case Filed:Jul 12, 2019
Terminated:Apr 06, 2022
Last checked: never
Defendant
P4C Global, Inc.
Represented By
Ronald A DiPietra
contact info
Defendant
OEM Battery Depot, LLC
300 Corporate Pointe, Suite 400 Culver City
Culver City, CA 90230
Represented By
Ronald A DiPietra
contact info
Defendant
Steven Hopwood
300 Corporate Pointe, Suite 400 Culver City
Culver City, CA 90230
Represented By
Ronald A DiPietra
contact info
Plaintiff
Anzhey Vsevolodo Barantsevich
5015 Balboa Blvd Unit 207
Encino, CA 91316
Represented By
Anzhey Vsevolodo Barantsevich
contact info
Plaintiff
Zooom, Inc.
Represented By
Zooom, Inc.
contact info
U.S. Trustee
United States Trustee (SV)
915 Wilshire Blvd, Suite 1850
Los Angeles, CA 90017


Docket last updated: 05/26/2025 1:05 PM PDT
Wednesday, April 06, 2022
33 33 court Close Adversary Case Wed 04/06 11:34 AM
Adversary Case 1:19-ap-1079 Closed. The complaint filed in the above case has been disposed of and is no longer pending due to the dismissal of the complaint or main case, the entry of a judgment or the transfer of the adversary proceeding to another division or district. Since it appears that no further matters are pending that require this adversary proceeding remain open, it is ordered that this adversary proceeding is closed. Related [+] (Fisher, Liliana)
Related: [-] 4 Notice of Hearing (AP Case), 5 Hearing Set (Other) (AP Case),6 Motion for Remand filed by Plaintiff Anzhey Vsevolodo Barantsevich,29 Transcript
Friday, November 05, 2021
32 32 misc Notice of Change of Address (multi) Fri 11/05 2:10 PM
Notice of Change of Address Notice of Attorney Change of Address or Law Firm . (Smith, Lindsey)
Related: [-]
Friday, August 16, 2019
31 31 court BNC Certificate of Notice - PDF Document Fri 08/16 9:28 PM
BNC Certificate of Notice - PDF Document. Related [+] No. of Notices: 4. Notice Date 08/16/2019. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 30 Order on Motion For Remand (BNC-PDF)
Wednesday, August 14, 2019
30 30 order Remand (BNC-PDF) Wed 08/14 4:17 PM
Order Granting Motion For Remand (BNC-PDF) Related [+] Signed on 8/14/2019 (Fisher, Liliana)
Related: [-] 6
29 29 court Transcript Wed 08/14 12:55 PM
Transcript regarding Hearing Held 07/31/19 RE: Notice of removal. Remote electronic access to the transcript is restricted until 11/12/2019. The transcript may be viewed at the Bankruptcy Court Clerk's Office on a public terminal or purchased through the Transcription Service Provider before the transcript access restriction has ended. [TRANSCRIPTION SERVICE PROVIDER: Echo Reporting, Inc., Telephone number (858) 453-7590.]. Notice of Intent to Request Redaction Deadline Due By 8/21/2019. Redaction Request Due By 09/4/2019. Redacted Transcript Submission Due By 09/16/2019. Transcript access will be restricted through 11/12/2019. (Bauer, Tara)
Related: [-]
Monday, August 12, 2019
28 28 misc Transcript Record Transmittal Mon 08/12 4:19 PM
Transcript Record Transmittal (Court transcript records have been uploaded to FDS). For Order Number: 19-MT-17. RE Hearing Date: 07/31/19, [TRANSCRIPTION SERVICE PROVIDER: ECHO Reporting, Telephone number 858-453-7590.] Related [+] (Fisher, Liliana)
Related: [-] 27 Transcript Order Form (Public Request) filed by Defendant P4C Global, Inc.
27 27 misc Transcript Order Form (Public Request) Mon 08/12 12:53 PM
Transcript Order Form, regarding Hearing Date 07/31/19 Filed by Defendant P4C Global, Inc.. (DiPietra, Ronald)
Related: [-]
26 26 court Notice to Filer of Error and/or Deficient Document Mon 08/12 11:17 AM
Notice to Filer of Error and/or Deficient Document Other - Notice to Filer of Error and/or Deficient Document Incorrect PDF was attached to the docket entry. THE FILER IS INSTRUCTED TO RE-FILE THE DOCUMENT WITH THE CORRECT "Flattened" PDF FORMAT IMMEDIATELY. (Instructions are posted under the FORMS > OFFICIAL BK FORMS > forms page> WARNING FOR ELECTRONIC FILERS section of the Court's website.) Related [+] (Fisher, Liliana)
Related: [-] 25 Transcript Order Form (Public Request) filed by Defendant P4C Global, Inc.
Friday, August 09, 2019
25 25 misc Transcript Order Form (Public Request) Fri 08/09 12:23 PM
Transcript Order Form, regarding Hearing Date 07/31/19 Filed by Defendant P4C Global, Inc.. (DiPietra, Ronald)
Related: [-]
Thursday, August 08, 2019
24 24 answer Reply Thu 08/08 12:52 PM
Reply to Related [+] / Response To Objections To Proposed Order Granting Motion For Remand Filed by Plaintiff Anzhey Vsevolodo Barantsevich (Smith, Lindsey)
Related: [-] 23 Objection filed by Defendant P4C Global, Inc.
23 23 answer Objection Thu 08/08 8:02 AM
Objection Related [+] Filed by Defendant P4C Global, Inc. (DiPietra, Ronald)
Related: [-] 22 Notice of Lodgment filed by Plaintiff Anzhey Vsevolodo Barantsevich
Wednesday, July 31, 2019
22 22 misc Notice of Lodgment Wed 07/31 2:18 PM
Notice of lodgment of Order Granting Motion for Remand Filed by Plaintiff Anzhey Vsevolodo Barantsevich Related [+]. (Golubchik, David)
Related: [-] 6 Motion for Remand / Notice Of Motion And Motion For Remand Pursuant To 28 U.S.C. § 1452(B), 28 U.S.C. § 1334(C)(1) & (2); Memorandum Of Points And Authorities; Declarations Of Anzhey Barantsevich And Felix T. Woo Filed by Plaintiff Anzhey Vsevolodo Barantsevich filed by Plaintiff Anzhey Vsevolodo Barantsevich
Tuesday, July 30, 2019
21 21 answer Reply Tue 07/30 1:06 PM
Reply to Related [+] / Alleged Debtor's Response To Opposition To Motion For Remand; Declaration Of Anzhey Barantsevich In Support Thereof Filed by Plaintiff Anzhey Vsevolodo Barantsevich (Golubchik, David)
Related: [-] 19 Opposition filed by Defendant P4C Global, Inc., Defendant OEM Battery Depot, LLC, Defendant Steven Hopwood
Wednesday, July 24, 2019
20 20 answer Opposition Wed 07/24 8:30 AM
Opposition to Related [+] Request for Judicial Notice Filed by Defendants Steven Hopwood, OEM Battery Depot, LLC, P4C Global, Inc. (DiPietra, Ronald)
Related: [-] 13 Hearing (Adv Motion) Set,14 Notice of Hearing filed by Plaintiff Anzhey Vsevolodo Barantsevich
19 19 answer Opposition Wed 07/24 8:29 AM
Opposition to Related [+] Filed by Defendants Steven Hopwood, OEM Battery Depot, LLC, P4C Global, Inc. (DiPietra, Ronald)
Related: [-] 13 Hearing (Adv Motion) Set,14 Notice of Hearing filed by Plaintiff Anzhey Vsevolodo Barantsevich
Att: 1 Affidavit Declaration of Steven Hopwood
Att: 2 Affidavit Declaration of James Fornear
Att: 3 Affidavit Declaration of Anthony DiPietra
Sunday, July 21, 2019
18 18 court BNC Certificate of Notice - PDF Document Sun 07/21 9:25 PM
BNC Certificate of Notice - PDF Document. Related [+] No. of Notices: 4. Notice Date 07/21/2019. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 16 Order (Generic) (BNC-PDF)
Saturday, July 20, 2019
17 17 court BNC Certificate of Notice - PDF Document Sat 07/20 9:30 PM
BNC Certificate of Notice - PDF Document. Related [+] No. of Notices: 4. Notice Date 07/20/2019. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 12 Order on Generic Motion (BNC-PDF)
Friday, July 19, 2019
16 16 order X - Order (Generic)(BNC-PDF) Fri 07/19 3:48 PM
Order Clarifying Location of Hearing on Motion to Remand (BNC-PDF) Related [+] Signed on 7/19/2019 (Fisher, Liliana)
Related: [-] 12
Thursday, July 18, 2019
15 15 misc Proof of service Thu 07/18 4:07 PM
Proof of service of Motion, Order and Notice of Hearing Filed by Plaintiff Anzhey Vsevolodo Barantsevich Related [+]. (Smith, Lindsey)
Related: [-] 6 Motion for Remand / Notice Of Motion And Motion For Remand Pursuant To 28 U.S.C. § 1452(B), 28 U.S.C. § 1334(C)(1) & (2); Memorandum Of Points And Authorities; Declarations Of Anzhey Barantsevich And Felix T. Woo ,12 Order on Generic Motion (BNC-PDF),14 Notice of Hearing
14 14 notice Notice of Hearing Thu 07/18 3:47 PM
Notice of Hearing on Motion for Remand Filed by Plaintiff Anzhey Vsevolodo Barantsevich Related [+]. (Smith, Lindsey)
Related: [-] 6 Motion for Remand / Notice Of Motion And Motion For Remand Pursuant To 28 U.S.C. § 1452(B), 28 U.S.C. § 1334(C)(1) & (2); Memorandum Of Points And Authorities; Declarations Of Anzhey Barantsevich And Felix T. Woo Filed by Plaintiff Anzhey Vsevolodo Barantsevich filed by Plaintiff Anzhey Vsevolodo Barantsevich
13 13 court Hearing Set (Motion) Thu 07/18 3:12 PM
Hearing Set Related [+] The Hearing date is set for 7/31/2019 at 11:00 AM at Crtrm 302, 21041 Burbank Blvd, Woodland Hills, CA 91367. The case judge is Maureen Tighe (Fisher, Liliana)
Related: [-] 6 Motion for Remand filed by Plaintiff Anzhey Vsevolodo Barantsevich
12 12 order X - Order (RE: Generic Motion) (BNC-PDF) Thu 07/18 1:57 PM
Order Granting Application and Setting Hearing on Shortened Notice (BNC-PDF) Related [+] Signed on 7/18/2019 (Fisher, Liliana)
Related: [-] 7
11 11 answer Opposition Thu 07/18 8:22 AM
Opposition to Related [+] Filed by Defendants Steven Hopwood, OEM Battery Depot, LLC, P4C Global, Inc. (DiPietra, Ronald)
Related: [-] 7 Application shortening time / Application For Order Shortening Time On Notice For Hearing On Motion For Remand Pursuant To 28 U.S.C. § 1452(B), 28 U.S.C. § 1334(C)(1) & (2); Declaration Of Anzhey Barantsevich filed by Plaintiff Anzhey Vsevolodo Barantsevich,8 Notice of Lodgment filed by Plaintiff Anzhey Vsevolodo Barantsevich
Att: 1 Exhibit A - Minute Order
Wednesday, July 17, 2019
10 10 nef Request for courtesy Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) Wed 07/17 12:14 PM
Request for courtesy Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) Filed by Chekian, Michael. (Chekian, Michael)
Related: [-]
9 9 answer Opposition Wed 07/17 9:42 AM
Opposition to Related [+] Notice of Intent to File A Full Opposition Brief to the Application for an Order Shortening Time Filed by Defendants Steven Hopwood, OEM Battery Depot, LLC, P4C Global, Inc. (DiPietra, Ronald)
Related: [-] 7 Application shortening time / Application For Order Shortening Time On Notice For Hearing On Motion For Remand Pursuant To 28 U.S.C. § 1452(B), 28 U.S.C. § 1334(C)(1) & (2); Declaration Of Anzhey Barantsevich filed by Plaintiff Anzhey Vsevolodo Barantsevich
Att: 1 Exhibit A - Minute Order
Att: 2 Exhibit B - Excerpts from the Deposition of Anzhey Barantsevich
Tuesday, July 16, 2019
8 8 misc Notice of Lodgment Tue 07/16 4:19 PM
Notice of lodgment Of Order Granting Application And Setting Hearing On Shortened Notice Filed by Plaintiff Anzhey Vsevolodo Barantsevich Related [+]. (Smith, Lindsey)
Related: [-] 7 Application shortening time / Application For Order Shortening Time On Notice For Hearing On Motion For Remand Pursuant To 28 U.S.C. § 1452(B), 28 U.S.C. § 1334(C)(1) & (2); Declaration Of Anzhey Barantsevich Filed by Plaintiff Anzhey Vsevolodo Barantsevich filed by Plaintiff Anzhey Vsevolodo Barantsevich
7 7 motion Shortening time (motion) Tue 07/16 4:15 PM
Application shortening time / Application For Order Shortening Time On Notice For Hearing On Motion For Remand Pursuant To 28 U.S.C. § 1452(B), 28 U.S.C. § 1334(C)(1) & (2); Declaration Of Anzhey Barantsevich Filed by Plaintiff Anzhey Vsevolodo Barantsevich (Smith, Lindsey)
Related: [-]
6 6 motion Remand (motion) Tue 07/16 4:13 PM
Motion for Remand / Notice Of Motion And Motion For Remand Pursuant To 28 U.S.C. § 1452(B), 28 U.S.C. § 1334(C)(1) & (2); Memorandum Of Points And Authorities; Declarations Of Anzhey Barantsevich And Felix T. Woo Filed by Plaintiff Anzhey Vsevolodo Barantsevich (Golubchik, David)
Related: [-]
Friday, July 12, 2019
5 5 court Hearing Set (Other) Fri 07/12 3:42 PM
Hearing Set Related [+]
Related: [-] #4 Notice of and Order for Status Conference. Status hearing to be held on 8/22/2019 at 10:00 AM at Crtrm 301, 3420 Twelfth St., Riverside, CA 92501. The case judge is Maureen Tighe (Fisher, Liliana
4 4 notice Notice of Hearing Fri 07/12 3:40 PM
Notice of and Order for Status Conference. Hearing for Status Conference. The Hearing date is set for 8/21/2019 at 10:00 AM at Crtrm 302, 21041 Burbank Blvd, Woodland Hills, CA 91367. The case judge is Maureen Tighe (Fisher, Liliana)
Related: [-]
3 3 cmp Amended Complaint Fri 07/12 10:13 AM
Amended Complaint re: AMENDED NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Ronald A DiPietra on behalf of Steven Hopwood, OEM Battery Depot, LLC, P4C Global, Inc. against Zooom, Inc., Anzhey Vsevolodo Barantsevich. (DiPietra, Ronald) Modified on 7/12/2019 (Espino, Cecilia)
Related: [-]
2 2 misc Request that the Clerk Issue Another Summons and Ntc of Status Conf (AP) Fri 07/12 7:42 AM
Request that the Clerk Issue Another Summons and Notice of Status Conference (LBR 7004-1(a)(1)(B)) Filed by Defendant P4C Global, Inc.. (DiPietra, Ronald)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Notice of Removal Fri 07/12 7:21 AM
Adversary case 1:19-ap-01079. Notice of Removal filed by Defendants of State Court Action by Anzhey Vsevolodo Barantsevich. Fee Amount $350 Nature of Suit: (01 (Determination of removed claim or cause)) (DiPietra, Ronald)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit 1 - Docket
Att: 2 Exhibit 2 - Summons
Att: 3 Exhibit 3 - Complaint
Att: 4 Exhibit 4 - Notice of CMC
Att: 5 Exhibit 5 - OSC
Att: 6 Exhibit 6 - Proof of Service of Summons
Att: 7 Exhibit 7 - Proof of Service of Summons
Att: 8 Exhibit 8 - Proof of Service of Summons
Att: 9 Exhibit 9 - Notice of Continuance
Att: 10 Exhibit 10 - Notice of CMC
Att: 11 Exhibit 11 - First Amended Complaint
Att: 12 Exhibit 12 - Answer to First Amended Complaint
Att: 13 Exhibit 13 - OEM Answer to First Amended Complaint
Att: 14 Exhibit 14 - OEM Answer to First Amended Complaint
Att: 15 Exhibit 15 - OEM CMC Statement
Att: 16 Exhibit 16 - CMC Statement
Att: 17 Exhibit 17 - Civil Deposit
Att: 18 Exhibit 18 - Plaintiff CMC Statement
Att: 19 Exhibit 19 - CMC Statement
Att: 20 Exhibit 20 - Civil Deposit
Att: 21 Exhibit 21 - CMC Statement
Att: 22 Exhibit 22 - Civil Deposit
Att: 23 Exhibit 23 - CMC Statement
Att: 24 Exhibit 24 - Civil Deposit
Att: 25 Exhibit 25 - Case Management Order
Att: 26 Exhibit 26 - Minute Order
Att: 27 Exhibit 27 - Notice of Ruling
Att: 28 Exhibit 28 - Notice Ruling
Att: 29 Exhibit 29 - Notice of Ruling
Att: 30 Exhibit 30 - Notice of Motion to Compel Arbitration
Att: 31 Exhibit 31 - Declaration in Support of Motion to Compel
Att: 32 Exhibit 32 - Civil Deposit
Att: 33 Exhibit 33 - Notice of Change of Address
Att: 34 Exhibit 34 - Declaration of Anzhey Barantsevich
Att: 35 Exhibit 35 - Plaintiffs' Opposition to Motion to Compel
Att: 36 Exhibit 36 - Request for Judicial Notice
Att: 37 Exhibit 37 - Declaration in Opposition to Motion to Compel
Att: 38 Exhibit 38 - Plaintiffs Opposition to Motion to Compel
Att: 39 Exhibit 39 - Request for Judicial Notice
Att: 40 Exhibit Exhibit 40 - Reply In Support of Motion to Compel Arbitration
Att: 41 Exhibit 41 - Minute Order
Att: 42 Exhibit 42 - Order Appointing Reporter
Att: 43 Exhibit 43 - Order
Att: 44 Exhibit 44 - Minute Order
Att: 45 Exhibit 45 - Notice of Ruling
Att: 46 Exhibit 46 - Substitution of Attorney
Att: 47 Exhibit 47 - Substitution of Attorney - Plaintiffs
Att: 48 Exhibit 48 - Notice of Lien
Att: 49 Exhibit 49 - Stipulated Protective Order
Att: 50 Exhibit 50 - Minute Order
Att: 51 Exhibit 51 - Minute Order
Att: 52 Exhibit 52 - Ex Parte Application
Att: 53 Exhibit 53 - Notice of Ruling
Att: 54 Exhibit Declaration of Felix Woo
Att: 55 Exhibit 55 - Motion to Compel
Att: 56 Exhibit 56 - Declaration of Tamar Karaguezian
Att: 57 Exhibit 57 - Declaration of Anthony DiPietra
Att: 58 Exhibit 58 - Opposition to Motion to Compel
Att: 59 Exhibit 59 - Proof of Service
Att: 60 Exhibit 60 - Declaration of Felix Woo
Att: 61 Exhibit 61 - Motion to Compel Priority
Att: 62 Exhibit 62 - Declaration of Tamar Karaguezian
Att: 63 Exhibit 63 - Declaration of Anthony DiPietra
Att: 64 Exhibit 64 - Opposition to Motion to Compel
Att: 65 Exhibit 65 - Proof of Service
Att: 66 Exhibit 66 - Reply in Support of Motion to Compel
Att: 67 Exhibit 67 - Minute Order
Att: 68 Exhibit 68 - Notice of Ruling
Att: 69 Exhibit 69 - Minute Order
Att: 70 Exhibit 70 - Notice of Ruling