California Central District Court
Judge:Andrew J Guilford
Referred: Douglas F Mccormick
Case #: 8:14-cv-00312
Nature of Suit830 Property Rights - Patent
Cause35:271 Patent Infringement
Case Filed:Mar 03, 2014
Terminated:Sep 23, 2014
Last checked: Wednesday Jan 21, 2015 8:16 PM PST
Defendant
Alarm Lock Systems, Inc.
Represented By
John R Mugno
Law Office Of John R Mugno
contact info
Anntim J Vulchev
Vulchev And Co
contact info
Defendant
Napco Security Technologies, Inc.
Represented By
John R Mugno
Law Office Of John R Mugno
contact info
Anntim J Vulchev
Vulchev And Co
contact info
Plaintiff
O.S. Security LLC
Represented By
Hemant Hari Kewalramani
Law Offices Of Shashi Kewalramani
contact info

Docket last updated: 05/16/2025 11:59 PM PDT
Tuesday, September 30, 2014
35 35 ORDER by Judge Andrew J. Guilford granting34 Joint Motion to Dismiss Case. IT IS THEREFORE ORDERED that Plaintiff's claims for relief against Defendants are dismissed with prejudice. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that all attorneys' fees, costs of court and expenses shall be borne by each party incurring the same. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that this Court retain jurisdiction over this matter with respect to any disputes regarding the agreement between the parties settling this matter. (see document for details). (dro)
Related: [-]
34 34 APPLICATION to Dismiss Case With Prejudice filed by Plaintiff O.S. Security LLC.(Kewalramani, Hemant)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
Wednesday, September 24, 2014
33 33 REPORT ON THE DETERMINATION OF AN ACTION Regarding a Patent or Trademark. (Closing) (dro)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Minute Order
Tuesday, September 23, 2014
32 32 MINUTES (IN CHAMBERS) Order Staying Action Pending Final Settlement and Removing Case From Active Caseload by Judge Andrew J. Guilford. On September 23, 2014, counsel filed a "Notice of Settlement."31 The Court hereby orders all proceedings in the case stayed pending final settlement. It is further ordered that this action is removed from the Court's active caseload, subject to the right, upon good cause shown, to reopen the action if settlement is not consummated. Counsel shall file settlement documents and/or a dismissal with this Court by October 10, 2014. The Court retains full jurisdiction over this action and this order shall not prejudice any party in the action. All hearing dates in this matter are ordered VACATED. (Made JS-6. Case Terminated.) (dro)
Related: [-]
31 31 NOTICE of Settlement filed by Defendants Alarm Lock Systems, Inc., Napco Security Technologies, Inc.. (Vulchev, Anntim)
Related: [-]
Monday, September 15, 2014
28 28 JOINT REPORT Rule 26(f) Discovery Plan (Amended Schedule) ; estimated length of trial 7, filed by Plaintiff O.S. Security LLC..(Kewalramani, Hemant)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A
Monday, September 08, 2014
30 30 MINUTES OF Scheduling Conference held before Judge Andrew J. Guilford. Cause is called for hearing and counsel make their appearances. Court and counsel confer. The Court sets the following dates after receipt of counsels' amended joint report: Claim Construction Hearing is set for February 3, 2015 at 9:00 a.m. A Final Pretrial Conference is set for October 19, 2015 at 8:30 a.m. A Jury Trial is set for November 3, 2015 at 9:00 a.m. Counsel estimate the length of the trial at 7 days. Counsel stipulate to and the Court orders ADR Procedure No. 1 before the Magistrate Judge. Scheduling Order Specifying Procedures is signed and filed this date. Court Reporter: Miriam Baird. (dro)
Related: [-]
29 29 SCHEDULING ORDER SPECIFYING PROCEDURES : Claim construction hearing set for February 3, 2014. Final Pretrial Conference set for 10/19/2015 at 8:30 am. Jury Trial set for 11/3/2015 at 9:00 am. (lb)
Related: [-]
Thursday, August 14, 2014
27 27 NOTICE of Intent not to Seek Transfer filed by Defe Alarm Lock Systems, Inc., Napco Security Technologies, Inc.. (Vulchev, Anntim)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, August 06, 2014
26 26 MINUTES (IN CHAMBERS) Order Continuing Scheduling Conferences; Continuing Hearing on Motion to Transfer; Requiring Statements on Intent to Seek Transfer by Judge Andrew J. Guilford. These related cases are all set for scheduling conferences on August 25, 2014, at 9:00 a.m. For reasons of judicial efficiency and calendar management, the Court CONTINUES these hearings to September 8, 2014, at 9:00 a.m. (see document for details). (dro)
Related: [-]
Monday, July 07, 2014
25 25 MINUTES OF Scheduling Conference held before Judge Andrew J. Guilford. The Scheduling Conference is continued to 8/25/2014 at 09:00 AM before Judge Andrew J. Guilford. The Court will excuse any failure to meet any deadlines pending the 08/25/14. All parties are ordered to discuss how all dates in related case may be coordinated. Court Reporter: Miriam Baird. (nbo)
Related: [-]
Thursday, June 19, 2014
24 24 JOINT REPORT Rule 26(f) Discovery Plan ; estimated length of trial 7 days, filed by Plaintiff O.S. Security LLC.. (Kewalramani, Hemant)
Related: [-]
Thursday, May 22, 2014
23 23 RESPONSE filed by Plaintiff O.S. Security LLCto Answer to Complaint,18 And Counterclaims (Kewalramani, Hemant)
Related: [-]
Monday, May 12, 2014
22 22 ORDER by Judge Andrew J. Guilford: granting21 Application to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney John R. Mugno on behalf of Defendants, designating Anntim J. Vulchev as local counsel. (lt)
Related: [-]
Friday, May 09, 2014
21 21 APPLICATION for attorney John R. Mugno to Appear Pro Hac Vice(PHV Fee of $325 receipt number 0973-13790342 paid.) filed by Defendants Alarm Lock Systems, Inc., Napco Security Technologies, Inc..(Vulchev, Anntim)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
Monday, May 05, 2014
20 20 ORDER RE EARLY MEETING OF PARTIES AND SCHEDULING CONFERENCE: Scheduling Conference set for 7/7/2014 at 9:00 am. (lb)
Related: [-]
Friday, May 02, 2014
19 19 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Defendants Alarm Lock Systems, Inc., Napco Security Technologies, Inc. identifying NAPCO as Corporate Parent. (Vulchev, Anntim)
Related: [-]
18 18 ANSWER to Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening),1 JURY DEMAND. and COUNTERCLAIMS filed by Defendants Alarm Lock Systems, Inc., Napco Security Technologies, Inc..(Attorney Anntim J Vulchev added to party Alarm Lock Systems, Inc.(pty:dft), Attorney Anntim J Vulchev added to party Napco Security Technologies, Inc.(pty:dft))(Vulchev, Anntim)
Related: [-]
Monday, April 07, 2014
17 17 STIPULATION Extending Time to Answer the complaint as to All Defendants, re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening),1 filed by Plaintiff O.S. Security LLC.(Kewalramani, Hemant)
Related: [-]
Thursday, March 20, 2014
16 16 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Documents RE: Service of Summons and Complaint Returned Executed (21 days),14 , Service of Summons and Complaint Returned Executed (21 days),15 . The following error(s) was found: Title page is missing. In response to this notice the court may order (1) an amended or correct document to be filed (2) the document stricken or (3) take other action as the court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the court directs you to do so. (twdb)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, March 19, 2014
15 15 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff O.S. Security LLC, upon Defendant Napco Security Technologies, Inc. served on 3/12/2014, answer due 4/2/2014. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Amy McLaren, CT Corporation on behalf of Napco Security Technologies, Inc. in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by service on a domestic corporation, unincorporated association, or public entity. Original Summons returned. (Kewalramani, Hemant)
Related: [-]
14 14 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff O.S. Security LLC, upon Defendant Alarm Lock Systems, Inc. served on 3/12/2014, answer due 4/2/2014. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Amy McLaren, CT Corporation on behalf of Alarm Lock Systems Inc. in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by service on a domestic corporation, unincorporated association, or public entity. Original Summons returned. (Kewalramani, Hemant)
Related: [-]
Friday, March 07, 2014
13 13 ORDER RE TRANSFER PURSUANT TO GENERAL ORDER 08-05 -Related Case- filed. Related Case No: SACV14-0310 AG (DFMx). Case transferred from Judge David O. Carter and Magistrate Judge Jean P. Rosenbluth to Judge Andrew J. Guilford and Magistrate Judge Douglas F. McCormick for all further proceedings. The case number will now reflect the initials of the transferee Judge SACV14-00312 AG (DFMx). Signed by Judge Andrew J. Guilford. (nbo)
Related: [-]
12 12 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening),1 as to Defendants Alarm Lock Systems, Inc. and Napco Security Technologies, Inc.. (lwag)
Related: [-]
Thursday, March 06, 2014
11 11 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening),1 filed by plaintiff O.S. Security LLC. (Kewalramani, Hemant)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, March 05, 2014
10 10 NOTICE of Related Case(s) filed by plaintiff O.S. Security LLC. Related Case(s): SACV 14-00310 AG (DFMx), SACV 14-00314 JVS (RNBx), SACV 14-00316 DOC (JPRx), SACV 14-00318 JLS (RNBx), SACV 14-00319 AG (JPRx) (Kewalramani, Hemant)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, March 04, 2014
9 9 NOTICE OF DEFICIENCIES in Request to Issue Summons RE: Summons Request6 , Summons Request5 . The following error(s) was found: The space below the caption entitled To:Defendant(s):must contain the names of all defendants or be left blank. The court does not issue single summonses to individual defendants. The summons cannot be issued until this defect has been corrected. Please correct the defect and re-file your request. (mba)
Related: [-]
8 8 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (mba)
Related: [-]
7 7 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge David O. Carter and Magistrate Judge Jean P. Rosenbluth. (mba)
Related: [-]
Monday, March 03, 2014
6 6 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening),1 filed by plaintiff O.S. Security LLC. (Kewalramani, Hemant)
Related: [-]
5 5 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening),1 filed by plaintiff O.S. Security LLC. (Kewalramani, Hemant)
Related: [-]
4 4 REPORT ON THE FILING OF AN ACTION Regarding a Patent or a Trademark (Initial Notification) filed by O.S. Security LLC. (Kewalramani, Hemant)
Related: [-]
3 3 Notice of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff O.S. Security LLC, identifying Acacia Research Group LLC. (Kewalramani, Hemant)
Related: [-]
2 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff O.S. Security LLC. (Kewalramani, Hemant)
Related: [-]
1 1 COMPLAINT Receipt No: 0973-13453959 - Fee: $400, filed by plaintiff O.S. Security LLC.(Attorney Hemant Hari Kewalramani added to party O.S. Security LLC(pty:pla))(Kewalramani, Hemant)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A - U.S. Pat. No.7,456,725,
Att: 2 Exhibit B - U.S. Pat. No. 7,482,907,
Att: 3 Exhibit C - U.S. Pat. No. 7,683,758