Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 2:18-bk-12066

California Central Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 7
Judge:Sheri Bluebond
Case #: 2:19-ap-01210
Nature of Suit1 null
Case Filed:Jul 11, 2019
Terminated:Oct 29, 2019
Last checked: never
Defendant
Myron Hale
P.O. Box 180456
Los Angeles, CA 90018
Represented By
Myron Hale
contact info
Plaintiff
David M Goodrich
650 Town Center Drive Suite 600 Costa Mesa
Costa Mesa, CA 92626
Represented By
Toan B Chung
Roquemore Pringle & Moore
contact info
Trustee
David M Goodrich (TR)
650 Town Center Drive, Suite 600
Costa Mesa, CA 92626
U.S. Trustee
United States Trustee (LA)
915 Wilshire Blvd, Suite 1850
Los Angeles, CA 90017


Docket last updated: 05/02/2025 1:05 PM PDT
Monday, June 15, 2020
27 27 court Transcript Mon 06/15 10:40 AM
Transcript regarding Hearing Held 09/10/19 RE: MOTION TO REMAND THIS ADVERSARY PROCEEDING BACK TO THE SUPERIOR COURT OF THE STATE OF CA., PROBATE COURT. Remote electronic access to the transcript is restricted until 09/14/2020. The transcript may be viewed at the Bankruptcy Court Clerk's Office on a public terminal or purchased through the Transcription Service Provider before the transcript access restriction has ended. [TRANSCRIPTION SERVICE PROVIDER: Briggs Reporting Company, Inc., Telephone number 3104104151.]. Notice of Intent to Request Redaction Deadline Due By 6/22/2020. Redaction Request Due By 07/6/2020. Redacted Transcript Submission Due By 07/16/2020. Transcript access will be restricted through 09/14/2020. (Steinhauer, Holly)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, October 29, 2019
26 26 court Close Adversary Case Tue 10/29 12:47 PM
Adversary Case 2:19-ap-1210 Closed. The complaint filed in the above case has been disposed of and is no longer pending due to the dismissal of the complaint or main case, the entry of a judgment or the transfer of the adversary proceeding to another division or district. Since it appears that no further matters are pending that require this adversary proceeding remain open, it is ordered that this adversary proceeding is closed. Related [+] (Jackson, Wendy Ann)
Related: [-] 2 Notice of Hearing
Friday, September 13, 2019
25 25 court BNC Certificate of Notice - PDF Document Fri 09/13 9:31 PM
BNC Certificate of Notice - PDF Document. Related [+] No. of Notices: 1. Notice Date 09/13/2019. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 23 Order on Motion For Remand (BNC-PDF)
court X - Receipt Number and Filing Fee (Generic) (Auto - CR/ECF)(Retired) Fri 09/13 9:30 PM
Receipt of Certification Fee - $0.00 by 01. Receipt Number 20237147. (admin)
Related: [-]
court X - Receipt Number and Filing Fee (Generic) (Auto - CR/ECF)(Retired) Fri 09/13 9:30 PM
Receipt of Photocopies Fee - $0.00 by 01. Receipt Number 20237147. (admin)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, September 11, 2019
24 24 misc Transmittal Wed 09/11 5:18 PM
Transmittal of Certified Copy of the Order Remanding Removed Action (Case Number: 18STPB02863) to Superior Court.23 . (Ly, Lynn)
Related: [-]
23 23 order Remand (BNC-PDF) Wed 09/11 2:20 PM
Order Granting Motion to Remand this Adversary Proceeding back to the Probate Court of the State of California (BNC-PDF) Related [+] Signed on 9/11/2019 (Tatum, Shafari)
Related: [-] 8
22 22 court Hearing Held (Other) Wed 09/11 12:11 PM
Hearing Held (Bk Other) Related [+] - RULING - OFF CALENDAR; (Jackson, Wendy Ann)
Related: [-] 1 Notice of Removal
21 21 court Hearing Held (Motion) Wed 09/11 12:10 PM
Hearing Held (Bk Motion) Related [+]- RULING ? GRANTED; ORDER TO FOLLOW (Jackson, Wendy Ann)
Related: [-] 8 Motion for Remand
20 20 misc Notice of Lodgment Wed 09/11 4:05 AM
Notice of lodgment Order Granting Motion to Remand Adversary Proceeding Back to the Probate Court of the State of California, with Proof of Service Filed by Defendant Leslie Hale Related [+]. (Lally, David)
Related: [-] 8 Motion for Remand Notice of Motion and Motion to Remand this Adversary Proceeding Back to the Superior Court of the State of CA., Probte Court, and Declaration of Kay Willis, Esq., with Proof of Service Filed by Defendant Leslie Hale filed by Defendant Leslie Hale
Monday, September 02, 2019
18 18 answer Reply Mon 09/02 4:47 AM
Reply to Related [+] Amended Reply to Opposition to Motion to Remand Adversary Proceeding Back to the Superior Court of the State of California, Probate Court, with Proof of Service Filed by Defendant Leslie Hale (Lally, David)
Related: [-] 15 Opposition filed by Plaintiff David M Goodrich
17 17 answer Reply Mon 09/02 4:38 AM
Reply to Related [+] Reply to Opposition to Motion to Remand Adversary Proceeding Back to the Superior Court of the State of California, Probate Court, with Proof of Service Filed by Defendant Leslie Hale (Lally, David)
Related: [-] 15 Opposition filed by Plaintiff David M Goodrich
Tuesday, August 27, 2019
19 19 misc Declaration Thu 09/05 1:10 PM
Declaration of Myron Hale in support of Related [+]. Filed by Defendant Myron Hale; (Jackson, Wendy Ann)
Related: [-] 8 Motion for Remand Notice of Motion and Motion to Remand this Adversary Proceeding Back to the Superior Court of the State of CA., Probte Court, and Declaration of Kay Willis, Esq., with Proof of Service
16 16 misc Status report Tue 08/27 3:32 PM
Status report Joint Status Report with Proof of Service Filed by Plaintiff David M Goodrich Related [+]. (Chung, Toan)
Related: [-] 1 Notice of Removal
15 15 answer Opposition Tue 08/27 2:01 PM
Opposition to Related [+] Chapter 7 Trustee's Opposition to Motion to Remand; Memorandum of Points and Authorities with Proof of Service Filed by Plaintiff David M Goodrich (Chung, Toan)
Related: [-] 8 Motion for Remand Notice of Motion and Motion to Remand this Adversary Proceeding Back to the Superior Court of the State of CA., Probte Court, and Declaration of Kay Willis, Esq., with Proof of Service filed by Defendant Leslie Hale
Thursday, August 22, 2019
14 14 court BNC Certificate of Notice - PDF Document Thu 08/22 9:30 PM
BNC Certificate of Notice - PDF Document. Related [+] No. of Notices: 1. Notice Date 08/22/2019. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 13 ORDER to continue/reschedule hearing (BNC-PDF)
Tuesday, August 20, 2019
13 13 order Continue/reschedule hearing (BNC-PDF) Tue 08/20 2:39 PM
Order Approving Stipulation to continue hearing on Motion to Remand; ORDERED that the hearing is continued to SEPTEMBER 10, 2019 @ 2PM; (BNC-PDF) Related [+] Signed on 8/20/2019 (Jackson, Wendy Ann)
Related: [-] 11
12 12 misc Notice of Lodgment Tue 08/20 11:17 AM
Notice of lodgment Re: Order Approving Stipulation to Continue Hearing on Motion to Remand with Proof of Service Filed by Plaintiff David M Goodrich Related [+]. (Chung, Toan)
Related: [-] 11 Stipulation By David M Goodrich and Stipulation to Continue Hearing on Motion to Remand with Proof of Service Filed by Plaintiff David M Goodrich filed by Plaintiff David M Goodrich
11 11 motion Stipulation (motion) Tue 08/20 11:12 AM
Stipulation By David M Goodrich and Stipulation to Continue Hearing on Motion to Remand with Proof of Service Filed by Plaintiff David M Goodrich (Chung, Toan)
Related: [-]
court Hearing Continued (Motion) Tue 08/20 3:28 PM
Hearing (Adv Motion) Continued Related [+] Hearing to be held on 09/10/2019 at 02:00 PM 255 E. Temple St. Courtroom 1539 Los Angeles, CA 90012 for8 , (Jackson, Wendy Ann)
Related: [-] 8 MOTION FOR REMAND filed by Leslie Hale
Monday, August 19, 2019
10 10 motion Stipulation (motion) Mon 08/19 4:02 PM
Stipulation By David M Goodrich and Stipulation to Continue Hearing on Motion to Remand with Proof of Service Filed by Plaintiff David M Goodrich (Chung, Toan)
Related: [-]
Monday, August 12, 2019
9 9 court Hearing Set (Motion) Mon 08/12 4:09 PM
Hearing Set Related [+] The Hearing date is set for 9/3/2019 at 02:00 PM at Crtrm 1539, 255 E Temple St., Los Angeles, CA 90012. The case judge is Sheri Bluebond (Milano, Sonny)
Related: [-] 8 Motion for Remand filed by Defendant Leslie Hale
8 8 motion Remand (motion) Mon 08/12 3:14 PM
Motion for Remand Notice of Motion and Motion to Remand this Adversary Proceeding Back to the Superior Court of the State of CA., Probte Court, and Declaration of Kay Willis, Esq., with Proof of Service Filed by Defendant Leslie Hale (Lally, David)
Related: [-]
Friday, August 02, 2019
7 7 notice Notice Fri 08/02 2:42 PM
Notice of Errata of Chapter 7 Trustee's Notice of Lodgment of State Court Pleadings with Proof of Service Filed by Plaintiff David M Goodrich Related [+]. (Chung, Toan)
Related: [-] 5 Notice of Lodgment of State Court Pleadings with Proof of Service Filed by Plaintiff David M Goodrich. (Attachments: # 1 Part 2 # 2 Part 3 # 3 Part 4 # 4 Part 5 # 5 Part 6 # 6 Part 7 # 7 Part 8) filed by Plaintiff David M Goodrich
Wednesday, July 31, 2019
6 6 court Notice to Filer of Error and/or Deficient Document Wed 07/31 3:20 PM
Notice to Filer of Error and/or Deficient Document Incorrect hearing date/time/location was selected. THE FILER IS INSTRUCTED TO FILE AN AMENDED NOTICE OF MOTION/HEARING WITH THE CORRECT HEARING INFORMATION. MISSING STATUS CONFERENCE HEARING DATE INFORMATION UNDER THE CAPTION OF THE DOCUMENT; Related [+] (Jackson, Wendy Ann)
Related: [-] 5 Notice filed by Plaintiff David M Goodrich
5 5 notice Notice Wed 07/31 1:32 PM
Notice of Lodgment of State Court Pleadings with Proof of Service Filed by Plaintiff David M Goodrich.(Chung, Toan)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Part 2
Att: 2 Part 3
Att: 3 Part 4
Att: 4 Part 5
Att: 5 Part 6
Att: 6 Part 7
Att: 7 Part 8
Friday, July 19, 2019
4 4 notice Notice Fri 07/19 1:37 PM
Notice of Status Conference Re Removal of Action with Proof of Service Filed by Plaintiff David M Goodrich Related [+]. (Chung, Toan)
Related: [-] 2 Notice of Status Conference re: Removal of Action; The Hearing date is set for 9/10/2019 at 02:00 PM at Crtrm 1539, 255 E Temple St., Los Angeles, CA 90012. The case judge is Sheri Bluebond (Jackson, Wendy Ann)
Monday, July 15, 2019
3 3 court Hearing Set (Other) Mon 07/15 11:36 AM
Hearing Set Related [+] Status hearing to be held on 9/10/2019 at 02:00 PM at Crtrm 1539, 255 E Temple St., Los Angeles, CA 90012. The case judge is Sheri Bluebond (Jackson, Wendy Ann)
Related: [-] 1 Notice of Removal filed by Plaintiff David M Goodrich
2 2 notice Notice of Hearing Mon 07/15 11:36 AM
Notice of Status Conference re: Removal of Action; The Hearing date is set for 9/10/2019 at 02:00 PM at Crtrm 1539, 255 E Temple St., Los Angeles, CA 90012. The case judge is Sheri Bluebond (Jackson, Wendy Ann)
Related: [-]
Thursday, July 11, 2019
1 1 cmp Notice of Removal Thu 07/11 2:28 PM
Adversary case 2:19-ap-01210. Notice of Removal of State Court Action to Federal Bankruptcy Court [Los Angeles County Superior Court Case No. 18STPB02863] with Proof of Service by David M Goodrich. Nature of Suit: (01 (Determination of removed claim or cause)) (Chung, Toan)
Related: [-]