Original Case: 3:15-md-02672

Ninth Circuit U.S. Court of Appeals
Case #: 0:19-cv-16363
Typecivil / private
Nature of Suit370 Torts - Personal Property - Other Fraud
Case Filed:Jul 11, 2019
Terminated:Sep 10, 2020
Last checked: Saturday Sep 12, 2020 1:32 AM PDT
In re: VOLKSWAGEN "CLEAN DIESEL" MARKETING, SALES PRACTICES, AND PRODUCTS LIABILITY LITIGATION
Claimant - Appellant
KENNEDY'S AUTOS, LLC
Represented By
John H. Cigavic III
Basic Legal Services
contact info
Defendant - Appellee
VOLKSWAGEN GROUP OF AMERICA, INC.
Represented By
Sharon Nelles
Sullivan & Cromwell LLP
contact info
Robert J. Giuffra Jr.
Sullivan & Cromwell LLP
contact info
William Brian Monahan
Sullivan & Cromwell LLP
contact info
Diane Lee McGimsey
Sullivan & Cromwell LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
NICHOLAS BENIPAYO

GPO Sep 10 2020
FILED OPINION (MARY M. SCHROEDER, PATRICK J. BUMATAY and BRIAN M. MORRIS) AFFIRMED. Judge: PJB Authoring. FILED AND ENTERED JUDGMENT. [11818488] [19-16361, 19-16362, 19-16363, 19-16376]

Docket last updated: 09/12/2020 1:26 AM PDT
Thursday, July 11, 2019
1 1 DOCKETED CAUSE AND ENTERED APPEARANCES OF COUNSEL. SEND MQ: Yes. The schedule is set as follows: Mediation Questionnaire due on 07/18/2019. Transcript ordered by 08/09/2019. Transcript due 09/09/2019. Appellant Kennedy's Autos, LLC opening brief due 10/18/2019. Appellee Volkswagen Group of America, Inc. answering brief due 11/18/2019. Appellant's optional reply brief is due 21 days after service of the answering brief. [11360310] (RT) [Entered: 07/11/2019 10:15 AM]
Related: [-]
Att: 1 3 pgs Docketing Letter
Att: 2 1 pgs Mediation Letter
Att: 3 22 pgs Case Opening Packet